New Moon Charter, LLC v. Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation et al
Counter Defendant: New Moon Charter, LLC
Counter Claimant: Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation and Commodore Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2023cv00011
Filed: March 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by New Moon Charter, LLC (Cattie, David)
May 3, 2023 Filing 22 TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER (RM): Status Conference set for August 1, 2023 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Trial set for June 17, 2024 at 09:00 AM in STT Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Robert A. Molloy. (AO)
May 3, 2023 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/3/2023. (TRH)
May 2, 2023 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cattie, David)
May 1, 2023 Filing 19 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendants Commodore Insurance Corporation, Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation, Counter Claimants Commodore Insurance Corporation, Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation. (Duensing, Matthew)
April 25, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of First Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures by New Moon Charter, LLC (Cattie, David)
April 19, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to #16 to Counterclaim by New Moon Charter, LLC. (Cattie, David)
April 19, 2023 Filing 16 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff New Moon Charter, LLC New Moon Charter, LLC by Commodore Insurance Corporation, Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation. (Duensing, Matthew)
April 18, 2023 Filing 15 DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff New Moon Charter, LLC. (Cattie, David)
April 18, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by New Moon Charter, LLC (Cattie, David)
April 17, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service by Commodore Insurance Corporation, Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation (Duensing, Matthew)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
March 30, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Commodore Insurance Corporation, Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation. (Duensing, Matthew)
March 21, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin P. Seila on behalf of Defendants Commodore Insurance Corporation, Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation (Seila, Robin)
March 21, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Sauerwein on behalf of Defendants Commodore Insurance Corporation, Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation (Sauerwein, Joseph)
March 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Duensing on behalf of Defendants Commodore Insurance Corporation, Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation (Duensing, Matthew)
March 14, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Moon Charter, LLC. (Cattie, David)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (RM): On or before March 17, 2023, plaintiff shall file a disclosure statement in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 13, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Moon Charter, LLC. (Cattie, David)
March 13, 2023 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge issued to plaintiff(s) New Moon Charter, LLC with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KW)
March 13, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commodore Insurance Corporation. (KW)
March 13, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation. (KW)
March 13, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7.1, a Disclosure Statement should be filedRe: #1 Complaint,. (KW)
March 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1055641.)filed by New Moon Charter, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons (SOPAC), #3 Exhibit Summons (Commodore)) (Cattie, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Moon Charter, LLC v. Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: New Moon Charter, LLC
Represented By: David J. Cattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Southern Pacific Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Joseph D. Sauerwein
Represented By: Matthew J. Duensing
Represented By: Robin P. Seila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Commodore Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Joseph D. Sauerwein
Represented By: Matthew J. Duensing
Represented By: Robin P. Seila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?