Island Time Watersports (Caribbean), LLC v. Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC
Plaintiff: ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS and Island Time Watersports (Caribbean), LLC doing business as Cruz Bay Watersports
Defendant: Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC d/b/a El Conquistador Resort and Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC doing business as El Conquistador Resort
Case Number: 3:2024cv00013
Filed: February 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Virgin Islands
Presiding Judge: Ruth Miller
Referring Judge: Robert A Molloy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Mario Enrique Davila-Acevedo(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-1136599) by Defendant Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - VI DCT - PHV Application of Mario Davila, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Good Standing Certificate, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Declaration of Atty Davila, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order re D's Motion for Pro Hac Vice) (Geigel-Simounet, Eugenio)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO)
April 19, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC. (Geigel-Simounet, Eugenio)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (RM) granting #19 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC's answer is due by April 19, 2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 9, 2024 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint.A proposed order was not filed as an attachment to the motion pursuant to LRCi 7.1(e). Filer is advised to file a proposed order using the event Notice (Other) referencing Notice of Filing as the docket text. The proposed order will be an attachment to the notice and the document should be linked to the motion. (TSJ)
April 8, 2024 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Defendant Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC. (Geigel-Simounet, Eugenio)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER (RM) granting #17 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC answer is due by April 9, 2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 12, 2024 Filing 17 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC. (Geigel-Simounet, Eugenio)
March 6, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing by Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Geigel-Simounet, Eugenio)
March 6, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE Amended Notice of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC d/b/a El Conquistador Resort by Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC re #8 Notice (Other) (Geigel-Simounet, Eugenio)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (RM) granting #4 motion for refund of a duplicate filing fee. (AO)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (RM) denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for failure to comply with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(f). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (RM): On or before March 13, 2024, defendant shall file a statement in compliance with Rule 7.1(a)(2). (AO)
March 6, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Island Time Watersports (Caribbean), LLC. Amendment to #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Marinelli, Adam)
March 5, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Island Time Watersports (Caribbean), LLC. (Marinelli, Adam)
March 5, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Nicholas Marinelli on behalf of Plaintiff Island Time Watersports (Caribbean), LLC (Marinelli, Adam)
March 5, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC (Geigel-Simounet, Eugenio)
March 4, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #4 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically . Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), Royale Blue Hospitality, LLCd/b/a El Conquistador Resort is required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (EMK)
March 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #1 Notice of Removal. Civil Cover Sheet is required pursuant to LRCi 3.1. (EMK)
March 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Re: #1 Notice of Removal, The filer incorrectly prepared the docket text of the Notice of Removal with Plaintiff Island Time Watersports (Caribbean), LLC doing business as Cruz Bay Watersports as the filer of the Notice of Removal and not Defendant Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC d/b/a El Conquistador Resort as correctly listed on the Notice of Removal. Docket text has been corrected. Filer is not required to do any further actions. (EMK)
March 1, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Defendant Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC d/b/a El Conquistador Resort. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Geigel-Simounet, Eugenio)
March 1, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC d/b/a El Conquistador Resort. (Geigel-Simounet, Eugenio)
February 29, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugenio W.A. Geigel-Simounet on behalf of Defendant Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC d/b/a El Conquistador Resort (Geigel-Simounet, Eugenio)
February 29, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC d/b/a El Conquistador Resort from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number ST-2024-CV-00038. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVIDC-1125174)filed by Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC d/b/a El Conquistador Resort. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Geigel-Simounet, Eugenio) Modified on 3/4/2024 (EMK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virgin Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Island Time Watersports (Caribbean), LLC v. Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Island Time Watersports (Caribbean), LLC doing business as Cruz Bay Watersports
Represented By: Adam Nicholas Marinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC d/b/a El Conquistador Resort
Represented By: Eugenio W.A. Geigel-Simounet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royale Blue Hospitality, LLC doing business as El Conquistador Resort
Represented By: Eugenio W.A. Geigel- Simounet
Represented By: Eugenio W.A. Geigel-Simounet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?