Merchants Commercial Bank v. Stawski
Plaintiff: Merchants Commercial Bank
Defendant: Scott Stawski a/k/a Scott Allen Stawski, Hope Stawski a/k/a Hope Ann Stawski, United States of America, Small Business Administration, Scott Stawski, Hope Stawski, Scott Allen Stawski and Hope Ann Stawski
Case Number: 3:2024cv00002
Filed: January 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
March 21, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE Amended Notice of Filing Proof of Service on The United States of America Small Business Administration by Merchants Commercial Bank re #13 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service on United States Attorney General Merrick Garland) (Komives, Lisa)
March 15, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Hope Stawski, Scott Stawski. (Sheesley, Michael)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (RM) granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Hope Stawski's answer is due by 3/15/2024; Scott Stawski's answer is due 3/15/2024. No further extensions will be entertained. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 9, 2024 Filing 14 Opposition to Motion re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Plaintiff Merchants Commercial Bank. (Komives, Lisa)
February 8, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service on the United States of America Small Business Administration by Merchants Commercial Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service on Delia Smith, #2 Exhibit 2 - Josue Rivera) (Komives, Lisa)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (RM): To the extent plaintiff objects to the relief sought in the motion at docket entry 11, it shall file such objection on the docket no later than February 9, 2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 6, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Hope Stawski, Scott Stawski. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sheesley, Michael)
February 5, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service on Individual Defendants by Merchants Commercial Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Scott Stawski, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hope Stawski) (Komives, Lisa)
February 2, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Recording Lis Pendens by Merchants Commercial Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Lis Pendens) (Komives, Lisa)
February 2, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Sheesley on behalf of Defendants Hope Stawski, Scott Stawski (Sheesley, Michael)
January 24, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons. (TSJ)
January 24, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Delia L. Smith, United States Attorney on behalf of United States of America, Small Business Administration. (TSJ)
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, United States Attorney General on behalf of United States of America, Small Business Administration. (TSJ)
January 24, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Josue E. Rivera, District Director on behalf of United States of America, Small Business Administration.
January 24, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Scott Stawski. (TSJ).
January 24, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hope Stawski. (TSJ)
January 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-1115877.)filed by Merchants Commercial Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - November 4, 2015 Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit 2 - November 23, 2015 Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - November 23, 2015 Note, #4 Exhibit 4 - November 23, 2015 Mortgage, #5 Exhibit 5 - March 30, 2021 Amended and Restated Term Loan Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - March 30, 2021 Amended and Restated Promissory Note, #7 Exhibit 7 - Mortgage Modification, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons - Scott Stawksi a/k/a Scott Allen Stawski, #10 Summons - Hope Stawski a/k/a Hope Ann Stawski, #11 Summons - United States of America, Small Business Administration c/o Josue E. Rivera, #12 Summons - United States of America, Small Business Administration, #13 Summons - United States of America, Small Business Administration) (Komives, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merchants Commercial Bank v. Stawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merchants Commercial Bank
Represented By: Lisa Michelle Komives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Stawski a/k/a Scott Allen Stawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Stawski a/k/a Hope Ann Stawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Stawski
Represented By: Michael L. Sheesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Stawski
Represented By: Michael L. Sheesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Allen Stawski
Represented By: Michael L. Sheesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Ann Stawski
Represented By: Michael L. Sheesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?