Campbell et al v. The Noel U. Boynes, Sr. and Bernice C. Boynes Joint Living Trust et al
Plaintiff: John Campbell and Jennifer Campbell
Defendant: The Noel U. Boynes, Sr. and Bernice C. Boynes Joint Living Trust, Cheryl A. Boynes-Jackson, Michael A. Jackson, Sr., Bernice C. Boynes, Noel U. Boynes, Jr., Revere High Yield Fund LP, United States of America Internal Revenue Service, Government of the Virgin Islands Internal Revenue Bureau and Caterpiller Financial Services Corporation
Cross Defendant: Noel U. Boynes, Sr.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00051
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2410 Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2023 Filing 25 Government of the Virgin Islands ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against Noel U. Boynes, Sr. by Government of the Virgin Islands Internal Revenue Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 B) (Chancellor, Eric)
November 2, 2023 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Campbell, John Campbell. Caterpiller Financial Services Corporation served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
November 2, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Campbell, John Campbell. Revere High Yield Fund LP served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Revere High Yield Fund) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
November 2, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Campbell, John Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - IRB-VI Atty General Ofc) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
November 2, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Campbell, John Campbell. United States of America Internal Revenue Service served on 10/24/2023, answer due 11/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - IRS-US Attorney Ofc) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
November 2, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Campbell, John Campbell. Government of the Virgin Islands Internal Revenue Bureau served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Internal Revenue Bureau) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
November 2, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Campbell, John Campbell. Bernice C. Boynes served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Bernice Boynes) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
November 2, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Campbell, John Campbell. Noel U. Boynes, Sr. served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Noel Boynes Sr) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
November 2, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Campbell, John Campbell. Noel U. Boynes, Jr. served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service -Noel Boynes Jr) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
November 2, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Campbell, John Campbell. Cheryl A. Boynes-Jackson served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - Cheryl Boynes Jackson) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
November 2, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Campbell, John Campbell. Michael A. Jackson, Sr. served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - M Jackson Sr) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
November 2, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Campbell, John Campbell. The Noel U. Boynes, Sr. and Bernice C. Boynes Joint Living Trust served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service - C. Boynes Jackson-Trustee) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)
October 19, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Revere High Yield Fund LP. (CAB)
October 18, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each Summons. #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 (JC)
October 18, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Government of the Virgin Islands Internal Revenue Bureau c/o Delia Smith. (JC)
October 18, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Bernice C. Boynes. (JC)
October 18, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Caterpiller Financial Services Corporation. (JC)
October 18, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Noel U. Boynes, Sr. (JC)
October 18, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Government of the Virgin Islands Internal Revenue Bureau C/O Joel A. Lee, Director (TNS)
October 18, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Noel U. Boynes, Sr. and Bernice C. Boynes Joint Living Trust. (JC)
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Government of the Virgin Islands Internal Revenue Bureau. C/O Ariel Smith. (TNS)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael A. Jackson, Sr.. (TNS)
October 18, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cheryl A. Boynes-Jackson. (TNS)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Noel U. Boynes, Jr.. (TNS)
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1098049.)filed by Jennifer Campbell, John Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Summons-Caterpillar Financial, #5 Exhibit Summons-Bernice C. Boynes, #6 Exhibit Summons-Cheryl A Boynes-Jackson, #7 Exhibit Summons - IRB (Dept of Justice), #8 Exhibit Summons-IRB, #9 Exhibit Summons-IRS (US Atty), #10 Exhibit Summons-Michael A. Jackson, #11 Exhibit Summons-Noel U. Boynes Jr, #12 Exhibit Summons-Noel U. Boynes Sr, #13 Exhibit Summons-Boynes Joint Living Trust, #14 Exhibit Revere High Yield Fund, LP, #15 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weiss, A. Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell et al v. The Noel U. Boynes, Sr. and Bernice C. Boynes Joint Living Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Campbell
Represented By: A. Jeffrey Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Campbell
Represented By: A. Jeffrey Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Noel U. Boynes, Sr. and Bernice C. Boynes Joint Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl A. Boynes-Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Jackson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernice C. Boynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel U. Boynes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revere High Yield Fund LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government of the Virgin Islands Internal Revenue Bureau
Represented By: Eric S Chancellor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpiller Financial Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Noel U. Boynes, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?