Easterday Ranches, Inc.
Debtor: Easterday Ranches, Inc. and Easterday Ranches, Inc., Debtor
Us Trustee: US Trustee
Not Classified By Court: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc., Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership, The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc., J.R. Simplot, Alto Nutrients, LLC and Animal Health International, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021bk00141
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Whitman L Holt
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2023 Filing 1916 CHAPTER 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Member Case Number 21-00176 for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2022 (Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership, Case No. 21-00176) . Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Plan Administrator (Durbin, Christopher)
February 14, 2023 Filing 1915 CHAPTER 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 09/30/2022 (Easterday Ranches, Inc., Case No. 21-00141) . Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Plan Administrator (Durbin, Christopher)
January 31, 2023 Filing 1914 Adversary case 23-80002. COMPLAINT. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Conway, Timothy)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1913 ORDER Extending Claim Objection Deadline (RE: #1905). Time Extended to 7/31/2023. (TLJ)
January 25, 2023 Filing 1912 MINUTE Entry re: Motion to Extend Time to Object to Claims. NOT HELD. No objections filed, counsel will submit order for signature. (RE: Motion to Enlarge Time #1905 ). (CES)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1911 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Durbin, Christopher. (RE: #1905 )
January 25, 2023 Filing 1910 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1905) and Notice (Docket No. #1905), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1906). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion to Enlarge Time#1905, Certificate of Service#1906). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Plan Administrator (Durbin, Christopher)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1909 ORDER Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney (RE: #1903) . (TLJ)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1908 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Medeiros, Bruce. (RE: #1903 )
January 24, 2023 Filing 1907 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1903) and Notice (Docket No. #1903), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1904). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney#1903). Filed by Bruce K Medeiros on behalf of J.R. Simplot (Medeiros, Bruce)
January 12, 2023 Filing 1906 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Plan Administrator (RE: Motion to Enlarge Time#1905). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and Exhibit B: Service Lists) (Durbin, Christopher)
January 10, 2023 Filing 1905 MOTION to Enlarge Time to to Object to Claims to July 31, 2023 and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 1/26/2023 at 11:00 a.m. at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Plan Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order) (Durbin, Christopher) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 1/11/2023 (TLJ).
January 6, 2023 Filing 1904 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Bruce K Medeiros on behalf of J.R. Simplot (RE: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney#1903). (Medeiros, Bruce)
January 6, 2023 Filing 1903 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Notice. Filed by Bruce K Medeiros on behalf of J.R. Simplot. (Medeiros, Bruce)
January 3, 2023 Filing 1902 STIPULATION. Signed by Michael Klein on behalf of the Plan Administrator and Bruce K. Medeiros on behalf of Rabo AgriFinance LLC and the filer.. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Plan Administrator (Durbin, Christopher)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1901 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Interim Period: 3/1/2022 to 8/1/2022, Fees Awarded: $2,676,852.50, Expenses Awarded: $152,304.89. Final Fees Awarded: $13955086.24, Expenses Awarded: $795366.99 (RE: #1850). (TLJ)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1900 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1850 )
November 23, 2022 Filing 1899 MEMORANDUM Opinion (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1850). (CMR)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1898 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for B. Riley Advisory Services, Financial Advisor, Fees Awarded: $1439314.00, Expenses Awarded: $4363.87 (RE: #1852). (TLJ)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1897 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Financial Advisor, Fees Awarded: $1328733.00, Expenses Awarded: $4541.87 (RE: #1847). (TLJ)
October 31, 2022 ADVERSARY Proceeding 2:21-ap-80011 Closed. (CMR)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1896 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Durbin, Christopher. (RE: #1852 )
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1895 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Welch, Joseph. (RE: #1847 )
October 24, 2022 Filing 1894 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Notification of#1893). (Welch, Joseph)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1893 NOTIFICATION of Revised Order Awarding Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Pursuant to (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1847). Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1892 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Former Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc., Other Professional, Fees Awarded: $587138.98, Expenses Awarded: $24309.71 (RE: #918). (TLJ)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1891 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Fees Awarded: $2569482.45, Expenses Awarded: $50279.61 . (RE: #1843). (TJL)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1890 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Fees Awarded: $4388340.50, Expenses Awarded: $22037.30 (RE: #1845). (TLJ)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1889 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Alberts, Sam. (RE: #918 )
October 11, 2022 Filing 1888 MINUTE Entry Re: Application(s) for Award of Compensation. HELD. Based upon the record and argument of counsel, the court approves the final application for compensation as modified #918 , sustains the US Trustee's objection in part but not entirely as it relates to B. Riley Advisory Services #1852 and Dundon Advisers, LLC 184 . Mr. Gurule will upload revised proposed orders. As it relates to the application for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, the court took the matter under submission. Appearances: Richard Pachulski, Thomas Buford, and Jeffrey Dulberg, attorneys for debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for US Trustee; Weiru Fang, attorney for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc/Plan Administrator.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley Cosman, attorney for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Seth Freeman, B. Riley Advisory Services/Plan Administrator (RE: Application for Award of Compensation #1852 , Application for Award of Compensation #1847 , Notice of Hearing #1855 , Application for Award of Compensation #1850 , Application for Award of Compensation #918 ). (NNU)
October 11, 2022 Filing 1887 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/11/2022 1:28:21 PM ]. File Size [ 43232 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:30:04 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
October 11, 2022 Filing 1886 SUPPLEMENT to Stipulation re: First and Final Fee Application of Dentons. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#918, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#919, Motion to Extend Time to File Document#951, Motion to Extend Time to File Document#1090, Stipulation#1169). Filed by Alan D Smith on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (Smith, Alan)
October 10, 2022 Filing 1885 REPLY signed by Seth R. Freeman (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1852, Objection#1867). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of B. Riley Advisory Services (Durbin, Christopher)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1884 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Durbin, Christopher. (RE: #1843 )
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1883 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Welch, Joseph. (RE: #1845 )
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1882 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Fees Awarded: $142392.00, Expenses Awarded: $40239.87 (RE: #1851). (TLJ)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1881 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Northwest CPA Group, PLLC, Other Professional, Fees Awarded: $66168.20, Expenses Awarded: $425.55 (RE: #1849). (TLJ)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1880 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Fees Awarded: $44556.00, Expenses Awarded: $188.71 (RE: #1844). (TLJ)
October 4, 2022 ADVERSARY Proceeding 2:22-ap-80008 Closed. (JRG)
October 4, 2022 ADVERSARY Proceeding 2:21-ap-80057 Closed. (JRG)
October 4, 2022 ADVERSARY Proceeding 2:21-ap-80050 Closed. (JRG)
October 3, 2022 Filing 1879 REPLY signed by Thomas A. Buford, III (RE: Objection#1783, Application for Award of Compensation#1850, Objection#1865). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
October 3, 2022 Filing 1878 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1845) and Notice (Docket No. #1855), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1846). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1845). Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph)
September 30, 2022 Filing 1877 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1843) and Notice (Docket No. #1855), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. [1856, 1857]). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1843, Notice of Hearing#1855, Certificate of Service#1856, Certificate of Service#1857). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (Durbin, Christopher)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1876 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1851 )
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1875 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1844 )
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1874 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1849 )
September 30, 2022 Filing 1873 DECLARATION of No Objections to Final Application of Northwest CPA Group, PLLC for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses. Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1849) and Notice (Docket No. #1855), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1856). No objections have been filed. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1849, Notice of Hearing#1855, Certificate of Service#1856). (Buford, Thomas)
September 30, 2022 Filing 1872 DECLARATION of No Objections to Sixth Interim and Final Application of Davis Wright Tremaine LLP for Compensation and Reimbursem. Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1844) and Notice (Docket No. #1855), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1856). No objections have been filed. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1844, Notice of Hearing#1855, Certificate of Service#1856). (Buford, Thomas)
September 30, 2022 Filing 1871 DECLARATION of No Objections to Final Application of Bush Kornfeld LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses. Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1851) and Notice (Docket No. #1855), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1856). No objections have been filed. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notice of Hearing#1855, Certificate of Service#1856). (Buford, Thomas)
September 29, 2022 Filing 1870 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Reply#1868). (Welch, Joseph)
September 29, 2022 Filing 1869 DECLARATION in support signed by Julian I. Gurule (RE: Reply#1868). Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph)
September 29, 2022 Filing 1868 REPLY signed by Joseph M. Welch (RE: Objection#1866). Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph)
September 22, 2022 Filing 1867 OBJECTION. Filed by U.S. Trustee (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1852). (Dyer, Gary)
September 22, 2022 Filing 1866 OBJECTION. Filed by U.S. Trustee (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1847). (Dyer, Gary)
September 22, 2022 Filing 1865 OBJECTION. Filed by U.S. Trustee (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1850). (Dyer, Gary)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1864 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at a hearing held on September 13, 2022, the motion to interpret filed as ECF No. 1829 is continued sine die. If the District Court takes an action warranting further consideration of the motion by this court, then counsel for the movants should contact chambers to obtain a new hearing date and provide notice of that date. If the District Court takes an action mooting the motion, then counsel for the movants should withdraw the motion. SO ORDERED. Whitman L. Holt, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. TEXT-ONLY ORDER; NO DOCUMENT CREATED. (RE: Motion to Authorize#1829). (NNU)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1863 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Interpret Third Modified Third Amended Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation. HELD. For the reasons stated on the record, the court continues the matter sine die and defers the matter to District Court. The court will enter a text order. Appearances: Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Jeffrey Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Russell Garrett, attorney for Jody Easterday; Michael Johnson and Bruce Medeiros, attorneys for Rabo AgriFinance LLC; Weiru Fang, attorney for Seth Freeman of B. Riley Financial Services in its capacity as plan administrator; Seth Freeman, Plan Administrator. (RE: Motion to Authorize #1829 ). (NNU)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1862 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/13/2022 9:59:37 AM ]. File Size [ 8904 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:18:33 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
September 9, 2022 Filing 1861 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1844, Application for Award of Compensation#1849, Application for Award of Compensation#1850, Application for Award of Compensation#1851, Notice of Hearing#1855). (Buford, Thomas)
September 8, 2022 Filing 1860 JOINDER signed by Jeffrey C. Misley, Counsel to Cody and Debby Easterday (RE: Reply#1859). Filed by Jeffrey C Misley on behalf of Cody and Debby Easterday (Misley, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2022 Filing 1859 REPLY signed by Timothy J. Conway (RE: Objection#1853). Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY (Conway, Timothy)
September 7, 2022 Filing 1858 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of B. Riley Advisory Services (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1852, Notice of Hearing#1855). (Durbin, Christopher)
September 7, 2022 Filing 1857 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1843, Notice of Hearing#1855). (Durbin, Christopher)
September 6, 2022 Filing 1856 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notice of Hearing#1855). (Buford, Thomas)
September 6, 2022 Filing 1855 NOTICE of Hearing. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#918, Application for Award of Compensation#1843, Application for Award of Compensation#1844, Application for Award of Compensation#1845, Application for Award of Compensation#1847, Application for Award of Compensation#1849, Application for Award of Compensation#1850, Application for Award of Compensation#1851, Application for Award of Compensation#1852). The Hearing date is set for 10/11/2022 at 01:30 PM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
September 1, 2022 Filing 1854 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Bruce K Medeiros on behalf of Rabo AgriFinance LLC (RE: Objection#1853). (Medeiros, Bruce)
September 1, 2022 Filing 1853 OBJECTION (RE: Motion to Authorize#1829). Filed by Bruce K Medeiros on behalf of Rabo AgriFinance LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B to Objection) (Medeiros, Bruce)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1852 FINAL APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for B. Riley Advisory Services, Financial Advisor, Period: 2/25/2021 to 7/31/2022, Fee: $1,462,774.37, Expenses: $4,363.87. Filed by B. Riley Advisory Services. (Durbin, Christopher) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Amounts requested reflect 100% of fees and expenses incurred to date. Modified on 9/2/2022 (TLJ).
August 31, 2022 Filing 1851 FINAL APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 3/1/2022 to 8/1/2022, Fee: $142,392.00, Expenses: $40,239.87.. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Buford, Thomas)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1850 FINAL APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 3/1/2022 to 8/1/2022, Fee: $2,676,852.50, Expenses: $152,304.89. Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Amounts requested reflect 100% of fees and expenses incurred during time period. Modified on 9/2/2022 (TLJ).
August 31, 2022 Filing 1849 FINAL APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Northwest CPA Group, PLLC, Other Professional, Period: 6/1/2022 to 8/1/2022, Fee: $66,168.20, Expenses: $425.55.. Filed by Northwest CPA Group, PLLC. (Buford, Thomas)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1848 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Dundon Advisers, LLC (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1847). (Welch, Joseph)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1847 FINAL APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 3/5/2021 to 8/1/2022, Fee: $1,419,377.00, Expenses: $4,541.87. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph) ) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Amounts requested reflect 100% of fees and expenses incurred to date. Modified on 8/31/2022 (TLJ).
August 31, 2022 Filing 1846 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1845). (Welch, Joseph)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1845 FINAL APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 3/3/2021 to 8/1/2022, Fee: $4,388,340.50, Expenses: $22,037.30. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Amounts requested reflect 100% of fees and expenses incurred to date. Modified on 8/31/2022 (TLJ).
August 31, 2022 Filing 1844 FINAL APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 6/1/2022 to 8/1/2022, Fee: $44556.00, Expenses: $188.71.. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1843 FINAL APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 4/15/2021 to 7/31/2022, Fee: $2,569,482.45, Expenses: $50,279.61.. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Durbin, Christopher) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Amounts requested reflect 100% of fees and expenses incurred to date. Modified on 8/31/2022 (TLJ).
August 25, 2022 Filing 1842 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Dundon Advisers, LLC (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1840, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1841). (Welch, Joseph)
August 25, 2022 Filing 1841 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Dundon Advisers, LLC (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1840). (Welch, Joseph)
August 25, 2022 Filing 1840 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 1/1/2022 to 8/1/2022, Fee: $278942.40, Expenses: $3138.43. Filed by Dundon Advisers, LLC. (Welch, Joseph) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Fee amount reflects 80% of fees incurred and requested. Modified on 9/1/2022 (TLJ).
August 22, 2022 Filing 1839 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176 for the Month Ending: 07/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Part 2-Attachment #2 Part 3-Bank Statements) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
August 22, 2022 Filing 1838 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 07/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Part 2-Attachment #2 Part 3-Attachment) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1837 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Fees Awarded: $95825.50, Expenses Awarded: $287.94 (RE: #1811). (TLJ)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1836 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1811 )
August 18, 2022 Filing 1835 DECLARATION of No Objections to Interim Application of Davis Wright Tremaine (March 1-31 2022). Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1811) and Notice (Docket No. #1812), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1813). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1811, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1812, Certificate of Service#1813). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
August 17, 2022 Filing 1834 JOINDER signed by Christopher B. Durbin (RE: Motion to Authorize#1829). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Plan Administrator (Durbin, Christopher)
August 15, 2022 Filing 1833 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by Joseph McCormick III on behalf of Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC (McCormick, Joseph)
August 15, 2022 Filing 1832 STIPULATION and Notice. Signed by Brian M. Donovan, United States Attorney's Office, Eastern District of Washington, on behalf of USDA/FSA and the filer.. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Plan Administrator (Durbin, Christopher) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Document includes notice. Modified on 8/16/2022 (TLJ).
August 15, 2022 Filing 1831 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by John C Black on behalf of Copenhaver Construction Inc (Black, John)
August 12, 2022 Filing 1830 JOINDER signed by Jeffrey C. Misley, Counsel to Cody and Debby Easterday (RE: Motion to Authorize#1829). Filed by Jeffrey C Misley on behalf of Cody and Debby Easterday (Misley, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2022 Filing 1829 MOTION to Interpret Third Modified Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation and Notice (RE: #1772) . Hearing scheduled 9/13/2022 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY. (Conway, Timothy) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified and hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 8/12/2022 (TLJ).
August 10, 2022 Filing 1828 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by Oren B Haker on behalf of Farmland Reserve, Inc. (Haker, Oren)
August 5, 2022 Filing 1827 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Plan Administrator (RE: Statement#1822). (Durbin, Christopher)
August 4, 2022 Filing 1826 REQUEST for Notice. Filed by Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC (Rawal, Arvind)
August 4, 2022 Filing 1825 REQUEST for Notice. Filed by Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC (Rawal, Arvind)
August 4, 2022 Filing 1824 REQUEST for Notice. Filed by Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC (Rawal, Arvind)
August 4, 2022 Filing 1823 REQUEST for Notice. Filed by Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC (Rawal, Arvind)
August 2, 2022 Filing 1822 NOTICE of Occurrence of Effective Date (RE: CH 11 Plan#1772, Order On Amended Chapter 11 Plan#1814). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Plan Administrator (Durbin, Christopher) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified. Modified on 8/3/2022 (TLJ).
