Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc. v. First American Trust, FSB
Plaintiff: Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Defendant: First American Trust, FSB, As Trustee of Land Trust No. 1082-0300-00 (A.K.A MVC Trust) and MVC Trust Owners Association, Inc., First American Trust, FSB and MVC Trust Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00026
Filed: June 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (RM): Oath of Admission Hearing for Patrick B. Sardino, Esq., is set for August 28, 2023 at 09:45 AM, via Microsoft Teams, before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Teams information will be provided by email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (AO)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (RM) dated 8/21/2023 that Patrick B. Sardino, Esquire, is admitted pro hac vice to practice before this Court in this case, and he shall appear before this Court to take the oath prior to such practice. (CAB)
August 17, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Patrick B. Sardino(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1085829) by Defendant MVC Trust Owners Association, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Taylor, Earnesta)
August 15, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendant MVC Trust Owners Association, Inc. (Beckstedt, Carl)
August 2, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Earnesta L. Taylor on behalf of Defendant MVC Trust Owners Association, Inc. (Taylor, Earnesta)
August 2, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc.. First American Trust, FSB served on 7/25/2023, answer due 8/15/2023. (Wilczynski, Mark)
August 2, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc.. MVC Trust Owners Association, Inc. served on 7/6/2023, answer due 7/27/2023. (Wilczynski, Mark)
June 30, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to MVC Trust Owners Association, Inc. (IW)
June 30, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to First American Trust, FSB. (IW)
June 30, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons, re #7 , #8 . (IW)
June 29, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Wilczynski, Mark)
June 29, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc. for Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc... (Wilczynski, Mark)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (RM): Plaintiff shall file the appropriate disclosure statement in compliance with Rule 7.1 no later than July 6, 2023. (AO)
June 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Disclosure Statement Under FED. R. CIV P. 7.1 by Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Wilczynski, Mark)
June 28, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #3 Notice (Other). Incorrect Event. Filer, please refile selecting the event "Corporate Disclosure Statement" located under Civil Events\Other Filings\Other Documents. (IW)
June 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of Summons by Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Wilczynski, Mark)
June 27, 2023 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #1 Complaint, Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(1) and 7.1(a)(2) Plaintiff is required to file a Disclosure Statement. (IW)
June 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First American Trust, FSB, As Trustee of Land Trust No. 1082-0300-00 (A.K.A MVC Trust) and MVC Trust Owners Association, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1075287.)filed by Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Errata, #22 Exhibit, #23 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilczynski, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc. v. First American Trust, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Bay Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Wilczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Trust, FSB, As Trustee of Land Trust No. 1082-0300-00 (A.K.A MVC Trust) and MVC Trust Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Trust, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVC Trust Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Carl A Beckstedt, III
Represented By: Earnesta L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?