Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Defendant: Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC, Virgin Islands Housing Authority, Popular, Inc., Banco Popular De Puerto Rico, Hunt Capital Partners, LLC, HCP-ILP, LLC, Donoe MM, LLC, VI Donoe, Inc., Pennrose Holdings, LLC and Pennrose PHL, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00009
Filed: February 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2023 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VI Donoe, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate VI Donoe, Inc. for VI Donoe, Inc... (Rich, Carol Ann)
April 17, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Allen Kroblin on behalf of Defendants Donoe MM, LLC, Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC, HCP-ILP, LLC, Hunt Capital Partners, LLC, Pennrose Holdings, LLC, Pennrose PHL, LLC (Kroblin, Christopher)
April 13, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Ann Rich on behalf of Defendants VI Donoe, Inc., Virgin Islands Housing Authority (Rich, Carol Ann)
April 12, 2023 Filing 41 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Donoe MM, LLC, Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC, HCP-ILP, LLC, Hunt Capital Partners, LLC, Pennrose Holdings, LLC, Pennrose PHL, LLC. Amendment to #39 Notice of Appearance, #40 Notice of Appearance . (Klutkowski, Steven)
April 12, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W. Klutkowski on behalf of Defendants Donoe MM, LLC, Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC, HCP-ILP, LLC, Hunt Capital Partners, LLC, Pennrose Holdings, LLC, Pennrose PHL, LLC, VI Donoe, Inc. (Klutkowski, Steven)
April 11, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W. Klutkowski on behalf of Defendants Donoe MM, LLC, Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC, HCP-ILP, LLC, Hunt Capital Partners, LLC, Pennrose Holdings, LLC, Pennrose PHL, LLC, VI Donoe, Inc. (Klutkowski, Steven)
April 11, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #39 Notice of Appearance. The PDF document is not titled as Event. Counsel need to refile correctly. (TNS)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER STAYING CASE (RM) until July 6, 2023. Status Conference set for July 6, 2023 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (AO)
April 6, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #1 , #13 - #22 , #25 , #26 , #30 , #36 , #37 : Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America is required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (IW)
April 6, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #23 , #24 : Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC, Pennrose, LLC, Hunt Capital Partners, LLC, HCP-ILP, LLC, Donoe MM, LLC, VI Donoe, Inc., Pennrose Holdings, LLC, and Pennrose PHL, LLC are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statements. (IW)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and Order Staying Matter Sine Die to Allow for Mediation by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Dema, John)
April 5, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #36 Stipulation. Electronic signatures were filed incorrectly. Filer needs to refile correctly. (JC)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and Order Staying Matter Sine Die to Allow for Mediation by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Dema, John)
March 31, 2023 Filing 35 OATH OF ADMISSION of Carter B. Reid, Esquire Related Document: #32 (CAB)
March 31, 2023 Filing 34 OATH OF ADMISSION of Steven W. Klutkowski, Esquire Related Document: #32 (CAB)
March 31, 2023 Filing 33 OATH OF ADMISSION of Dominick P. Weinkam, Esquire Related Document: #32 (CAB)
March 31, 2023 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Oath of Admission Hearing of Steven Klutkowski, Dominick P. Weinkam and Carter B. Reid via Teams held on 3/31/2023. (Court Reporter None.) (CAB)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order (RM): Oath of Admission Hearing set for Dominick P. Weinkam, Esq., Carter B. Reid, Esq., and Steven Klutkowski, Esq. for March 31, 2023 at 9:30 AM, via Microsoft Teams, before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Teams information will be provided via email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
March 20, 2023 Filing 30 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Dema, John)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER (RM) dated 3/16/2023 that #26 Dominick P. Weinkam, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER (RM) dated 3/16/2023 that #25 Carter B. Reid, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER (RM) dated 3/16/2023 that #24 Steven Klutkowski, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
March 15, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Dominick P. Weinkam(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1056944) by Plaintiff Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Weinkam PHV Application, #2 Exhibit B-Weinkam GSC, #3 Exhibit C-Weinkam Declaration, #4 Exhibit D-Dema Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Dema, John)
March 15, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Carter B. Reid(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1056923) by Plaintiff Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Reid Pro Hac Application, #2 Exhibit B-Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C-Reid Declaration, #4 Exhibit D-Dema Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Dema, John)