July 29, 2022 Filing 1821 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notice of Confirmation of Chapter 11 Plan#1815, Notification of#1816). (Buford, Thomas)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1820 AMENDMENT to Noticing Address RE: Creditor. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1819 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notification of#1816). (Buford, Thomas)
July 28, 2022 Filing 1818 BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/28/2022. (Admin.)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1817 MINUTE Entry: Presentment Hearing Re: Confirmation Order. NOT HELD. Hearing stricken by the parties as it was no longer necessary. (RE: Notification of #1809 ). (NNU)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1816 NOTIFICATION of Confirmation of Third Modified Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation (RE: Order On Amended Chapter 11 Plan#1814). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1815 NOTICE of Confirmation of Chapter 11 Plan (RE: Order On Amended Chapter 11 Plan#1814). (TLJ)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1814 ORDER Confirming Third Modified Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation of Easterday Ranches, Inc. and Easterday Farms (RE: #1284, #1383, #1606, #1641, #1653, #1772). (TLJ)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1813 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1811, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1812). (Buford, Thomas)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1812 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1811). (Buford, Thomas)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1811 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 3/1/2022 to 5/31/2022, Fee: $95,825.50, Expenses: $287.94.. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1810 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1772 )
July 25, 2022 Filing 1809 NOTIFICATION of Filing Revised Proposed Form of Confirmation Order and Status Conference With Respect Thereto (RE: CH 11 Plan#1772, Minutes of Proceedings 1795 ). Hearing scheduled 7/26/2022 at 1:00 PM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 7/26/2022 (TLJ).
July 22, 2022 Filing 1808 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1807). (Welch, Joseph)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1807 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 6/1/2022 to 6/30/2022, Fee: $43291.60, Expenses: $474.78. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
July 21, 2022 Filing 1806 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1805). (Buford, Thomas)
July 21, 2022 Filing 1805 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 4/1/2022 to 4/30/2022, Fee: $302,910.00, Expenses: $44,670.42 and Notice. Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Date changed from 4/29/2022 to 4/30/2022 to match document. Modified on 7/22/2022 (TLJ).
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1804 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Fees Awarded: $1765819.00, Expenses Awarded: $79462.18 (RE: #1726). (TLJ)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1803 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Fees Awarded: $2184017.50, Expenses Awarded: $237969.36 (RE: #1376). (TLJ)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1802 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1726 )
July 20, 2022 Filing 1801 WITHDRAWAL (RE: Declaration of No Objections 1800 ). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1800 DECLARATION of No Objections re Fourth Interim Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1726) and Notice (Docket No. #1727), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1728). An objection was filed and has been resolved (Docket No. #1783) (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1726). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1799 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176-WLH for the Month Ending: 06/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 - attachments #2 Part 3 - bank statement #3 Part 4 - bank statement) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1798 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 - attachments #2 Part 3 - bank statement) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1797 DECLARATION of No Objections to Third Interim Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1376) and Notice (Docket No. #1377), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1379). No objections have been filed. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1376). (Buford, Thomas)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1796 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1376 )
July 19, 2022 Filing 1795 MINUTE Entry Re: Confirmation, Motions to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019, Motions to Shorten Time. HELD. No objections were filed or voiced relating to the 9019 motions and respective motions to shorten time. The court grants the motions and will sign the uploaded proposed orders. Based upon the record and presentations of counsel, the court approves the plan and will enter an order confirming plan. Counsel for the debtor will upload an order consistent with the corrections/edits spoken into the record. Appearances: Richard Pachulski, Thomas Buford, Jeffrey Dulberg, Richard Keeton, Paul Labov and Jason Rosell, attorneys for the debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Christopher Durbin, Weiru Fang and Michael Klein, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Alan Smith, attorney for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; Kevin O'Rourke, Michael Stewart and Mark Dewulf, attorneys for Big Bend Electric Cooperative, Inc; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Daniel Steinberg, attorney for Jodi Easterday, 3D Properties and Easterday Farms Produce; Russell Garrett, attorney for Easterday Dairy; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker, attorney for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Bruce Medeiros, attorney for Rabo AgriFinance, LLC; John Rizzardi, attorney for Segale Properties, LLC; Brian Donovan, attorney for the United States; Seth Freeman, Managing Director of B Riley Advisory (RE: Minutes of Proceedings 1647 , MOTION to Approve Compromise #1762 , MOTION to Approve Compromise #1756 , CH 11 Plan #1772 , Motion to Shorten Time #1764 , Motion to Shorten Time #1757 ). (NNU)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1794 ORDER Granting Third Omnibus Motion to Approve Stipulations Pursuant to FRBP 9019 (RE: #1762) . (TLJ)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1793 ORDER Granting Second Omnibus Motion to Approve Stipulations Pursuant to FRBP 9019 (RE: #1756) . (TLJ)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1792 ORDER Approving Stipulation by and among the Debtors and Farmland Reserve, Inc. (RE: #1616) . (TLJ)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1791 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1762 )
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1790 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1756 )
July 19, 2022 Filing 1789 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/19/2022 10:01:44 AM ]. File Size [ 42360 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:28:15 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1788 ORDER Shortening Time for Hearing on Debtors' Third Omnibus Motion to Approve Claims Stipulations (RE: #1764) . (TLJ)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1787 ORDER Shortening Time for Hearing on Debtors' Second Omnibus Motion to Approve Claims Stipulations (RE: #1757) . (TLJ)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1786 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1616 )
July 18, 2022 Filing 1785 OBJECTION (RE: Notification of#1773). Filed by Bruce K Medeiros on behalf of Rabo AgriFinance LLC (Medeiros, Bruce)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1784 MINUTE Entry Re: Objection to Claim(s) 108 by Claimant USDA/Farm Service Agency. NOT HELD. Per a stipulation filed on 7/8/2022 #1743 , the objection is deemed withdrawn. (RE: Objection to Claim(s) #1691 , Stipulation #1743 ). (NNU)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1783 OBJECTION. Filed by U.S. Trustee (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1726). (Dyer, Gary)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1782 MINUTE Entry Re: Objection to Claim(s) 44 by Claimant Performix Nutrition Systems. NOT HELD. Objection to claim has been withdrawn. (RE: Objection to Claim(s) #1693 , Withdrawal of Objection to Claim #1778 ). (NNU)
July 15, 2022 Filing 1781 NOTIFICATION of Proposed Agenda for Confirmation Hearing (RE: CH 11 Plan#1772, Notification of#1773). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
July 15, 2022 Filing 1780 AMENDED REPORT of Balloting (RE: Report of Balloting#1771, CH 11 Plan#1653). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard). DEPUTY Clerk Note: Amended added to docket text. Modified on 7/18/2022 (TLJ).
July 15, 2022 Filing 1779 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Confirmation of Third Modified Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan signed by Thomas A. Buford (RE: CH 11 Plan#1772). Hearing scheduled 7/19/2022 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 7/18/2022 (TLJ).
July 15, 2022 Filing 1778 WITHDRAWAL of Objection to Claim(s) 44 by Claimant PerforMix Nutrition System (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1693). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 15, 2022 Filing 1777 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notification of#1773). (Buford, Thomas)
July 15, 2022 Filing 1776 MINUTE Entry Re: Omnibus Objections to Claim(s) 12,20,26,27,31,37,52. NOT HELD. A declaration of no objections was filed, and an order granting the debtor's omnibus objection to claims has been signed. (RE: Objection to Claim(s) #1682 , OBJECTION to Claim #1775 ). (NNU)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1775 ORDER Granting Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate and Satisfied Claims)(RE: #1682) . (TLJ)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1774 ORDER Further Extending the Period to Remove Civil Actions. Time Extended through 9/29/2022 (RE: #1676) . (TLJ)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1773 NOTIFICATION of Filing of (I) Third Modified Third Amended Plan; (II) Plan Documents; and (III) Confirmation Order (RE: CH 11 Plan#1772). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1772 AMENDED CHAPTER 11 Plan (RE: Chapter 11 Plan#965, CH 11 Plan#1284, CH 11 Plan#1383, CH 11 Plan#1606, CH 11 Plan#1641, CH 11 Plan#1653). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1771 REPORT of Balloting (RE: CH 11 Plan#1653). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1770 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1682 )
July 14, 2022 Filing 1769 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1682) and Notice (Docket No. #1682), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1688). No objections have been filed (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1682). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1768 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1676 )
July 13, 2022 Filing 1767 DECLARATION of No Objections to Debtors Motion for Order Further Extending the Period to Remove Civil Actions. Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1676) and Notice (Docket No. #1676), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1678). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion for Extension#1676). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1766 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1764 )
July 12, 2022 Filing 1765 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1756). (Buford, Thomas)
July 12, 2022 Filing 1764 MOTION to Shorten Time (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1762) --Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing on Third Omnibus Motion to Approve Claims Stipulations. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas)
July 12, 2022 Filing 1763 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1762). (Buford, Thomas)
July 12, 2022 Filing 1762 MOTION to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 to Approve Stipulations and Notice. Hearing scheduled 7/19/2022 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 7/13/2022 (TLJ).
July 12, 2022 Filing 1761 STIPULATION. Signed by Shawn B. Rediger for Farm Credit Services of America, PCA; Brian Madson, Director of Credit, RDO Equipment Co.; Timothy J. Conway for Karen Easterday, individually and as personal representative for the Estate of Gale A. Easterday; Jeffrey C. Misley for Cody and Debby Easterday and the filer.. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
July 12, 2022 Filing 1760 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1756). (Buford, Thomas)
July 12, 2022 Filing 1759 STIPULATION. Signed by Christopher G. Varallo for AgCountry Farm Credit Services, PCA, as attorney-in-fact for RDO Equipment Co. and AG Country Farm Credit Services, PCA; Timothy J. Conway for Karen Easterday, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Gale A. Easterday; Jeffrey C. Misley for Cody and Debby Easterday and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1758 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1757 )
July 11, 2022 Filing 1757 MOTION to Shorten Time (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1756) . Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1756 MOTION to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 of Claims Stipulations, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of Lance Miller and Notice. Hearing scheduled 7/19/2022 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 7/12/2022 (TLJ).
July 11, 2022 Filing 1755 DECLARATION signed by Nick Bottom, Director of Finance/Controller of PerforMix Nutrition Systems LLC (RE: Response to Objection to Claim#1754). Filed by John D Munding on behalf of PerforMix Nutrition Systems LLC (Munding, John)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1754 RESPONSE to Objection to Claim (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1693). Filed by John D Munding on behalf of PerforMix Nutrition Systems LLC (Munding, John)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1753 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Department of Justice, Farm Service Agency - United States Department of Agriculture, Small Business Administration (RE: Notice of Appearance#1752). (Donovan, Brian)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1752 NOTICE of Appearance. Filed by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Department of Justice, Small Business Administration, Farm Service Agency - United States Department of Agriculture (Donovan, Brian)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1751 STIPULATION. Signed by John C. Black for Copenhaver Construction, Inc. and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1750 STIPULATION. Signed by Brian M. Donovan, District Counsel for the U.S. Small Business Administration and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1749 STIPULATION. Signed by Amit D. Ranade for John Deer Financial, f.s.b.; Timothy J. Conway for Karen Easterday, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Gale A. Easterday; Jeffery C. Misley for Cody and Debby Easterday and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 8, 2022 Filing 1748 OBJECTION to Confirmation of Plan (RE: CH 11 Plan#1653). Filed by Bruce K Medeiros on behalf of Rabo AgriFinance LLC (Medeiros, Bruce)
July 8, 2022 Filing 1747 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of Big Bend Electric Cooperative, Inc. (RE: Objection to Confirmation of Plan#1745, Memorandum#1746). (ORourke, Kevin)
July 8, 2022 Filing 1746 MEMORANDUM signed by Kevin O'Rourke, Mark Dewulf, and Michael Stewart in Support of Big Bend Electric Cooperative, Inc.'s Limited Objection to Second Modified Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation of Easterday Ranches, Inc. and Easterday Farms (RE: Objection to Confirmation of Plan#1745). Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of Big Bend Electric Cooperative, Inc. (ORourke, Kevin)
July 8, 2022 Filing 1745 OBJECTION to Confirmation of Plan (RE: CH 11 Plan#1653). Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of Big Bend Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B) (ORourke, Kevin)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1744 ORDER Granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9010-1(a)(3) and Local Rule 83.2 of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington, Attorney Michael Stewart for Big Bend Electric Cooperative, Inc. is hereby admitted pro hac vice to practice in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case and any related bankruptcy cases and adversary proceedings. Counsel of record, Kevin D. ORourke, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. SO ORDERED. Whitman L. Holt, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. TEXT-ONLY ORDER; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL BE ISSUED. RECEIPT Number Waived, Fee Amount $0.00 (RE: #1741). (TLJ)
July 8, 2022 Filing 1743 STIPULATION. Signed by Brian M. Donovan for USDA/Farm Service Agency and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1742 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by ORourke, Kevin. (RE: #1741 )
July 8, 2022 Filing 1741 APPLICATION for Michael Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Waiver of the Application Fee. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of Big Bend Electric Cooperative, Inc. (ORourke, Kevin) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Changed capitalization of docket text to Initial Caps and clarified entry. Modified on 7/8/2022 (TLJ).
July 7, 2022 Filing 1740 STIPULATION. Signed by Britta E. Warren for A & M Supply, Inc.; Timothy J. Conway for Karen Easterday, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Gale A. Easterday; Jeffery C. Misley for Cody and Debby Easterday and the filer. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Signing Attorney added to docket text. Modified on 7/8/2022 (TLJ).
July 7, 2022 Filing 1739 STIPULATION. Signed by H. Gray Burks, IV for Orion First Financial LLC as account servicer for Midland States Bank; Timothy J. Conway for Karen Easterday, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Gale A. Easterday; Jeffery C. Misley for Cody and Debby Easterday and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 6, 2022 Filing 1738 STIPULATION. Signed by Tara J. Schleicher for DLL Finance LLC, Timothy J. Conway for Karen Easterday, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Gale A. Easterday, and Jeffrey C. Misley for Cody and Debby Easterday and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
July 5, 2022 Filing 1737 WITHDRAWAL of Claim(s): 17. Filed by Britta E Warren on behalf of A & M Supply, Inc. (Warren, Britta)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1736 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notification of#1733). (Buford, Thomas)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1735 STIPULATION. Signed by Scott R. Smith for The McGregor Company; Timothy J. Conway for Karen Easterday, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Gale A. Easterday; and Jeffrey C. Misley for Cody and Debby Easterday and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1734 STIPULATION. Signed by Brian Brager for Bradford Capital Holdings, LP and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 29, 2022 Filing 1733 NOTIFICATION of 1st Plan Supplement to Second Modified Third Amended Joint Ch 11 Plan & Proposed Confirmation Order (RE: CH 11 Plan#1653, Order on Motion to Authorize#1658). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 29, 2022 Filing 1732 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice. Filed by Mark Dewulf on behalf of Big Bend Electric Cooperative, Inc. (Dewulf, Mark)
June 29, 2022 Filing 1731 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of Big Bend Electric Cooperative, Inc. (RE: Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice#1730). (ORourke, Kevin)
June 29, 2022 Filing 1730 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice. Filed by Kevin ORourke on behalf of Big Bend Electric Cooperative, Inc. (ORourke, Kevin)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1729 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/28/2022 10:28:49 AM ]. File Size [ 10232 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:21:19 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
June 28, 2022 Filing 1728 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1726, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1727). (Buford, Thomas)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1727 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1726). (Buford, Thomas)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1726 FOURTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 12/1/2021 to 2/28/2022, Fee: $1,765,819.00, Expenses: $79,462.18.. Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1725 ORDER Granting Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Approve Claims Stipulations (RE: #1699) . (TLJ)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1724 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 - Claims Stipulations; Motion to Shorten Time. HELD. Based upon the record, the court grants the motion to shorten time, and grants the omnibus motion approving the claims stipulations. A new order will be uploaded to encompass the stipulations (the individual proposed orders can be withdrawn/will not be signed) . Appearances: Jason Rosell and Thomas Buford, attorneys for debtor; Weiru Fang, attorney for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Alan Smith, attorney for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker, attorney for Farmland Reserve, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise #1699 ). (NNU)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1723 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1699 )
June 28, 2022 Filing 1722 WITHDRAWAL (RE: Received Unsigned Order#1687). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1721 WITHDRAWAL (RE: Received Unsigned Order#1685). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1720 WITHDRAWAL (RE: Received Unsigned Order#1684). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1719 ORDER Shortening Time for Hearing on Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Approve Claims Stipulations (RE: #1700) . (TLJ)
June 27, 2022 Filing 1718 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1714). (Buford, Thomas)
June 27, 2022 Filing 1717 STIPULATION. Signed by Steven H. Sackmann for Sunray Farms, LLC and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 27, 2022 Filing 1716 STIPULATION. Signed by Steven H. Sackmann for Weyns Farms, LLC and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 27, 2022 Filing 1715 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by Jed W Morris on behalf of Washington Trust Bank (Morris, Jed)
June 27, 2022 Filing 1714 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 5/1/2022 to 5/31/2022, Fee: $13,164.80, Expenses: $22,743.30 and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Expense amount changed from $22743.00 to $22743.30. Modified on 6/27/2022 (TLJ).
June 24, 2022 Filing 1713 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1712). (Buford, Thomas)
June 23, 2022 Filing 1712 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 5/1/2022 to 5/31/2022, Fee: $37,931.60, Expenses: $88.20. and Notice. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
June 23, 2022 Filing 1711 MINUTE Entry Re: OMNIBUS Objection to Claim(s) 67, 68, 69, 70, 71, 72, 73, 74, 75, 76, 77, 78, 79, 80, 81, 82, 83, 84, 85, 88, 89, 90, 91, 92, 93, 94, 95, 96, 97 by Claimant Benton County Treasurer. NOT HELD. A declaration of no objections was filed, and an order granting the objection to claims was signed 6/22/22. (RE: Objection to Claim(s) #1648 ). (NNU)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1710 ORDER Granting Omnibus Objection to Claims of Benton County Treasurer (Satisfied Claims) (RE: #1648) . (TLJ)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1709 ORDER Further Extending the Time Periods During Which the Debtors have the Exclusive Right to File a Plan and to Solicit Acceptances (RE: #1660). (TLJ)
June 22, 2022 Filing 1708 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1699). (Buford, Thomas)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1707 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1660 )
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1706 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1648 )
June 22, 2022 Filing 1705 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1660) and Notice (Docket No. #1660), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1663). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion to Extend or Limit Exclusivity Period#1660). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
June 22, 2022 Filing 1704 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1648) and Notice (Docket No. #1648), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1650). No objections have been filed (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1648, Declaration#1649). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
June 21, 2022 Filing 1703 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176 for the Month Ending: 05/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #2 Bank Statement (WTB) #3 Bank Statement (Axos)) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 21, 2022 Filing 1702 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 05/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #2 Bank Statement) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1701 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1700 )
June 21, 2022 Filing 1700 MOTION to Shorten Time (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1699) . Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Keeton, Richard)
June 21, 2022 Filing 1699 MOTION to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 - Claims Stipulations, Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Lance Miller and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 6/28/2022 at 10:30 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 6/22/2022 (TLJ).
June 21, 2022 Filing 1698 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1693). (Keeton, Richard)
June 21, 2022 Filing 1697 STIPULATION. Signed by Michael G. Brady on behalf of Commercial Tire, Inc. and the filer.. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
June 21, 2022 Filing 1696 STIPULATION. Signed by Paul M. Larson on behalf of PHI Financial Services, Inc., Thomas A. Buford on behalf of Debtors and Debtors in Possession, Timothy J. Conway on behalf of Karen Easterday, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Gale A. Easterday and Jeffrey C. Misley on behalf of Cody and Debby Easterday. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Signing Attorneys added to docket text. Modified on 6/21/2022 (TLJ).
June 20, 2022 Filing 1695 STIPULATION. Signed by Angela Rapp-Williams on behalf of Ally Bank and the filer.. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
June 20, 2022 Filing 1694 STIPULATION. Signed by Joseph T. McCormick on behalf of Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC and the filer.. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
June 20, 2022 Filing 1693 OBJECTION to Claim(s) 44 by Claimant Performix Nutrition Systems and Notice. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. The Hearing date is set for 7/20/2022 at 01:30 PM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Keeton, Richard)
June 17, 2022 Filing 1692 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1691). (Buford, Thomas)
June 17, 2022 Filing 1691 OBJECTION to Claim(s) 108 by Claimant USDA/Farm Service Agency, NOTICE of Hearing. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. The Hearing date is set for 7/20/2022 at 01:30 PM at Tower Bldg, 2nd Floor Courtroom, 402 East Yakima Avenue, Yakima, WA. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Notice of Hearing added to docket text. Modified on 6/17/2022 (TLJ).
June 15, 2022 Filing 1690 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1689). (Welch, Joseph)
June 15, 2022 Filing 1689 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 5/1/2022 to 5/31/2022, Fee: $100,884.40, Expenses: $174.16. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
June 15, 2022 Filing 1688 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1682). (Buford, Thomas)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1687 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1686 )
June 14, 2022 Filing 1686 STIPULATED Motion for Brad Curtis Farms, LLC Claims. Signed by Toni Meacham, Attorney for Brad Curtis Farms, LLC and the filer. (RE: CH 11 Plan#1653).. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Keeton, Richard)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1685 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1683 )
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1684 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1673 )
June 14, 2022 Filing 1683 STIPULATED Motion for Resolving Simplot Claims. Signed by Joshua J. Busey Attorney for J.R. Simplot Company dba Simplot Western Stockman's and Simplot AB Retail, Inc. dba Simplot Grower Solutions and the filer. (RE: CH 11 Plan#1653).. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 14, 2022 Filing 1682 OMNIBUS Objection to Claim(s) 12,20,26,27,31,37,52 by Claimant A-1 Industrial Supply; Alto Nutrients, LLC fka Pacific Ag Products, LLC; M & M Bolt Co., LLC Viterra Canada Inc.; Cascade Earth Sciences Ltd.; Rangeview Ag Labor LLC; Shaw Horn Rapids, LLC and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. The Hearing date is set for 7/20/2022 at 01:30 PM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1681 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1680). (Buford, Thomas)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1680 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 4/1/2022 to 4/30/2022, Fee: $23,132.80, Expenses: $7,377.36. and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Buford, Thomas)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1679 MINUTE Entry Re: Monthly Status Conference and Omnibus Hearing. NOT HELD. Given that there are no matters scheduled for hearing and by request of debtor's counsel, this hearing is stricken. (RE: Order #1291 ). (NNU)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1678 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion for Extension#1676, Declaration#1677). (Buford, Thomas)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1677 DECLARATION in Support of Debtors' Motion for Order Further Extending the Period to Remove Civil Actions signed by T. Scott Avila (RE: Motion for Extension#1676). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1676 MOTION for Extension of the Period to Remove Civil Actions and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1675 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1674). (Buford, Thomas)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1674 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 4/1/2022 to 4/30/2022, Fee: $14,508.40, Expenses: $104.74. and Notice. Filed by (Buford, Thomas)
June 10, 2022 ADVERSARY Proceeding 2:21-ap-80044 Reclosed. (CMR)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1673 STIPULATED Motion for Claim Treatment. Signed by Jennifer K. Faubion, Attorneys for Segale Properties, LLC and the filer... Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1672 ORDER Directing DLL Finance LLC to Produce Documents Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2004 (RE: #1664). (TLJ)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1671 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Fees Awarded: $60172.00, Expenses Awarded: $8412.00 (RE: #1600). (TLJ)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1670 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Fees Awarded: $44709.50, Expenses Awarded: $165.94 (RE: #1596). (TLJ)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1669 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1596 )
June 7, 2022 Filing 1668 DECLARATION of No Objections to Fourth Interim Application of Davis Wright Tremaine LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement. Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1596) and Notice (Docket No. #1597), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1599). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1596, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1597, Certificate of Service#1599). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1667 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: CH 11 Plan#1653, Disclosure Statement#1654, Order on Motion to Authorize#1658, Notification of#1659). (Buford, Thomas)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1666 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: CH 11 Plan#1653, Disclosure Statement#1654, Order on Motion to Authorize#1658, Notification of#1659). (Buford, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1665 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1664 )
June 2, 2022 Filing 1664 MOTION for 2004 Examination of DLL Finance LLC - Not Scheduled. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Keeton, Richard)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1663 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Extend or Limit Exclusivity Period#1660). (Buford, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1662 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1600 )
June 2, 2022 Filing 1661 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1600) and Notice (Docket No. #1601), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1608). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1600, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1601, Certificate of Service#1608). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
June 1, 2022 Filing 1660 MOTION to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Solicit Acceptances and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 6/28/2022 at 10:30 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified and hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 6/2/2022 (TLJ).
May 31, 2022 Filing 1659 NOTICE of Hearing, NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object (filed as NOTIFICATION of (A) Confirmation Hearing on Third Amended Plan; (B) Voting Deadline; and (C) Related Matters and corrected by court)(RE: CH 11 Plan#1653, Order on Motion to Authorize#1658). Confirmation hearing scheduled 7/19/2022 at 10:00 AM at Tower Bldg, 2nd Floor Courtroom, 402 East Yakima Avenue, Yakima, WA. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard) Modified on 6/1/2022 (TLJ).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1658 ORDER Approving (I) Proposed Disclosure Statement; (II) Solicitation and Voting Procedures; (III) Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of Third Amended Joint Plan of Liquidation; and (IV) Related Relief (RE: #966). Confirmation hearing scheduled 7/19/2022 at 10:00 AM at Tower Bldg, 2nd Floor Courtroom, 402 East Yakima Avenue, Yakima, WA. (TLJ)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1657 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1652). (Durbin, Christopher)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1656 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1651). (Durbin, Christopher)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1655 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #966 )
May 27, 2022 Filing 1654 AMENDED DISCLOSURE Statement (RE: Disclosure Statement#964, Disclosure Statement#1283, Disclosure Statement#1382, Disclosure Statement#1607, Disclosure Statement#1642). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1653 AMENDED CHAPTER 11 Plan (RE: Chapter 11 Plan#965, CH 11 Plan#1284, CH 11 Plan#1383, CH 11 Plan#1606, CH 11 Plan#1641). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1652 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 4/1/2022 to 4/30/2022, Fee: $24,970.96, Expenses: $1,888.91. and Notice. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1651 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 3/1/2022 to 3/31/2022, Fee: $55,816.94, Expenses: $1,461.78. and Notice. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1650 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1648, Declaration#1649). (Buford, Thomas)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1649 DECLARATION in Support of Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Claims of Benton County Treasurer signed by Peter Richter (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1648). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1648 OMNIBUS Objection to Claim(s) 67,68,69,70,71,72,73,74,75,76,77,78,79,80,81,82,83,84,85,88,89,90,91,92,93,94,95,96,97 by Claimant Benton County Treasurer and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. The Hearing date is set for 6/28/2022 at 10:30 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
May 25, 2022 Filing 1647 MINUTE Entry Re: Approval of Disclosure Statement. HELD. After hearing comments from counsel, the court approves the amended disclosure statement. Next monthly hearing is scheduled for 6/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. Confirmation hearing scheduled 07/19/2022 at 10:00 AM at Tower Bldg, 2nd Floor Courtroom, 402 East Yakima Avenue, Yakima, WA (with a telephonic option). Appearances: Richard Pachulski and Jason Rosell, attorneys for the debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Weiru Fang and Michael Klein, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley Cosman and Alan Smith, attorneys for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; Shawn Rediger, attorney for AgDirect and Farm Credit Services of America; Tara Schleicher, attorney for DLL Finance; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Daniel Steinberg, attorney for Jodi Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker, attorney for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Paul Larson, attorney for PHI Financial Services, Inc.; Jennifer K. Faubion and John Rizzardi, attorneys for Segale Properties LLC; Joseph McCormick, attorney for Bank of America. (RE: Notice of Continuance#1569, Motion to Authorize#966, Disclosure Statement#1642). (NNU) DEPUTY Clerk Note: appearances of counsel added to docket text. Modified on 5/25/2022 (NNU).
May 25, 2022 Filing 1646 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/25/2022 9:59:33 AM ]. File Size [ 18376 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:38:17 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1645 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Fees Awarded: $706488.00, Expenses Awarded: $2211.32 (RE: #1592). (TLJ)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1644 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Fees Awarded: $517296.95, Expenses Awarded: $11923.12 (RE: #1582). (TLJ)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1643 NOTICE of Motion, NOTICE of Hearing (RE: CH 11 Plan#1641, Disclosure Statement#1642). Hearing scheduled 5/25/2022 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified and hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 5/25/2022 (TLJ).
May 24, 2022 Filing 1642 AMENDED DISCLOSURE Statement (RE: Disclosure Statement#964, Disclosure Statement#1283, Disclosure Statement#1382, Disclosure Statement#1607). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1641 AMENDED CHAPTER 11 Plan (RE: Chapter 11 Plan#965, CH 11 Plan#1284, CH 11 Plan#1383, CH 11 Plan#1606). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1640 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Welch, Joseph. (RE: #1592 )
May 24, 2022 Filing 1639 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1592) and Notice (Docket No. #1593), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1594). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1592). Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1638 WITHDRAWAL of Objection to Disclosure Statement, ECF No. 1382 (RE: Objection#1449). Filed by Steven H Sackmann on behalf of Sunray Farms, Weyns Farms (Sackmann, Steven)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1637 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Durbin, Christopher. (RE: #1582 )
May 23, 2022 Filing 1636 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1582) and Notice (Docket No. #1583), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1589). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1582, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1583, Certificate of Service#1589). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (Durbin, Christopher)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1635 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2 - Bank Statement (Washington Trust)) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1634 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176 for the Month Ending: 04/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2 - Bank Statement (Axos) #3 Attachment 3 - Bank Statement (Washington Trust)) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
May 19, 2022 Filing 1633 WITHDRAWAL of Objection to Disclosure Statement, ECF No. 1283 (RE: Objection#1461). Filed by Stephen J Felice on behalf of Pegram Construction, Inc (Felice, Stephen)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1632 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of B. Riley Advisory Services (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1626). (Durbin, Christopher)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1631 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at a hearing held on May 18, 2022, the motion for relief from the automatic stay filed by Ally Bank [ECF No. 1387] is denied without prejudice. SO ORDERED. Whitman L. Holt, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. TEXT-ONLY ORDER; NO DOCUMENT CREATED. (RE: #1387) . (NNU)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1630 WITHDRAWAL of Motion for Relief from Stay, ECF No. 1387. Filed by Robert Scott Kennard on behalf of Ally Bank (RE: Motion for Relief from Stay#1387). (Kennard, Robert)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1629 MINUTE Entry Re: Monthly Status Conference and Omnibus Hearing; Ally Bank's Motion for Relief From Stay. HELD. There was no appearance on behalf of Ally Bank. The court denied the motion for relief from stay without prejudice and a text order will be entered. The parties provided the court with a case update. Next scheduled hearing is re: the disclosure statement on 5/25/2022 at 10:00AM by phone. Appearances: Thomas A. Buford and Jason Rosell, attorneys for the debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Christopher Durbin and Weiru Fang, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley Cosman, attorney for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Megan Adeyamo, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; Shawn Rediger, attorney for AgDirect and Farm Credit Services of America; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Russell Garrett, attorney for Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Ellen Ostrow, attorney for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Jennifer K. Faubion and John Rizzardi, attorneys for Segale Properties LLC; Joseph McCormick, attorney for Bank of America; Brian Donovan, Department of Justice. (RE: Minutes of Proceedings 1496 , Motion for Relief from Stay #1387 ). (NNU)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1628 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/18/2022 10:59:53 AM ]. File Size [ 7424 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:15:28 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
May 17, 2022 Filing 1627 NOTIFICATION of Withdrawal of Objection to Disclosure Statement for Second Amended Joint Plan of Liquidation signed by Michael R. Johnson (filed as RESPONSE and corrected by court)(RE: Objection#1401). Filed by Michael Robert Johnson on behalf of Rabo AgriFinance LLC (Johnson, Michael) Modified on 5/18/2022 (TLJ).