March 14, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Steven Klutkowski(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number BVIDC-1056823) by Defendants Donoe MM, LLC, Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC, HCP-ILP, LLC, Hunt Capital Partners, LLC, Pennrose Holdings, LLC, Pennrose PHL, LLC, VI Donoe, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Questionnaire, #3 Exhibit Certificate, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Kroblin, Christopher)
March 14, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Allen Kroblin on behalf of Defendants Donoe MM, LLC, Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC, HCP-ILP, LLC, Hunt Capital Partners, LLC, Pennrose Holdings, LLC, Pennrose PHL, LLC, VI Donoe, Inc. (Kroblin, Christopher)
March 7, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. HCP-ILP, LLC served on 3/1/2023, answer due 3/22/2023. (Dema, John)
March 3, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Virgin Islands Housing Authority served on 3/2/2023, answer due 3/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Dema, John)
March 3, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. VI Donoe, Inc. served on 3/1/2023, answer due 3/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Dema, John)
March 3, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC served on 3/1/2023, answer due 3/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Dema, John)
March 3, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Donoe MM, LLC served on 3/1/2023, answer due 3/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Dema, John)
March 3, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Banco Popular De Puerto Rico served on 3/1/2023, answer due 3/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit) (Dema, John)
March 2, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Pennrose PHL, LLC served on 3/1/2023, answer due 3/22/2023. (Dema, John)
March 2, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Pennrose Holdings, LLC served on 3/1/2023, answer due 3/22/2023. (Dema, John)
March 2, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Hunt Capital Partners, LLC served on 2/27/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Dema, John)
March 2, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Popular, Inc. served on 2/28/2023, answer due 3/21/2023. (Dema, John)
February 24, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each Summons. #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 (JC)
February 24, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Virgin Islands Housing Authority. #1 (JC)
February 24, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to VI Donoe, Inc. #1 (JC)
February 24, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Popular, Inc. #1 (JC)
February 24, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Pennrose PHL, LLC. #1 (JC)
February 24, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Pennrose Holdings, LLC. #1 (JC)
February 24, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hunt Capital Partners, LLC. #1 (JC)
February 24, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to HCP-ILP, LLC. #1 (JC)
February 24, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC. #1 (JC)
February 24, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Donoe MM, LLC. #1 (JC)
February 24, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Banco Popular De Puerto Rico. #1 (JC)
February 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1052790.)filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons-Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, #3 Exhibit Summons-Donoe MM, LLC, #4 Exhibit Summons-Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC, #5 Exhibit Summons-HCP-ILP, LLC, #6 Exhibit Summons-Hunt Capital Partners, LLC, #7 Exhibit Summons-Pennrose Holdings, LLC, #8 Exhibit Summons-Pennrose PHL, LLC, #9 Exhibit Summons-Popular, Inc., #10 Exhibit Summons-VI Donoe, Inc., #11 Exhibit Summons-Virgin Islands Housing Authority) (Dema, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: John K Dema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donoe Redevelopment Partners, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Allen Kroblin
Represented By: Steven W. Klutkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin Islands Housing Authority
Represented By: Carol Ann Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popular, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Popular De Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Allen Kroblin
Represented By: Steven W. Klutkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCP-ILP, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Allen Kroblin
Represented By: Steven W. Klutkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donoe MM, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Allen Kroblin
Represented By: Steven W. Klutkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VI Donoe, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Allen Kroblin
Represented By: Carol Ann Rich
Represented By: Steven W. Klutkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennrose Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Steven W. Klutkowski
Represented By: Christopher Allen Kroblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennrose PHL, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Allen Kroblin
Represented By: Steven W. Klutkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?