May 16, 2022 Filing 1626 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for B. Riley Advisory Services, Financial Advisor, Period: 1/1/2022 to 1/31/2022, Fee: $29,260.40, Expenses: $9.80. and Notice. Filed by B. Riley Advisory Services. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1625 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1624). (Welch, Joseph)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1624 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 4/1/2022 to 4/30/2022, Fee: $91809.60, Expenses: $342.95. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1623 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notification of#1610). (Buford, Thomas)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1622 STATUS Report for May 18, 2022 Status Conference. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1621 ORDER Further Extending the Period to Remove Civil Actions through and including 7/1/2022 (RE: #1573). (TLJ)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1620 ORDER Further Extending the Time Periods During Which the Debtors Have the Exclusive Right to File a Plan and to Solicit Acceptances (RE: #1559). (TLJ)
May 13, 2022 Filing 1619 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of B. Riley Advisory Services (RE: Notification of#1605). (Durbin, Christopher)
May 13, 2022 Filing 1618 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of B. Riley Advisory Services (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1604). (Durbin, Christopher)
May 13, 2022 Filing 1617 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of B. Riley Advisory Services (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1603). (Durbin, Christopher)
May 12, 2022 Filing 1616 STIPULATED Motion for re Administrative Claim Bar Date and Sale Order. Signed by Oren B. Haker and the filer. (RE: Order#927, Order on Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date#1532).. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
May 12, 2022 Filing 1615 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by Deborah A. Crabbe on behalf of Bank of the West (Crabbe, Deborah)
May 12, 2022 Filing 1614 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1573) and Notice (Docket No. #1573), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1579). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion to Extend Time to File Document#1573, Declaration#1574). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1613 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1573 )
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1612 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1559 )
May 12, 2022 Filing 1611 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1559) and Notice (Docket No. #1559), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1571). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion to Extend or Limit Exclusivity Period#1559). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1610 NOTIFICATION of Third Amended Joint Ch 11 Plan of Liquidation, Revised Disclosure Statement & Solicitation Materials (RE: Motion to Authorize#966, CH 11 Plan#1383, Order on Motion to Authorize#1560, CH 11 Plan#1606, Disclosure Statement#1607). The Hearing date is set for 5/25/2022 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 5/12/2022 (TLJ).
May 11, 2022 Filing 1609 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1602). (Buford, Thomas)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1608 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1600, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1601). (Buford, Thomas)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1607 AMENDED DISCLOSURE Statement (RE: Disclosure Statement#964, Disclosure Statement#1283, Disclosure Statement#1382, CH 11 Plan#1606). The Hearing date is set for 5/25/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 5/12/2022 (TLJ).
May 11, 2022 Filing 1606 AMENDED CHAPTER 11 Plan (RE: Chapter 11 Plan#965, CH 11 Plan#1284, CH 11 Plan#1383). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1605 NOTIFICATION of 2022 Professional Fee Hourly Rates of B. Riley Advisory Services (RE: ORDER Approving Employment#540). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of B. Riley Advisory Services (Durbin, Christopher)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1604 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for B. Riley Advisory Services, Financial Advisor, Period: 12/1/2021 to 12/31/2021, Fee: $50,211.60, Expenses: $13.00. and Notice. Filed by B. Riley Advisory Services. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1603 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for B. Riley Advisory Services, Financial Advisor, Period: 11/1/2021 to 11/30/2021, Fee: $58,008.00, Expenses: $12.00. and Notice. Filed by B. Riley Advisory Services. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1602 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 3/1/2022 to 3/31/2022, Fee: $710,475.20, Expenses: $34136.92. and Notice. Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1601 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1600). (Buford, Thomas)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1600 FOURTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 12/1/2021 to 2/28/2022, Fee: $60,172.00, Expenses: $8,412.00.. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1599 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1596, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1597). (Buford, Thomas)
May 6, 2022 Filing 1598 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Transfer of Claim Notice Date 05/06/2022. (Admin.)
May 6, 2022 ADVERSARY Proceeding 2:21-ap-80010 Closed. (TJL)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1597 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Davis Wright Tremaine LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1596). (Buford, Thomas)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1596 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 12/1/2021 to 2/28/2022, Fee: $44,709.50, Expenses: $165.94.. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas)
May 3, 2022 Filing 1595 TRANSFER/ Assignment of Claim. Fee Amount $26 Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Production Animal Consultation LLC (Claim No. 99) To CRG Financial LLC. Filed by CRG Financial LLC (Kalb, Shannon)
May 3, 2022 RECEIPT of Transfer/ Assignment of Claim (fee)(# 21-00141-WLH11) [claims,trclm] ( 26.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A7962841. Fee amount 26.00 (RE: Transfer/ Assignment of Claim (fee)#1595). (U.S. Treasury)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1594 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1592, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1593). (Welch, Joseph)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1593 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1592). (Welch, Joseph)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1592 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 1/1/2022 to 3/31/2022, Fee: $706488, Expenses: $2211.32.. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1591 ORDER Approving Stipulation Resolving Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay re Creditor Santander Consumer USA Inc. (RE: #1437) . (TLJ)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1590 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Olsen, Lance. (RE: #1437 )
April 26, 2022 Filing 1589 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1582, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1583). (Durbin, Christopher)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1588 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1581). (Durbin, Christopher)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1587 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1585). (Buford, Thomas)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1586 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1584). (Buford, Thomas)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1585 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 3/1/2022 to 3/31/2022, Fee: $34,651.20, Expenses: $3,476.40. and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Buford, Thomas)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1584 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 3/1/2022 to 3/31/2022, Fee: $24,220.40, Expenses: $95.00. and Notice. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1583 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1582). (Durbin, Christopher)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1582 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 11/1/2021 to 1/31/2022, Fee: $517,296.94, Expenses: $11,923.12.. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Durbin, Christopher)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1581 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 2/1/2022 to 2/28/2022, Fee: $46,430.74, Expenses: $2,535.58. and Notice. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1580 OMNIBUS Stipulated Standstill Order (RE: Motion to Authorize#1543, Order on Motion to Authorize#1560). (TLJ)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1579 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Extend Time to File Document#1573, Declaration#1574). (Buford, Thomas)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1578 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966, Notice of Continuance#1569). (Buford, Thomas)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1577 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2-Bank Statements) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1576 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2-Bank Statements) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1575 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Conway, Timothy. (RE: #1560 )
April 21, 2022 Filing 1574 DECLARATION in Support of Debtors' Motion for Order Further Extending Period to Remove Civil Actions signed by T. Scott Avila (RE: Motion to Extend Time to File Document#1573). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1573 MOTION to Extend Time to File Document: Period to Remove Civil Actions to July 1, 2022 and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 5/18/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 4/22/2022 (TLJ).
April 21, 2022 Filing 1572 STIPULATED ORDER Approving Settlement Agreement and Release with Washington Trust Bank (RE: #1431). (TLJ)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1571 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Extend or Limit Exclusivity Period#1559). (Buford, Thomas)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1570 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966, Notice of Continuance#1569). (Buford, Thomas)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1569 NOTICE of Continuance Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966). The Hearing date is set for 5/25/2022 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1568 ORDER Granting Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 with CHS Inc. (RE: #1433). (TLJ)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1567 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1566). (Welch, Joseph)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1566 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 3/1/2022 to 3/31/2022, Fee: $150,706.40, Expenses: $706.92. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1565 WITHDRAWAL of Notice and Motion of Party in Interest Debby Easterday for the Appointment of Fee Examiner, ECF No. 1482 (RE: Notice of Hearing#1482). Filed by Russell D Garrett on behalf of Debby Easterday (Garrett, Russell)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1564 WITHDRAWAL of Notice and Motion of Party in Interest Debby Easterday for the Appointment of Fee Examiner, ECF No. 1481 (RE: Motion to Appoint Examiner#1481). Filed by Russell D Garrett on behalf of Debby Easterday (Garrett, Russell)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1563 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1431 )
April 20, 2022 Filing 1562 WITHDRAWAL of Objection to Debtors' Motion to Approve Settlement With CHS Inc., ECF No. 1466 (RE: Response#1466). Filed by Jeffrey C Misley on behalf of Cody and Debby Easterday (Misley, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1561 WITHDRAWAL of Joinder in Support of Cody and Debby Easterday's Response to Debtors' Notice and Motion to Approve Settlement with CHS Inc., ECF No. 1469 (RE: Joinder#1469). Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY (Conway, Timothy)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1560 ORDER Granting Debtors' Motion to Approve Global Settlement Term Sheet (RE: #1543). (TJL)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1559 MOTION to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement to 9/5/2022 and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 5/18/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Extend date and hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 4/21/2022 (TLJ).
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1558 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1543 )
April 19, 2022 Filing 1557 WITHDRAWAL of ORDER Uploaded, ECF No. 1556 (RE: Received Unsigned Order#1556). Filed by Christine M Tobin on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Tobin, Christine)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1556 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Tobin, Christine. (RE: #1543 )
April 19, 2022 Filing 1555 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Approve Global Settlement Term Sheet; Motion to Shorten Time. HELD. The court heard oral presentation from debtor's counsel and hearing no opposition from other parties, the court approves the settlement term sheet (with comments/corrections spoken on the record). Various other orders were granted relating to Washington Trust Bank, CHS, and standstill orders. Appearances: Richard M. Pachulski, Thomas A. Buford and Jason Rosell, attorneys for the debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Christopher Durbin and Weiru Fang, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Alan Smith and Bradley Cosman, attorneys for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey D. Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; Michael Stewart, attorney for CHS Capital, LLC; Shawn Rediger, attorney for AgDirect and Farm Credit Services of America; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Russell Garrett, attorneys for Easterday Dairy; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker and Ellen Ostrow, attorneys for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Paul Larson, attorney for PHI Financial Services, Inc.; Michael Johnson and Bruce Medeiros, attorneys for Rabo AgriFinance, LLC; John Rizzardi, attorney for Segale Properties LLC; Burke Jackowich, attorney for Washington Trust Bank; Brian Donovan, attorney for US Department of Justice (RE: Motion to Authorize #1543 , Motion to Shorten Time #1544 ). (NNU)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1554 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/19/2022 1:59:37 PM ]. File Size [ 31192 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:04:59 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1553 ORDER Shortening Time for Hearing on Debtors' Motion to Approve Global Settlement Term Sheet (RE: #1544) . (TLJ)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1552 NOTIFICATION of Filing of Stipulated Form of Order Approving the Settlement Agreement with Washington Trust Bank (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1431, Motion to Authorize#1543). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1551 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Bruce K Medeiros on behalf of Rabo AgriFinance LLC (RE: Objection#1550). (Medeiros, Bruce)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1550 OBJECTION (RE: Motion to Authorize#1543). Filed by Bruce K Medeiros on behalf of Rabo AgriFinance LLC (Medeiros, Bruce)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1549 MINUTE Entry Re: Monthly Status Conference and Omnibus Hearing. HELD. The parties provided a brief case status to the court, including of the filing of a Motion to Approve Global Settlement Term Sheet and that is scheduled to be heard Tuesday 4/19/2022 at 02:00 PM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. The evidentiary hearing related to adversary 22-80008, scheduled for 4/18/2022 at 11:00 AM in Yakima was stricken on the record. Appearances: Thomas A. Buford and Jason Rosell, attorneys for the debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Christopher Durbin and Weiru Fang, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley Cosman, attorney for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey D. Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Russell Garrett, attorney for Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker, attorney for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; John Rizzardi, attorneys for Segale Properties LLC; Burke Jackowich, attorney for Washington Trust Bank (RE: Order #1291 ). (NNU)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1548 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#1543). (Keeton, Richard)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1547 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/15/2022 10:58:57 AM ]. File Size [ 3000 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:15 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1546 ORDER Granting Motion For Payment of Adequate Protection and, in the Alternative, Relief from Stay (RE: #1504). (TLJ)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1545 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1544 )
April 14, 2022 Filing 1544 MOTION to Shorten Time (RE: Motion to Authorize#1543) . Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Keeton, Richard)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1543 MOTION to Approve Global Settlement Term Sheet and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 4/19/2022 at 02:00 PM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Keeton, Richard) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified and hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 4/15/2022 (TLJ).
April 14, 2022 Filing 1542 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1539). (Buford, Thomas)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1541 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Crabbe, Deborah. (RE: #1504 )
April 13, 2022 Filing 1540 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1504) and Notice (Docket No. #1505), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1508). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion for Adequate Protection#1504, Motion for Relief from Stay). Filed by Deborah A. Crabbe on behalf of Bank of the West (Crabbe, Deborah)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1539 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 2/1/2022 to 2/28/2022, Fee: $450,138.40, Expenses: $1,604.38. and Notice. Filed by (Buford, Thomas)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1538 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notification of#1536, Notification of#1537). (Buford, Thomas)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1537 NOTIFICATION of Deadline for Filing Rejection Damages Claims (RE: Order on Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date#1532). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Claim form) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1536 NOTIFICATION of Deadline for Filing Administrative Claims (RE: Order on Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date#1532). (Attachments: #1 Administrative Expense Claim Form) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1535 MINUTE Entry Re: Ally Bank's Motion for Relief From Stay. NOT HELD. Per parties request, hearing continued to 05/18/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (RE: Minutes of Proceedings 1496 , Motion for Relief from Stay #1387 ). (NNU)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1534 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Dundon Advisers, LLC (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1533). (Welch, Joseph)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1533 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 12/1/2021 to 12/31/2021, Fee: $43,512, Expenses: $. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1532 ORDER Establishing Administrative and Rejection Claims Bar Date May 13, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. (Pacific Time)(RE: #1516). (TLJ) Modified on 4/13/2022 (TLJ).
April 8, 2022 Filing 1531 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Shorten Time, Motion to Establish Deadlines. HELD. The court granted the Motion to Shorten Time, established the deadline for filing administrative claims and rejection damages bar date of 5/13/22, approved the form, manner, sufficiency of notice, and approved the proof of administrative claim form. Appropriate orders will be submitted and entered. Appearances: Richard M. Pachulski, Benjamin Wallen, Thomas A. Buford, attorneys for the debtors; Weiru Fang, attorney for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Shawn Rediger, attorney for AgDirect and Farm Credit Services of America PCA; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Michael Johnson and Bruce Medeiros, attorneys for Rabo AgriFinance; Burke Jackowich, attorney for Washington Trust Bank; Bradley A. Cosman, for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (RE: Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date #1516 , Motion to Shorten Time #1517 ). (JRG)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1530 WITHDRAWAL of Order Uploaded, ECF No. 1527 (RE: Received Unsigned Order#1527). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1529 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/8/2022 1:59:58 PM ]. File Size [ 15896 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:33:07 ]. (JanellGrubb).
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1528 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1516 )
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1527 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1517 )
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1526 ORDER Shortening Time for Hearing on Debtors' Motion (RE: #1517). (TLJ)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1525 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notice of Hearing - Amended#1523). (Buford, Thomas)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1524 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date#1516). (Buford, Thomas)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1523 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date#1516). The Hearing date is set for 4/8/2022 at 02:00 PM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1522 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Dundon Advisers, LLC (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1519, Application for Award of Compensation#1520, Application for Award of Compensation#1521). (Welch, Joseph)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1521 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 11/1/2021 to 11/30/2021, Fee: $60760.00, Expenses: $. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1520 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 10/1/2021 to 10/31/2021, Fee: $68,874.40, Expenses: $. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1519 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 9/1/2021 to 9/30/2021, Fee: $81300.80, Expenses: $. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1518 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1517 )
March 31, 2022 Filing 1517 MOTION to Shorten Time (RE: Motion to Establish Claims Bar Date#1516) . Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1516 MOTION to Establish Claims Bar Date and Notice. The Hearing is scheduled for 4/7/2022 at 02:30 PM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 4/1/2022 (TLJ).
March 29, 2022 Filing 1515 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1514). (Welch, Joseph)
March 29, 2022 Filing 1514 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 2/1/2022 to 2/28/2022, Fee: $156,851.60, Expenses: $548.99. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1513 MINUTE Entry Re: Evidentiary Hearing- Preliminary Injunction. Hearing originally scheduled on 4/18/2022 at 9:30AM HAS BEEN CHANGED TO 11:00 AM. The hearing location remains the same and will be at Tower Bldg, 2nd Floor Courtroom, 402 East Yakima Avenue, Yakima, WA (with a telephonic option). See Scheduling and Abatement Order #1511. (RE: Minutes of Proceedings 1499 , Order#1511). (NNU)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1512 AMENDMENT to Noticing Address RE: Creditor. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1511 SCHEDULING and Abatement Order. The Hearing date for the Preliminary Injunction and Discovery is set for 4/18/2022 at 11:00 AM at Tower Bldg, 2nd Floor Courtroom, 402 East Yakima Avenue, Yakima, WA (with a telephonic option). Original Order filed in Adversary case 22-80008-WLH ECF #27. (TLJ)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1510 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1509). (Buford, Thomas)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1509 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 1/1/2022 to 1/31/2022, Fee: $569,026.80, Expenses: $591.93. and Notice. Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1508 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Deborah A. Crabbe on behalf of Bank of the West (RE: Motion for Adequate Protection#1504, Motion for Relief from Stay, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1505, Declaration#1506, Declaration#1507). (Crabbe, Deborah)
March 25, 2022 RECEIPT of Payment of Fee(# 21-00141-WLH11) [misc,feepayot] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number $0 No Fee Collected - Duplicate Payment Fee amount 188.00 (RE: Payment of Fee). (KAC)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1507 DECLARATION signed by Tyerone Tye (RE: Motion for Adequate Protection#1504, Motion for Relief from Stay). Filed by Deborah A. Crabbe on behalf of Bank of the West (Crabbe, Deborah) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Event clarified. Modified on 3/24/2022 (JRG).
March 24, 2022 Filing 1506 DECLARATION Deborah Crabbe signed by Deborah Crabbe (RE: Motion for Adequate Protection#1504, Motion for Relief from Stay). Filed by Deborah A. Crabbe on behalf of Bank of the West (Crabbe, Deborah)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1505 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Deborah A. Crabbe on behalf of Bank of the West (RE: Motion for Adequate Protection#1504, Motion for Relief from Stay). (Crabbe, Deborah)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1504 MOTION for Adequate Protection , MOTION for Relief from Stay as to Mack Truck. Fee Amount $188. Filed by Deborah A. Crabbe on behalf of Bank of the West. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order Proposed Order) (Crabbe, Deborah)
March 24, 2022 PAYMENT of Fee. , Fee Amount $188. (RE: Motion for Adequate Protection#1504, Motion for Relief from Stay). Filed by Deborah A. Crabbe on behalf of Bank of the West (Crabbe, Deborah)
March 24, 2022 RECEIPT of Motion for Relief from Stay(# 21-00141-WLH11) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A7947080. Fee amount 188.00 (RE: Motion for Relief from Stay#1504). (U.S. Treasury)
March 22, 2022 Filing 1503 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1501). (Buford, Thomas)
March 22, 2022 Filing 1502 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1500). (Buford, Thomas)
March 22, 2022 Filing 1501 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 2/1/2022 to 2/28/2022, Fee: $16,734.40, Expenses: $2,879.25. and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Buford, Thomas)
March 22, 2022 Filing 1500 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 2/1/2022 to 2/28/2022, Fee: $8,750.00, Expenses: $77.18. and Notice. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1498 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176 for the Month Ending: 02/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2-Bank Statements) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1497 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2-Bank Statements) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
March 17, 2022 Filing 1495 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/16/2022 2:35:03 PM ]. File Size [ 12568 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:26:11 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
March 17, 2022 Filing 1494 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/16/2022 10:59:08 AM ]. File Size [ 73264 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:32:38 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
March 16, 2022 Filing 1499 MINUTE Entry Re: Various motions including those under adversary proceeding 22-80008, 21-80057, 21-80050. HELD. Based upon the record and argument of counsel, the court ruled the motion to appoint examiner, motion to compel, the allocation motion and scheduling conferences in the adversary proceedings are to be held in abeyance. As to the 9019 motions, if objections are resolved and settlements meet the standards, an agreed order can be presented to the court for approval. If objections are not resolved, a hearing can be scheduled. The hearing relating to the disclosure statement scheduled for 3/30/2022 is stricken and will be rescheduled at a later date. The hearing relating to director change/corporate governance issues will be held on 04/18/2022 at 09:30 AM at Tower Bldg, 2nd Floor Courtroom, 402 East Yakima Avenue, Yakima, WA (with a telephonic option). Supplemental briefing is due by end of the day 4/14/2022. Mr. Pachulski to submit a proposed form of a standstill order. Appearances: Richard M. Pachulski, Thomas A. Buford, Jeffrey Dulberg, Jeffrey Dulberg, Paul Labov and Jason Rosell, attorneys for the debtor; Jim Perkins, attorney for the US Trustee; Christopher Durbin, Weiru Fang and Michael Klein, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Alan Smith, attorney for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Michelle Green, attorney for 3E Properties; Jeffrey D. Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; William Brunnquell, attorney for CHS, Inc.; Michael Stewart, attorney for CHS Capital, LLC; Shawn Rediger, attorney for AgDirect and Farm Credit Services of America PCA; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Daniel Steinberg and Russell Garrett, attorneys for Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker, attorney for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Paul Larson, attorney for PHI Financial Services, Inc.; Michael Johnson and Bruce Medeiros, attorneys for Rabo AgriFinance, LLC; Jennifer K. Faubion and John Rizzardi, attorneys for Segale Properties LLC; Burke Jackowich, attorney for Washington Trust Bank; Clyde Allen Hamstreet, CEO of Easterday Farms (RE: Order#1291, MOTION to Approve Compromise#1431, MOTION to Approve Compromise#1433, Motion to Appoint Examiner#1481, Motion to Compel#1480, Complaint#1484). (NNU) . Modified on 3/18/2022 (NNU).
March 16, 2022 Filing 1496 MINUTE Entry Re: Ally Bank's Motion for Relief From Stay as to 2020 Ram 3500 Regular Cab Tradesman Pickup. HELD. There was no appearance on behalf of creditor Ally Bank, the court continued the matter to 04/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (RE: Motion for Relief from Stay#1387). (NNU) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing date and time corrected. Modified on 3/18/2022 (NNU).
March 16, 2022 Filing 1493 DOCUMENT Restricted Due to large file size, this audio file was split for convenient download. See audio files below #1494 #1495. PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/16/2022 10:59:08 AM ]. File Size [ 86280 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:59:45 ]. (NydiaUrlacher). Modified on 3/18/2022 (NNU).
March 15, 2022 Filing 1492 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Statement#1491). (Durbin, Christopher)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1491 STATEMENT signed by Christopher B. Durbin of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc. re Debtors' Twelfth Status Conference Report and in Support of Debtors' TRO Motion. (RE: Status Report#1474, Complaint#1484). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Durbin, Christopher)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1490 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Statement#1489). (Welch, Joseph)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1489 STATEMENT signed by Joseph Welch of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership re regarding Easterday Farms Partnership Issues. (RE: Status Report#1473, Status Report#1474). Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1488 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1431, Reply#1477). (Buford, Thomas)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1487 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1433, Reply#1476). (Buford, Thomas)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1486 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966, Notice of Continuance#1475). (Buford, Thomas)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1485 REPLY signed by William J. Brunnquell (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1433, Response#1466, Joinder#1469). Filed by William Brunnquell on behalf of CHS Inc. (Brunnquell, William)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1484 Adversary case 22-80008. COMPLAINT. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: (72 (Injunctive relief - other)) (Buford, Thomas)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1483 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Russell D Garrett on behalf of Debby Easterday (RE: Motion to Appoint Examiner#1481, Notice of Hearing#1482). (Garrett, Russell)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1482 NOTICE of Hearing. Filed by Russell D Garrett on behalf of Debby Easterday (RE: Motion to Appoint Examiner#1481). The Hearing date is set for 4/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Garrett, Russell)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1481 MOTION to Appoint Examiner and Notice. Filed by Russell D Garrett on behalf of Debby Easterday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Garrett, Russell)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1480 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Notice. Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY. (Conway, Timothy)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1479 DOCKETED in Error Pursuant to filing party. Document restricted. MOTION For Summary Judgment. Filed by Ava L. Schoen on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY (Schoen, Ava) Modified on 3/14/2022 (CMR).
March 14, 2022 Filing 1478 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Authorize Approval of (I) Proposed Disclosure Statement; (II) Solicitation and Voting Procedures; (III) Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of Joint Plan of Reorganization; (IV) Granting Related Relief. NOT HELD. Per notice of continuance, hearing continued per parties' request to 3/30/2022 at 11:00AM by telephone conference (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima (RE: Notice of Continuance #1396 , Disclosure Statement #964 , Notice of Continuance #1475 ). (NNU)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1477 REPLY signed by Thomas A. Buford (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1431, Response#1465, Objection#1468). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1476 REPLY signed by Thomas A. Buford (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1433, Response#1466, Joinder#1469). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1475 NOTICE of Continuance Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966, Notice of Continuance#1396, Minutes of Proceedings 1400 ). The Hearing date is set for 3/30/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1474 STATUS Report for March 16, 2022 Status Conference Signed by and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
March 13, 2022 Filing 1473 STATUS Conference Report and Notice of Unanimous Consent of Shareholders of Ranches. Hearing on March 16, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY (Conway, Timothy) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified. Modified on 3/14/2022 (CMR).
March 13, 2022 Filing 1472 STATUS Conference Report and Notice of Amendment to Farms Partnership Agreement. Hearing on March 16, 2022 @ 11:00 a.m. Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY (Conway, Timothy) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified. Modified on 3/14/2022 (CMR).
March 12, 2022 Filing 1471 WITHDRAWAL of Claim(s): 62,63,64. Filed by William Greg Lockwood on behalf of Mack Financial Services, a division of VFS US LLC (Lockwood, William)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1470 OBJECTION to Debtors' Disclosure Statement for the Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation of Easterday Ranches, Inc. and Easterday Farms by Karen Easterday. (RE: Disclosure Statement#1382). Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY (TJL)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1469 JOINDER in Support of Cody and Debby Easterday's Response to Debtors' Notice and Motion to Approve Settlement with CHS Inc. Hearing scheduled 3/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1433, Response#1466). Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY (TJL)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1468 OBJECTION to Debtors' Motion Under Bankruptcy Rule 9019 for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Release with Washington Trust Bank by Karen Easterday (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1431). Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY. (TJL)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1467 OBJECTION to Debtors' Second Amended Disclosure Statement for the Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation of Easterday Ranches, Inc. and Easterday Farms by Cody and Debby Easterday. Hearing scheduled 3/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (RE: Disclosure Statement#1382). Filed by Jeffrey C Misley on behalf of Cody and Debby Easterday (TJL)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1466 OBJECTION to Debtors' Motion to Approve Settlement with CHS Inc. Under Fed. R. Bankr.p. 9019 by Cody and Debby Easterday. Hearing scheduled 3/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1433). Filed by Jeffrey C Misley on behalf of Cody and Debby Easterday (TJL) Modified on 3/14/2022 (TJL).
March 11, 2022 Filing 1465 OBJECTION to Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Release with Washington Rust Bank by Cody and Debby Easterday. Hearing scheduled 3/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1431). Filed by Jeffrey C Misley on behalf of Cody and Debby Easterday (TJL) Modified on 3/14/2022 (TJL).
March 11, 2022 Filing 1464 DOCUMENT Restricted - Technical Error (JL). Modified on 3/11/2022 (JL).
March 11, 2022 Filing 1463 STIPULATED ORDER Granting Motion for Relief from Stay re Creditor Midland States Bank (RE: #1430) . (JL)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1462 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Stephen J Felice on behalf of Pegram Construction, Inc (RE: Objection#1461). (Felice, Stephen)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1461 OBJECTION (RE: Disclosure Statement#1283, CH 11 Plan#1284, Notification of#1285). Filed by Stephen J Felice on behalf of Pegram Construction, Inc (Felice, Stephen)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1460 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1457). (Buford, Thomas)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1459 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1452, Certificate of Service#1456). (Buford, Thomas)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1458 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1451, Certificate of Service#1455). (Buford, Thomas)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1457 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 12/1/2021 to 12/31/2021, Fee: $393,490.00, Expenses: $77,265.87. and Notice. Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
March 8, 2022 Filing 1456 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1452). (Buford, Thomas)
March 8, 2022 Filing 1455 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1451). (Buford, Thomas)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1454 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Sutherland, Kelly. (RE: #1430 )
March 8, 2022 Filing 1453 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1430) and Notice (Docket No. #1430), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1430). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion for Relief from Stay#1430). Filed by Kelly D Sutherland on behalf of Midland States Bank (Sutherland, Kelly)
March 7, 2022 Filing 1452 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 1/1/2022 to 1/31/2022, Fee: $16,459.20, Expenses: $2,780.60. and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Buford, Thomas)
March 7, 2022 Filing 1451 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 1/1/2022 to 1/31/2022, Fee: $10,572.40, Expenses: $33.63. and Notice. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1450 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Steven H Sackmann on behalf of Sunray Farms, Weyns Farms (RE: Objection#1449). (Sackmann, Steven)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1449 OBJECTION (RE: Disclosure Statement#1382, CH 11 Plan#1383). Filed by Steven H Sackmann on behalf of Sunray Farms, Weyns Farms (Sackmann, Steven)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1448 NOTIFICATION of Extension of Stipulated Standstill Order to March 10, 2022 (RE: Order on Stipulated Motion#1426). Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of 3E Properties Partnership, KAREN L EASTERDAY, Cody and Debby Easterday, Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Conway, Timothy)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1447 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Transfer of Claim Notice Date 02/25/2022. (Admin.)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1446 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1443). (Durbin, Christopher)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1445 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1442). (Durbin, Christopher)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1444 NOTIFICATION of Extension of Stipulated Standstill Order (RE: Order on Stipulated Motion#1426). Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of 3E Properties Partnership, KAREN L EASTERDAY, Cody and Debby Easterday, Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Conway, Timothy)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1443 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 1/1/2022 to 1/31/2022, Fee: $93,913.78, Expenses: $3,720.61. and Notice. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1442 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 12/1/2021 to 12/31/2021, Fee: $141,860.00, Expenses: $5,594.73. and Notice. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1441 NOTIFICATION of Professional Fee Hourly Rates (filed as STATEMENT signed by Christopher B. Durbin of re Notice of Professional Fee Hourly Rates and corrected by court)(RE: ORDER Approving Employment#812). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (Durbin, Christopher) Modified on 2/25/2022 (TLJ).
February 22, 2022 Filing 1440 TRANSFER/ Assignment of Claim. Fee Amount $26 Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: ITC Services Inc (Claim No. 112) To Bradford Capital Holdings, LP. Filed by XCLAIM (Vollenhals, Ryan)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1439 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1433). (Buford, Thomas)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1438 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1431, Declaration#1432). (Buford, Thomas)
February 22, 2022 RECEIPT of Transfer/ Assignment of Claim (fee)(# 21-00141-WLH11) [claims,trclm] ( 26.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A7933468. Fee amount 26.00 (RE: Transfer/ Assignment of Claim (fee)#1440). (U.S. Treasury)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1437 MOTION for Relief from Stay with Certificate of Service as to 2018 Ram 3500 VIN: 3C63R3AL4JG277090 and VIN: 3C63R3ALXJG374391. Fee Amount $188 and Notice. Filed by James K Miersma on behalf of Santander Consumer USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Order #3 Declaration #4 Exhibits) (Miersma, James)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1436 RESPONSE -Easterday Farms' Response to Ally Bank's Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay signed by Thomas A. Buford (RE: Order#1144, Motion for Relief from Stay#1387). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas). Modified on 2/22/2022 (TLJ).
February 18, 2022 Filing 1435 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 01/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1434 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176 for the Month Ending: 01/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1433 MOTION to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 with CHS Inc. and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 3/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 2/22/2022 (TLJ).
February 18, 2022 RECEIPT of Motion for Relief from Stay(# 21-00141-WLH11) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A7932650. Fee amount 188.00 (RE: Motion for Relief from Stay#1437). (U.S. Treasury)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1432 DECLARATION in Support of Debtors' Motion for Order Approving Settlement/Release with Washington Trust Bank signed by Peter Richter (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1431). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1431 MOTION to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 3/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 2/18/2022 (TLJ).
February 16, 2022 Filing 1430 MOTION for Relief from Stay with Certificate of Service as to 5 (5) Trinity Eagle Bridge belt trailers. Fee Amount $188 and Notice. Filed by Kelly D Sutherland on behalf of Midland States Bank. (Sutherland, Kelly)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1429 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice. Please take notice that Kelly Sutherland hereby enters an appearance in this case on behalf of Midland States Bank, and requests that, pursuant to the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy 2002, 3017 and 9010, he/she be given notice of all papers and pleadings filed in this case at: 1499 SE Tech Center Place, Suite 255, Vancouver, WA 98683. Filed by Kelly D Sutherland on behalf of Midland States Bank (Sutherland, Kelly)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1428 MINUTE Entry Re: Monthly Status Conference and Omnibus Hearing. HELD. No motions or matters were scheduled to be heard today (parties are in settlement negotiations), but the court did deliver comments and corrections concerning the disclosure statement, the plan and the proposed orders that were filed on 2/2/2022. The related adversary cases were continued to 3/3/2022 at 1:30PM by phone conference and if those hearings move forward, the court asked to have status reports and proposed/competing scheduling orders no later than end of the day 3/1/2022. Appearances: Maxim Litvak and Jason Rosell, attorneys for the debtors; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Christopher Durbin and Weiru Fang, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley A. Cosman, attorney for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey D. Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; Michael Stewart, attorney for CHS Capital, LLC.; Shawn Rediger, attorney for AgDirect and Farm Credit Services of America; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker and JB Evans, attorneys for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; John Rizzardi, attorney for Segale Properties, LLC.; Trevor Pincock, attorney for Washington Trust Bank (RE: Order #1291 ). (NNU)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1427 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/16/2022 10:59:16 AM ]. File Size [ 8960 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:18:40 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
February 16, 2022 Filing 1426 STIPULATED Standstill Order (RE: #1411) . (TLJ)
February 16, 2022 RECEIPT of Motion for Relief from Stay(# 21-00141-WLH11) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A7931692. Fee amount 188.00 (RE: Motion for Relief from Stay#1430). (U.S. Treasury)
February 15, 2022 Filing 1425 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Extend Time to File Document: Notices to Remove State Court Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1452 and Bankruptcy Rule 9027(a)(2) to May 2, 2022. NOT HELD. A declaration of no objections was filed, and an order extending the time has been entered. (RE: Motion to Extend Time to File Document #1350 , Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Document #1416 ). (NNU)
February 15, 2022 Filing 1424 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Soliciting Acceptances. NOT HELD. A declaration of no objections was filed, and an order extending the time has been entered. (RE: Motion to Extend or Limit Exclusivity Period #1317 , Order on Motion to Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period #1420 ). (NNU)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1423 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Conway, Timothy. (RE: #1411 )
February 14, 2022 Filing 1422 STATUS Report for February 16, 2022 Status Conference Signed by and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1421 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Fees Awarded: $65433.50, Expenses Awarded: $119.28 (RE: #1356). (TLJ)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 ORDER Granting Motion to Extend the Time Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Solicit Acceptances (RE: #1317). (TLJ)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1419 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1418). (Welch, Joseph)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1418 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 1/1/2022 to 1/31/2022, Fee: $257,632.40, Expenses: $955.41. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1417 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1356 )
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1416 ORDER Granting Motion to Extend Time to Remove Civil Actions (RE: #1350). Time Extended to 5/2/2022. (TLJ)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1415 DECLARATION of No Objections to Third Interim Application of Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1356) and Notice (Docket No. #1357), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1358). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1356). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1317 )
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1413 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Conway, Timothy. (RE: #1411 )
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1412 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Fees Awarded: $780997.00, Expenses Awarded: $4434.28 (RE: #1359). (TLJ)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1411 STIPULATED Motion for Entry of Stipulated Standstill Order. Signed by Thomas A. Buford, Easterday Ranches, Inc. and Easterday Farms, Debtors; Jeffrey C. Misley, Cody and Debby Easterday; and Michelle A. Green, 3E Properties and the filer... Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of 3E Properties Partnership, KAREN L EASTERDAY, Cody and Debby Easterday, Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Conway, Timothy)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1410 WITHDRAWAL of Received Unsigned Order, ECF No. 1409 (RE: Received Unsigned Order#1409). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1409 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1317 )
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1350 )
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Welch, Joseph. (RE: #1359 )
February 11, 2022 Filing 1406 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1359) and Notice (Docket No. #1360), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1361). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1359, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1360). Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1405 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1317) and Notice (Docket No. #1317), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1318). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion to Extend or Limit Exclusivity Period#1317). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1404 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1350) and Notice (Docket No. #1350), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1355). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion to Extend Time to File Document#1350). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1403 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by Brian L Green on behalf of Diversified Financial Services, LLC (Green, Brian)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1402 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Bruce K Medeiros on behalf of Rabo AgriFinance LLC (RE: Objection#1401). (Medeiros, Bruce)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1401 OBJECTION (RE: Disclosure Statement#1382). Filed by Bruce K Medeiros on behalf of Rabo AgriFinance LLC (Medeiros, Bruce)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1400 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Authorize Approval of (I) Proposed Disclosure Statement; (II) Solicitation and Voting Procedures; (III) Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of Joint Plan of Reorganization; (IV) Granting Related Relief. NOT HELD. Parties have continued the matter to 3/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. See notice of continuance #1396 . (RE: Notice of Continuance #1327 , Motion to Authorize #966 ). (NNU)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1399 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1397). (Buford, Thomas)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1398 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notice of Continuance#1396). (Buford, Thomas)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1397 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 12/1/2021 to 12/31/2021, Fee: $14,944.00, Expenses: $2,752.15. and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Buford, Thomas)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1396 NOTICE of Continuance Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966). The Hearing date is set for 3/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1395 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1392). (Buford, Thomas)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1394 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notification of#1391, Certificate of Service#1393). (Buford, Thomas)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1393 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notification of#1391). (Buford, Thomas)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1392 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 12/1/2021 to 12/31/2021, Fee: $16445.20, Expenses: $55.13. and Notice. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
February 7, 2022 Filing 1391 NOTIFICATION of Filing Supplemental Document Regarding Solicitation Procedures (RE: Motion to Authorize#966). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 ORDER Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney (RE: #292). (TLJ)
February 7, 2022 RECEIPT of Motion for Relief from Stay(# 21-00141-WLH11) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A7921856. Fee amount 188.00 (RE: Motion for Relief from Stay#1387). (KAC)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1389 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Sackmann, Steven. (RE: #292 )
February 4, 2022 Filing 1388 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #292) and Notice (Docket No. #292), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #293). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney#292, Certificate of Service#293). Filed by Steven H Sackmann on behalf of English Hay Company Inc. (Sackmann, Steven)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1387 MOTION for Relief from Stay with Certificate of Service as to 2020 Ram 3500 Regular Cab Tradesman Pickup 2D 8 FT VIN #3C7WR9AL1LG145080. Fee Amount $188 and Notice. Filed by Robert Scott Kennard on behalf of Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Affidavit #3 Proposed Form of Order #4 Mailing List) (Kennard, Robert)
February 3, 2022 Filing 1386 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notification of#1384). (Keeton, Richard)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1385 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Fees Awarded: $708341.29, Expenses Awarded: $19246.42 (RE: #1336). (TLJ)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1384 NOTIFICATION of Redlined Second Amended Disclosure Statement, Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan & Proposed Order (RE: Motion to Authorize#966, Disclosure Statement#1382, CH 11 Plan#1383). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1383 AMENDED CHAPTER 11 Plan (RE: Chapter 11 Plan#965, CH 11 Plan#1284). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1382 AMENDED DISCLOSURE Statement (RE: Disclosure Statement#964, Disclosure Statement#1283). Hearing scheduled 2/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 2/3/2022 (TLJ).
February 1, 2022 Filing 1381 MINUTE Entry Re: Evidentiary Hearing on Objection to Claim(s) by Claimant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. NOT HELD. Hearing stricken as matter has been settled. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise #1256 , ORDER on Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 #1277 , Objection to Claim(s) #1041 ). (NNU)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1380 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Durbin, Christopher. (RE: #1336 )
February 1, 2022 Filing 1379 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1376, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1377). (Buford, Thomas)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1378 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1336) and Notice (Docket No. #1337), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1338). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1336, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1337, Certificate of Service#1338). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (Durbin, Christopher)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1377 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1376). (Buford, Thomas)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1376 THIRD APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 9/1/2021 to 11/30/2021, Fee: $2,184,017.50, Expenses: $237,969.36.. Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1375 SUBSTITUTION of Counsel. Also signed by. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Durbin, Christopher)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1374 MINUTE Entry Re: Application to Approve Employment of Gem Valley Appraisal Service as Real Estate Appraiser, and Motion to Shorten Time. HELD. No objections or responses were filed or stated on the record. The court grants the motion to shorten time and also grants the application to approve employment. Appearances: Richard Keeton and Jason Rosell, attorneys for the debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Weiru Fang, attorney for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley A. Cosman, attorney for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday (RE: Application to Approve Employment #1365 , Motion to Shorten Time #1366 ). (NNU)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1373 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/27/2022 11:27:51 AM ]. File Size [ 4624 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:38 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1372 ORDER Granting Application to Approve Employment of Gem Valley Appraisal Services as Real Estate Appraiser (RE: #1365). (TLJ)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 ORDER Granting Motion to Shorten Time (RE: #1366). (TLJ)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1370 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1365 )
January 21, 2022 Filing 1369 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application to Approve Employment#1365). (Buford, Thomas)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1368 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Fees Awarded: $61250.00, Expenses Awarded: $15030.86 (RE: #1324). (TLJ)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1366 )
January 21, 2022 Filing 1366 MOTION to Shorten Time (RE: Application to Approve Employment#1365) . Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1365 APPLICATION to Approve Employment of Gem Valley Appraisal Service as Real Estate Appraiser and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 1/27/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 1/21/2022 (TLJ).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1364 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1324 )
January 21, 2022 Filing 1363 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1324) and Notice (Docket No. #1325), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1328). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1324). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1362 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by Daniel J Gibbons on behalf of Warden Hutterian Brethren (Gibbons, Daniel)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1361 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1359, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1360). (Welch, Joseph)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1360 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1359). (Welch, Joseph)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1359 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 10/1/2021 to 12/31/2021, Fee: $780,997, Expenses: $4,434.28.. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1358 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1356, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1357). (Buford, Thomas)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1357 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1356). (Buford, Thomas)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1356 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 9/1/2021 to 11/30/2021, Fee: $65,433.50, Expenses: $119.28.. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1355 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Extend Time to File Document#1350, Declaration#1351). (Buford, Thomas)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1354 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1349). (Buford, Thomas)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1353 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1348). (Buford, Thomas)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1352 AMENDED CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 12/31/2021 (RE: #1346)(Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas).
January 19, 2022 Filing 1351 DECLARATION signed by T. Scott Avila (RE: Motion to Extend Time to File Document#1350). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1350 MOTION to Extend Time to File Document: Notices to Remove State Court Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1452 and Bankruptcy Rule 9027(a)(2) to May 2, 2022 and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 2/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 1/20/2022 (TLJ).
January 19, 2022 Filing 1349 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 11/1/2021 to 11/30/2021, Fee: $14,575.60, Expenses: $60.64. and Notice. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1348 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 11/1/2021 to 11/30/2021, Fee: $425,735.20, Expenses: $77,560.22. and Notice. Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1347 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176 for the Month Ending: 12/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1346 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 12/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Year of report changed to match document. Modified on 1/19/2022 (TLJ).
January 13, 2022 Filing 1345 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1343, Notification of#1344). (Welch, Joseph)
January 13, 2022 Filing 1344 NOTIFICATION of Increased Hourly Rates Charged By Buchalter, a Professional Corporation . Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph)
January 13, 2022 Filing 1343 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 12/1/2021 to 12/31/2021, Fee: $141,086.80, Expenses: $917.18. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
January 12, 2022 Filing 1342 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/12/2022 10:59:34 AM ]. File Size [ 16544 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:34:28 ]. (TylerLindsey).
January 11, 2022 Filing 1341 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice. Please take notice that Ava L. Schoen hereby enters an appearance in this case on behalf of Karen L. Easterday, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Gale A. Easterday, and requests that, pursuant to the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy 2002, 3017 and 9010, he/she be given notice of all papers and pleadings filed in this case at: Ava L. Schoen, Tonkon Torp LLP, 888 SW Fifth Ave., #1600, Portland, OR 97204, ava.schoen@tonkon.com, 503-802-2143. Filed by Ava L. Schoen on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY (Schoen, Ava)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1340 ORDER Granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9010-1(a)(3) and Local Rule 83.2 of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington, Attorney John D. Fiero for Easterday Ranches, Inc. is hereby admitted pro hac vice to practice in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case and any related bankruptcy cases and adversary proceedings. Counsel of record, Thomas A. Buford, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. SO ORDERED. Whitman L. Holt, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. TEXT-ONLY ORDER; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL BE ISSUED. RECEIPT Number 26UJSNMH, Fee Amount $200.00 (RE: #1339). (TLJ)
January 11, 2022 Filing 1339 APPLICATION for John D. Fiero to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1338 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1336, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1337). (Durbin, Christopher)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1337 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1336). (Durbin, Christopher)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1336 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 8/1/2021 to 10/31/2021, Fee: $712,085.79, Expenses: $19,246.42.. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Durbin, Christopher)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1335 STATUS Report for January 12, 2022 hearing Signed by Thomas A Buford (RE: Notice of Continuance#1297). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas). Modified on 1/10/2022 (TLJ).
January 7, 2022 Filing 1334 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Authorize Approval of (I) Proposed Disclosure Statement; (II) Solicitation and Voting Procedures; (III) Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of Joint Plan of Reorganization; (IV) Granting Related Relief. NOT HELD. Matter has been rescheduled. See notice of continuance #1327 . (RE: Notice of Continuance #1297 , Motion to Authorize #966 , Notice of Continuance #1327 ). (NNU)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1333 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1332). (Buford, Thomas)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1332 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 10/1/2021 to 10/31/2021, Fee: $25,688.80, Expenses: $58.64. and Notice. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1331 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1330). (Buford, Thomas)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1330 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 10/1/2021 to 10/31/2021, Fee: $437,501.20, Expenses: $77,482.22. and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Buford, Thomas)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1329 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966, Notice of Continuance#1327). (Buford, Thomas)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1328 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1324, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1325). (Buford, Thomas)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1327 NOTICE of Continuance Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966, Minutes of Proceedings 1299 ). The Hearing date is set for 2/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1326 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of B. Riley Advisory Services (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1320, Application for Award of Compensation#1321, Application for Award of Compensation#1322, Application for Award of Compensation#1323). (Durbin, Christopher)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1325 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1324). (Buford, Thomas)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1324 THIRD APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 9/1/2021 to 11/30/2021, Fee: $61,250.00, Expenses: $15,030.86.. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1323 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for B. Riley Advisory Services, Financial Advisor, Period: 10/1/2021 to 10/31/2021, Fee: $73,030.40, Expenses: $0.20. and Notice. Filed by B. Riley Advisory Services. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1322 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for B. Riley Advisory Services, Financial Advisor, Period: 9/1/2021 to 9/30/2021, Fee: $119,107.20, Expenses: $24.20. and Notice. Filed by B. Riley Advisory Services. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1321 SIXTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for B. Riley Advisory Services, Financial Advisor, Period: 8/1/2021 to 8/31/2021, Fee: $168,287.20, Expenses: $29.50 and Notice. Filed by B. Riley Advisory Services. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Fee amount changed to match document. Modified on 12/30/2021 (TLJ).
December 30, 2021 Filing 1320 FIFTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for B. Riley Advisory Services, Financial Advisor, Period: 7/1/2021 to 7/31/2021, Fee: $149,910.00, Expenses: $199.79. and Notice. Filed by B. Riley Advisory Services. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1319 ORDER Granting Stipulated Motion for Rejection of Leases and Fixing Rejection of Claims (RE: #1314). (TLJ)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1318 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Extend or Limit Exclusivity Period#1317). (Buford, Thomas)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1317 MOTION to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Soliciting Acceptances and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 2/16/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified and hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 12/28/2021 (TLJ).
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1316 ORDER Granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9010-1(a)(3) and Local Rule 83.2 of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington, Attorney Ava L. Schoen for KAREN L EASTERDAY is hereby admitted pro hac vice to practice in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case and any related bankruptcy cases and adversary proceedings. Counsel of record, Timothy J. Conway, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. SO ORDERED. Whitman L. Holt, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. TEXT-ONLY ORDER; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL BE ISSUED. RECEIPT Number 26UEKT5M, Fee Amount $200.00 (RE: #1300). (TLJ)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1315 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Sperry, Michael. (RE: #1314 )
December 28, 2021 Filing 1314 STIPULATED Motion for Rejection of Leases and Fixing of Rejection Claims. Signed by Thomas A. Buford, III for Debtors Easterday Ranches, Inc. and Easterday Farms and the filer... Filed by Michael M Sperry on behalf of The Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Sperry, Michael)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1313 Adversary case 21-80057. COMPLAINT. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Buford, Thomas)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1312 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176 for the Month Ending: 11/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachments #2 Attachments, part 2) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1311 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 11/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachments #2 Attachments, part 2) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1310 MINUTE Entry Re: Combined Monthly Status Conferences and Omnibus Hearings; Motion to Sell Property Under Section 363(b) Limited Liability Company Interest, and Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Pursuant to 11 USC 363(f); Motion to Shorten Time. HELD. The court was given a presentation as to the progress of this case, and also of the recent filings in adversarial case 21-80050 in which matters are scheduled to be heard on 12/21/2022 at 11:00AM by phone. The court conveyed it would be appropriate to file a motion to shorten time in the adversary case to officially set those matters for next week. As to the motion to sell property free and clear of liens and motion to shorten time, no objections were filed nor heard on the record and the court granted both motions. Debtor's counsel to submit form of order. Appearances: Richard M. Pachulski, Richard Keeton, Jason Rosell and Benjamin Wallen, attorneys for the debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Jay R. Indyke and Christopher Durbin, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley A. Cosman and Alan Smith, attorneys for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey D. Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker and JB Evans, attorneys for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Darren Digiacinto, attorney for The Port of Pasco; Jennifer Faubion, attorney for Segale Properties LLC; Trevor Pincock, attorney for Washington Trust Bank. (RE: MOTION to Sell, Use or Lease Property Under Section 363(b) #1287 , Motion to Shorten Time #1288 ). (NNU)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1309 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/15/2021 10:59:39 AM ]. File Size [ 24560 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:51:10 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 ORDER Granting Motion to Shorten Time (RE: #1287, #1288). (TLJ)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 ORDER Granting Motion To Sell Property Under Section 363(b) Limited Liability Company Interest and Motion for Sale Free and Clear of Liens 363(f) (RE: #1287). (TLJ)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1287 )
December 15, 2021 Filing 1305 RESPONSE to Debtors' Ninth Status Conference Report signed by Timothy J. Conway on Behalf of Karen L. Easterday, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Gale A. Easterday (RE: Status Report#1301). Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY (Conway, Timothy)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1304 RESPONSE signed by Counsel for Cody and Debby Easterday (RE: Status Report#1301). Filed by Jeffrey C Misley on behalf of Cody and Debby Easterday (Misley, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1303 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1302). (Durbin, Christopher)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1302 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 11/1/2021 to 11/30/2021, Fee: $178,063.78, Expenses: $2,607.78. and Notice. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1301 STATUS Report for December 15, 2021 hearing Signed by and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1300 APPLICATION for Ava L. Schoen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY. (Conway, Timothy)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1299 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Authorize Approval of (I) Proposed Disclosure Statement; (II) Solicitation and Voting Procedures; (III) Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of Joint Plan of Reorganization; (IV) Granting Related Relief. NOT HELD. Matter continued to 1/12/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (RE: Notice of Continuance #1226 , Motion to Authorize #966 ). (NNU)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1298 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966, Notice of Continuance#1297). (Buford, Thomas)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1297 NOTICE of Continuance Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966). The Hearing date is set for 1/12/2022 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1296 MINUTE Entry Re: Status Conference and Presentation of Scheduling Order in Adversary Case 21-80050-WLH. HELD. The parties conveyed that mediation would not be productive. Based upon the record and argument of counsel, the court will enter the debtor's scheduling order. The court will also add status conferences and omnibus hearing dates to the 2022 court calendar. Appearances: Richard M. Pachulski and Richard Keeton, attorneys for the debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Jay R. Indyke and Christopher Durbin, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley A. Cosman and Alan Smith, attorneys for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey D. Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker, attorney for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; John Rizzardi, attorney for Segale Properties LLC; Trevor Pincock, attorney for Washington Trust Bank. NOTE: This minute entry was included in this case as there were topics discussed in the adversary hearing that relate to the plan process and events in this case. The audio has also been docketed in this case #1293 . (NNU)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1295 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1294). (Welch, Joseph)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1294 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 11/1/2021 to 11/30/2021, Fee: $282,789.60, Expenses: $1,835.68. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1293 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/2/2021 11:04:00 AM ]. File Size [ 19816 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:41:17 ]. (Audio Duplicate Docket.). (NydiaUrlacher).
December 3, 2021 Filing 1292 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by Bradley R Duncan on behalf of Beef Northwest Feeders, LLC (Duncan, Bradley)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1291 ORDER Scheduling Combined Monthly Status Conferences and Omnibus Hearings (RE: Minutes of Proceedings 1270 ). (TLJ)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1290 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Sell, Use or Lease Property Under Section 363(b)#1287). (Keeton, Richard)
December 2, 2021 FEE Due Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens $188 (RE: MOTION to Sell, Use or Lease Property Under Section 363(b)#1287). (TLJ)
December 2, 2021 RECEIPT of Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens(# 21-00141-WLH11) ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A7898817. Fee amount 188.00 (RE: MOTION to Sell, Use or Lease Property Under Section 363(b)#1287). (U.S. Treasury)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1289 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1288 )
December 1, 2021 Filing 1288 MOTION to Shorten Time (RE: MOTION to Sell, Use or Lease Property Under Section 363(b)#1287) . Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Keeton, Richard)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1287 MOTION to Sell Property Under Section 363(b) Limited Liability Company Interest, MOTION to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Pursuant to 11 USC 363(f) Fee Amount $188 and Notice. Hearing scheduled 12/15/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Keeton, Richard) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Pursuant to 11 USC 363(f) and hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 12/2/2021 (TLJ).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Joseph M. Welch - Attorney for Creditor Comm, fees awarded: $996,180.50, expenses awarded: $7787.17 (RE: #1236). (JL)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1285 NOTIFICATION of Filing of Redlined First Amended Disclosure Statement and First Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan (RE: Disclosure Statement#1283, CH 11 Plan#1284). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1284 AMENDED CHAPTER 11 Plan (RE: Chapter 11 Plan#965). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1283 AMENDED DISCLOSURE Statement (RE: Disclosure Statement#964). The Hearing date is set for 12/15/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 12/1/2021 (TLJ).
November 29, 2021 Filing 1282 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Dundon Advisers, LLC (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1279, Application for Award of Compensation#1280, Application for Award of Compensation#1281). (Welch, Joseph)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1281 SIXTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 8/1/2021 to 8/31/2021, Fee: $62,955.20, Expenses: $. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1280 FIFTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 7/1/2021 to 7/31/2021, Fee: $86,004.80, Expenses: $1,403.44. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1279 FOURTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 6/1/2021 to 6/30/2021, Fee: $106,310.40, Expenses: $. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1278 MINUTE Entry Re: Status Conference Concerning Motion Under Bankruptcy Rule 9019 For Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Release With Prudential Insurance Company of America. NOT HELD. A declaration of no objections was filed, a proposed order was uploaded and the court has signed it. See order #1277 . (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise #1256 , Declaration of No Objections 1273 , ORDER on Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 #1277 ). (NNU)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 ORDER Granting Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release With Prudential Insurance Company of America (RE: #1256). (TLJ)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Welch, Joseph (RE: #1236). Modified on 11/29/2021 (TLJ).
November 29, 2021 Filing 1275 DECLARATION of No Objections to Second Interim Application of Buchalter, A Professional Corporation. Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1236) and Notice (Docket No. #1237), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1238). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1236). Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1256 )
November 29, 2021 Filing 1273 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1256) and Notice (Docket No. #1256), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1257). No objections have been filed (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1256). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1272 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176 for the Month Ending: 10/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2 (bank statements)) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1271 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 10/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 #2 Attachment 2 (bank statements)) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1270 MINUTE Entry Re: Combined Monthly Status Conferences and Omnibus Hearings, Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 with Commodity Futures Trading Commission; combined with a Scheduling conference re A21-80050/Easterday Ranches Inc et al vs Estate of Gale A. Easterday (Deceased) et al. HELD. The court was updated on the posture of the case(s). After hearing argument of counsel, the court grants the debtor's motion to approve compromise and settlement with Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Counsel for the debtor to upload a proposed form of order. A hearing is currently scheduled for 12/2/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima regarding the 9019 Motion For Order Approving Settlement Agreement (with Prudential Insurance Co), and the court also adds to this hearing a status conference which will allow the parties to further discuss mediation options. Plaintiff in adversary proceeding is expected to amend the complaint and trigger another 30 day response period. Parties are to file an agreed or competing scheduling order no later than noon/12:00PM on 12/1/2021 to be discussed during the status conference on 12/2/2022. An evidentiary hearing date for the adversary proceeding is not yet firm, but discussed the date of 4/18/2022 in open court beginning at 9:30AM in Yakima (reserving a few days that week). Appearances: Richard M. Pachulski, Thomas A. Buford, Jeffrey Dulberg, and Jason Rosell, attorneys for the debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Jay R. Indyke and Christopher Durbin, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley A. Cosman and Alan Smith, attorneys for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey D. Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; Shawn Rediger, attorney for AgDirect, and Farm Credit Services of America PCA; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker and Ellen Ostrow, attorneys for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Paul Larson, attorney for PHI Financial Services, Inc.; Jennifer K. Faubion and John Rizzardi, attorneys for Segale Properties LLC; Burke Jackowich, attorney for Washington Trust Bank. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise #1203 ). (NNU)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 ORDER Granting Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 with Commodity Futures Trading Commission (RE: #1203). (TLJ)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1268 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/17/2021 10:59:10 AM ]. File Size [ 35720 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:14:25 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
November 17, 2021 Filing 1267 NOTIFICATION of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (RE: Notice of Appearance (Text Only) 342 ). Filed by Joel D Dailey on behalf of Columbia Pump Company, Inc. (Dailey, Joel)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1266 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1203 )
November 16, 2021 Filing 1265 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1264). (Durbin, Christopher)
November 16, 2021 Filing 1264 SIXTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 10/1/2021 to 10/31/2021, Fee: $113,495.06, Expenses: $4,706.58. and Notice. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1263 REPLY signed by Thomas A. Buford (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1203, Objection#1250). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1262 RESPONSE signed by Christopher B. Durbin (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1203, Response#1220, Objection#1250). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Durbin, Christopher). Modified on 11/16/2021 (TLJ).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 ORDER Further Extending Time to Remove Civil Actions through and including January 31, 2022 (RE: #1221). (TLJ)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1221 )
November 15, 2021 Filing 1259 DECLARATION of No Objections to Motion for Order Further Extending the Period to Remove Civil Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.. Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1221) and Notice (Docket No. #1221), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1223). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion to Enlarge Time#1221, Certificate of Service#1223). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1258 STATUS Report for November 17, 2021 monthly status conference (filed as Pre-Status Conference Report and corrected by court). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) Modified on 11/15/2021 (TLJ).
November 12, 2021 Filing 1257 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1256). (Buford, Thomas)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1256 MOTION Under Bankruptcy Rule 9019 For Order Approving Settlement Agreement and Release With Prudential Insurance Company of America, and Notice; MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities; DECLARATION of Peter Richter. Hearing scheduled 12/02/2021 at 11:00AM by phone conference (877) 402-9757 Access Code 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Docket text clarified, and hearing information added. Modified on 11/12/2021 (NNU).
November 11, 2021 Filing 1255 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Alan D Smith on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (RE: Objection#1250). (Smith, Alan)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1254 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1251, Application for Award of Compensation#1252, Application for Award of Compensation#1253). (Buford, Thomas)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1253 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 9/1/2021 to 9/30/2021, Fee: $883,977.60, Expenses: $82,926.93. and Notice. Filed by (Buford, Thomas)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1252 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 9/1/2021 to 9/30/2021, Fee: $12,082.40, Expenses: $0. and Notice. Filed by (Buford, Thomas)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1251 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 9/1/2021 to 9/30/2021, Fee: $29,120.00, Expenses: $10,644.08. and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Buford, Thomas)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1250 OBJECTION (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1203). Filed by Alan D Smith on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (Smith, Alan)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1249 ORDER Granting Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, fees awarded: $117731.50, expenses awarded: $44976.60 (RE: #1193). (TLJ)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1248 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, fees awarded: $369577.00, expenses awarded: $277.73 (RE: #1192). (TLJ)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1247 ORDER Granting Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, fees awarded: $3579043.75, expenses awarded: $241678.36 (RE: #1191). (TLJ)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1246 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1193 )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1192 )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1191 )
November 8, 2021 Filing 1243 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1193) and Notice (Docket No. #1196), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1197). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1193, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1196, Certificate of Service#1197). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1242 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1192) and Notice (Docket No. #1195), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1197). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1192, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1195, Certificate of Service#1197). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1241 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1191) and Notice (Docket No. #1194), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1197). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1191, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1194, Certificate of Service#1197). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1240 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1239). (Welch, Joseph)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1239 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 10/1/2021 to 10/31/2021, Fee: $200,921.20, Expenses: $1,681.42. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1238 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1236, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1237). (Welch, Joseph)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1237 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1236). (Welch, Joseph)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1236 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 7/1/2021 to 9/30/2021, Fee: $996,180.50, Expenses: $7,787.17.. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1235 ORDER Granting Motion For Corrected Stipulated Protective Order (RE: #1233). (TLJ)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Conway, Timothy. (RE: #1233 )
November 4, 2021 Filing 1233 AMENDED MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated). Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY. (Conway, Timothy)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1232 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966, Notice of Continuance#1054, Notice of Continuance#1226). (Buford, Thomas)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1231 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Attorney, fees awarded: $1074550.30, expenses awarded: $10350.48 (RE: #1167). (TLJ)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1230 SUPPLEMENT to Second Interim Application of Davis Wright Tremaine LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1192, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1195, Certificate of Service#1197). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1229 ORDER Granting Motion For Stipulated Protective Order (RE: #1227) . (JL)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1228 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Conway, Timothy. (RE: #1227 )
November 2, 2021 Filing 1227 AGREED MOTION for Protective Order . Filed by Timothy J. Conway on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY. (Conway, Timothy)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1226 NOTICE of Continuance Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966). The Hearing date is set for 12/15/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1225 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Durbin, Christopher. (RE: #1167 )
November 1, 2021 Filing 1224 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1167) and Notice (Docket No. #1168), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1174). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1167, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1168, Certificate of Service#1174). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (Durbin, Christopher)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1223 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Enlarge Time#1221). (Buford, Thomas)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1222 DECLARATION signed by T. Scott Avila (RE: Motion to Enlarge Time#1221). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1221 MOTION to Enlarge Time to Remove Civil Actions to through and including January 31, 2022 and Notice. Hearing scheduled 11/17/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 10/29/2021 (TLJ).
October 28, 2021 Filing 1220 RESPONSE signed by Christopher B. Durbin (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1203). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Durbin, Christopher)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1219 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1218). (Durbin, Christopher)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1218 FIFTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 9/1/2021 to 9/30/2021, Fee: $232,646.02, Expenses: $9,549.64. and Notice. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1217 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1216). (Welch, Joseph)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1216 APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 9/1/2021 to 9/30/2021, Fee: $207,158.40, Expenses: $3,008.43. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1215 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Former Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc., fees awarded: $382310.67 (RE: #918, #1169). (TLJ)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1214 MINUTE Entry Re: Pre-trial Conference as to Objection to Claim(s) by Claimant The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Objection to Claim(s) by Claimant Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company; Combined Monthly Status Conferences and Omnibus Hearing. HELD. The objection to claim involving Equitable Financial Life Insurance has been settled, and the court has signed and entered an order approving settlement (see order #1210 ). Counsel for the debtor conveyed a withdrawal to the Equitable claim objection will be filed. An evidentiary hearing concerning the objection to claim as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America is scheduled 03/28/2022 at 09:30 AM at Hrg location - Tower Bldg, 2nd Floor Courtroom, 402 East Yakima Avenue, Yakima, WA (reserving some time on 3/29/2022 should it be needed). The court was also given an update as to how the case is progressing. Appearances: Richard M. Pachulski, Thomas A. Buford, Maxim Litvak, attorneys for the debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Weiru Fang and Jay R. Indyke, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley A. Cosman, and Alan Smith, attorneys for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey D. Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Ellen Ostrow, attorney for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Jennifer K. Faubion, attorney for Segale Properties LLC; Brian Walsh, attorney for The Prudential Insurance Company of America; and Trevor R. Pincock, attorney for Washington Trust Bank. (RE: Scheduling Order #1148 , Order #125 ). (NNU)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1213 WITHDRAWAL of Debtors' Objection to Claim Nos. 45 and 101 of Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company; Notice of Hearing and Certificate of Mailing, ECF No. 1042 (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1042). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1212 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/20/2021 10:58:54 AM ]. File Size [ 12344 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:25:43 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
October 19, 2021 Filing 1211 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company. NOT HELD. A declaration of no objections has been filed and an order was submitted. The court has granted and signed order (see #1210 ). (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise #1154 , ORDER on Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 #1210 ). (NNU)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 ORDER Granting Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company Pursuant to FRBP 9019 (RE: #1154) . (JL)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1209 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Authorize Supplemental Interim Fee Application and Expense Reimbursement. NOT HELD. The parties submitted a proposed stipulated order, and the court has signed it. See order #1208 . (RE: Motion to Authorize #1073 , Order on Motion to Authorize #1208 ). (NNU)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1208 STIPULATED ORDER (A) Establishing Supplemental Interim Fee Application and Expense Reimbursement Procedures and (B) Authorizing and Directing the Release of Certain Net Sale Proceeds from Escrow (RE: #1073, #1131). (TLJ)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1207 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1073 )
October 19, 2021 Filing 1206 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1073) and Notice (Docket No. #1073), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1081). An objection was filed and has been resolved (Docket No. #1131) (RE: Motion to Authorize#1073, Response#1131, Notification of#1198). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1205 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1154 )
October 18, 2021 Filing 1204 WITHDRAWAL of Received unsigned order, ECF No. 1186 (RE: Received Unsigned Order#1186). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1203 MOTION to Approve Compromise and Settlement Pursuant to FRBP 9019 with Commodity Futures Trading Commission; Memorandum; Declaration of Peter Richter and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 11/17/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified and hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 10/18/2021 (TLJ).
October 18, 2021 Filing 1202 Pre-Status Conference Report. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1201 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notification of#1198). (Keeton, Richard)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1200 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176-WLH for the Month Ending: 09/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1199 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 09/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1198 NOTIFICATION of Resolution of Dispute re Motion for Order Establishing Supplemental Interim Fee & Expense Procedures (RE: Motion to Authorize#1073, Response#1131). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1197 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1191, Application for Award of Compensation#1192, Application for Award of Compensation#1193, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1194, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1195, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1196). (Buford, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1196 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1193). (Buford, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1195 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1192). (Buford, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1194 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1191). (Buford, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1193 SECOND APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 6/1/2021 to 8/31/2021, Fee: $117,731.50, Expenses: $44,976.60.. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1192 SECOND APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 6/1/2021 to 8/31/2021, Fee: $369,577.00, Expenses: $277.73.. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1191 SECOND APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 6/1/2021 to 8/31/2021, Fee: $3,601,375.25, Expenses: $241,678.36. Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Removed "and Notice" from docket text to match document. Modified on 10/15/2021 (TLJ).
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 ORDER Further Extending the Time Periods During Which the Debtors Have the Exclusive Right to File a Plan and to Solicit Acceptances (RE: #1151). (TLJ)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1151 )
October 14, 2021 Filing 1188 SUPPLEMENT to --Declaration of No Objections to Exclusivity Motion (Docket 1151). (RE: Declaration of No Objections 1187 ). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1187 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1151) and Notice (Docket No. #1151), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1153). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion to Extend Time to File Document#1151). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1154 )
October 14, 2021 Filing 1185 DECLARATION of No Objections Motion for Order Approving Settlement Agreement with Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company. Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #1154) and Notice (Docket No. #1154), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #1156). No objections have been filed (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1154). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1184 MINUTE Entry Re: Continued Hearing Concerning Motion for an Order Approving: (I) Proposed Disclosure Statement; (II) Solicitation and Voting Procedures; (III) Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of Joint Plan of Reorganization; and (IV) Granting Related Relief. NOT HELD. Per the notice of continuance filed by the debtors #1165 , motion is continued to 11/17/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (RE: Notice of Continuance #1054 , Motion to Authorize #966 , Notice of Continuance #1165 ). (NNU)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Alberts, Sam. (RE: #1169 )
October 13, 2021 Filing 1182 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Dundon Advisers, LLC (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1179, Application for Award of Compensation#1180, Application for Award of Compensation#1181). (Welch, Joseph)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1181 THIRD APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Other Professional, Period: 5/1/2021 to 5/31/2021, Fee: $70,011.20, Expenses: $0.00. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Period dates changed to match application. Modified on 10/13/2021 (TLJ).
October 13, 2021 Filing 1180 SECOND APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Other Professional, Period: 4/1/2021 to 4/30/2021, Fee: $96,745.60, Expenses: $0.00. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1179 FIRST APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Dundon Advisers, LLC, Other Professional, Period: 3/5/2021 to 3/31/2021, Fee: $180,084.80, Expenses: $0.00. and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 ORDER Granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9010-1(a)(3) and Local Rule 83.2 of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington, Attorney Weiru Fang for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc. is hereby admitted pro hac vice to practice in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case and any related bankruptcy cases and adversary proceedings. Counsel of record, Christopher B. Durbin, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. SO ORDERED. Whitman L. Holt, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL BE ISSUED. RECEIPT Number 26TK85SS, Fee Amount $200.00 (RE: #1177). (TLJ)
October 12, 2021 Filing 1177 APPLICATION for Weiru Fang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Durbin, Christopher)
October 11, 2021 Filing 1176 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by Margot D. Seitz on behalf of CNH Industrial Capital LLC (Seitz, Margot)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1175 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1171, Application for Award of Compensation#1172, Application for Award of Compensation#1173). (Buford, Thomas)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1174 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1167, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#1168). (Durbin, Christopher)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1173 SIXTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 8/1/2021 to 8/31/2021, Fee: $21,258.00, Expenses: $18,225.66. and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Buford, Thomas)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1172 SIXTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 8/1/2021 to 8/31/2021, Fee: $48,310.40, Expenses: $71.99. and Notice. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Buford, Thomas)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1171 SIXTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 8/1/2021 to 8/31/2021, Fee: $881,556.00, Expenses: $78,903.74. and Notice. Filed by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Expense amount changed from $78,908.74 to $78,903.74 to match application. Modified on 10/12/2021 (TLJ).
October 8, 2021 Filing 1170 Audio File Request by Transcriptionist: Gina Cozza, Invisible Business Solutions (RE: Minutes of Proceedings 1140 ). (JRG)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1169 STIPULATION. Signed by Bradley A. Cosman Attorneys for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. and the filer. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#918, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#919, Motion to Extend Time to File Document#951, Motion to Extend Time to File Document#1090). Filed by Sam Alberts on behalf of Former Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Alberts, Sam)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1168 NOTICE of Motion and Time to Object. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1167). (Durbin, Christopher)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1167 INTERIM APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 4/15/2021 to 7/31/2021, Fee: $1,074,550.30, Expenses: $10,350.48.. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Durbin, Christopher)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1166 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966, Notice of Continuance#1054, Notice of Continuance#1165). (Buford, Thomas)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1165 NOTICE of Continuance Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Disclosure Statement#964, Chapter 11 Plan#965, Motion to Authorize#966). The Hearing date is set for 11/17/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 ORDER Sealing Document (RE: #1093). (TLJ)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1163 ORDER Approving Second Stipulation by and between Easterday Farms and Mack Financial re Motion for Relief from Stay (RE: #1157). (TLJ)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 ORDER Denying as Moot Motion to Shorten Time (RE: #1074). (TLJ)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1161 RESPONSE to Objection to Claim (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1041). Filed by Matt Adamson on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Adamson, Matt)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1160 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1159). (Durbin, Christopher)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1159 FOURTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 8/1/2021 to 8/31/2021, Fee: $223,527.56, Expenses: $4,990.20. and Notice. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1157 )
September 29, 2021 Filing 1157 SECOND STIPULATED Motion for Relief from Stay as to the Debtor Only (Filed as STIPULATED Motion and corrected by court). Signed by Kent Carter for Mack Financial and the filer. (RE: Motion for Relief from Stay#603). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) Modified on 9/30/2021 (CMR).
September 29, 2021 Filing 1156 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise#1154). (Buford, Thomas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1155 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Extend Time to File Document#1151, Certificate of Service#1153). (Buford, Thomas). Modified on 9/29/2021 (TLJ).
September 29, 2021 Filing 1154 MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release with Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company; Memorandum in Support; Declaration of Peter Richter and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 10/20/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified and hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 9/29/2021 (TLJ).
September 29, 2021 Filing 1153 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Extend Time to File Document#1151). (Buford, Thomas)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 ORDER Granting Stipulation Amending Briefing Schedule on Debtors' Objections to Prudential and Equitable Claims (RE: #1149) . (TLJ)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1151 MOTION to Further Extend Exclusive Periods During Which the Debtors Have the Exclusive Right to File a Plan and to Solicit Acceptances through February 3, 2022 and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 10/20/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified and hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 9/28/2021 (TLJ).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1149 )
September 28, 2021 Filing 1149 STIPULATED Motion for Amending Briefing Schedule on Debtors' Objections to Prudential and Equitable Claims. Signed by Matthew T. Adamson for The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Michael J. Paukert for Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company and the filer. (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1041, Objection to Claim(s)#1042, Scheduling Order#1148).. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas). DEPUTY Clerk Note: Amending added to event. Modified on 9/28/2021 (JL).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 SCHEDULING Order on Objections to Prudential and Equitable Claims (RE: STIPULATED Motion #1118). Pre-Trial Conference scheduled 10/20/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. See order for further information. (JL)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1147 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Alan D Smith on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#979, Reply#1128). (Smith, Alan). Modified on 9/27/2021 (CMR).
September 24, 2021 Filing 1146 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1145). (Welch, Joseph)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1145 SIXTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 8/2/2021 to 8/31/2021, Fee: $317,020.80, Expenses: $406.63 and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Document includes notice. Modified on 9/27/2021 (CMR).
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 ORDER (A) Approving Sale of Equipment to Blue Tag Farms LLC and (B) Granting Related Relief (RE: Motion to Authorize #1048, Order on Motion to Authorize #1068, Minutes of Proceedings 1140 ). (JL)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at a hearing held on September 22, 2021, (i) the motion for derivative standing and related relief filed by Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. [ECF No. 979] is denied and (ii) the request for abandonment by Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. [ECF No. 1128 at p. 18] is denied without prejudice. SO ORDERED. Whitman L. Holt, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. TEXT-ONLY ORDER; NO DOCUMENT CREATED. (RE: #979) . (NNU)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1142 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion for Derivative Standing and Authority to Prosecute Fraudulent Transfer Claims. HELD. The court heard argument of counsel and based upon the record, the court denies the motion. The court will enter a text order. Appearances: See list of participants in minute entry 1140 (RE: Notice of Continuance #1059 , Motion to Authorize #979 ). (NNU)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1141 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Authorize Supplemental Interim Fee Application and Expense Reimbursement. HELD. The court heard argument of counsel and continues the matter to 10/20/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. Supplemental briefing is due by the end of the day 10/18/2021. Should parties reach an agreement concerning payment of incurred professional fees, counsel can file an exparte motion to approve stipulation and submit a proposed order prior to October 20th. Motion to Shorten Time is denied as moot. Appearances: See list of participants in minute entry 1140 (RE: Motion to Authorize #1073 , Motion to Shorten Time #1074 ). (NNU)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1140 MINUTE Entry Re: Equipment Sale Hearing. HELD. The court grants the motion. Counsel to submit a revised proposed form of order consistent with the corrections made on the record. Appearances: Richard Pachulski, Alan Kornfeld, Thomas Buford and Paul Labov, attorneys for debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for US Trustee; Jay R. Indyke and Christopher Durbin, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley Cosman, Alan Smith and James Williams, attorneys for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Michael Paukert, attorney for Equitable Financial Life Insurance Co; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Christopher Harris, John Munding and Peter M Gilhuly, attorneys for AB Livestock LLC; Ellen Ostrow, attorney for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Paul Larson, attorney for PHI Financial Services, Inc.; David Digiacinto, attorney for The Port of Pasco; Jennifer Faubion and John Rizzardi, attorneys for Segale Properties, LLC; and Trevor R. Pincock, attorney for Washington Trust Bank. (RE: Order on Motion to Authorize #1068 , Motion to Authorize #1048 ). (NNU)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1139 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/22/2021 10:02:23 AM ]. File Size [ 83720 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:54:25 ]. (TylerLindsey).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1048 )
September 22, 2021 Filing 1137 WITHDRAWAL of Order (A) Approving Sale of Equipment to Blue Tag Farms, LLC and (B) Granting Related Relief, ECF No. 1135 and 1136 (RE: Received Unsigned Order#1135, Received Unsigned Order#1136). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1048 )
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1048 )
September 22, 2021 Filing 1134 Adversary case 21-80050. COMPLAINT. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Buford, Thomas)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1133 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1120, Application for Award of Compensation#1121, Application for Award of Compensation#1122). (Buford, Thomas)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1132 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#1073, Notification of#1130). (Keeton, Richard)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1131 RESPONSE signed by Counsel for Cody and Debby Easterday, and Karen Easterday (RE: Motion to Authorize#1073). Filed by Jeffrey C Misley on behalf of KAREN L EASTERDAY, Cody and Debby Easterday (Misley, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1130 NOTIFICATION of Refiled Declarations in support of Debtors' Motion to Establish Supplemental Interim Fee Procedures (RE: Motion to Authorize#1073). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Storage Complex Appraisal #2 Exhibit B - Cox Farm Appraisal) Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1129 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by Chad Stokes on behalf of Umatilla Electric Cooperative (Stokes, Chad)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1128 REPLY signed by Alan D. Smith (RE: Motion to Authorize#979, Response#1108). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5 #6 Exhibit 6) Filed by Alan D Smith on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (Smith, Alan)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1127 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by Christa L Thompson on behalf of Washington State Department of Natural Resources (Thompson, Christa)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 ORDER Granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9010-1(a)(3) and Local Rule 83.2 of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington, Attorney Christopher Harris for AB Livestock LLC is hereby admitted pro hac vice to practice in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case and any related bankruptcy cases and adversary proceedings. Counsel of record, John D. Munding, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. SO ORDERED. Whitman L. Holt, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL BE ISSUED. RECEIPT Number: 26TCV5PQ, Fee Amount $200.00 (RE: #1123). (TLJ)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1125 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176-Easterday Farms for the Month Ending: 08/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1124 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 08/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1123 APPLICATION for Christopher Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filed by John D Munding on behalf of AB Livestock LLC. (Munding, John)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1122 FIFTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 7/1/2021 to 7/31/2021, Fee: $121,441.20, Expenses: $29.80. and Notice. Filed by (Buford, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1121 FIFTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 7/1/2021 to 7/31/2021, Fee: $1,011,461.40, Expenses: $76,168.98. and Notice. Filed by (Buford, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1120 FIFTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 7/1/2021 to 7/31/2021, Fee: $31,103.20, Expenses: $4,733.28. and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford. (Buford, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1118 )
September 20, 2021 Filing 1118 STIPULATED Motion for Scheduling Order on Debtors' Objections to Prudential and Equitable Claims. Signed by Matthew T. Adamson for The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Michael J. Paukert for Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company and the filer. (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1041, Objection to Claim(s)#1042).. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1117 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notification of#1103). (Buford, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1116 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Response#1108, Declaration#1110, Notification of#1113). (Buford, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1114 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Response#1106). (Durbin, Christopher)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1113 NOTIFICATION of Appendix I in Support of Debtor's Opposition to Tyson Fresh Meats' Motion for Derivative Standing (RE: Motion to Authorize#979, Response#1108). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F #7 Exhibit G #8 Exhibit H #9 Exhibit I #10 Exhibit J, Part 1 #11 Exhibit J, Part 2 #12 Exhibit J, Part 3 #13 Exhibit J, Part 4 #14 Exhibit K #15 Exhibit L #16 Exhibit P) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas). Modified on 9/20/2021 (TLJ).
September 20, 2021 Filing 1112 OBJECTION (RE: Motion to Authorize#979). The Hearing date is set for 9/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by John D Munding on behalf of AB Livestock LLC (Munding, John) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 9/20/2021 (TLJ).
September 20, 2021 Filing 1111 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Joinder#1109). (Welch, Joseph)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1110 DECLARATION in Support of Debtor's Opposition to Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.'s Motion for Derivative Standing signed by Peter Richter (RE: Response#1108). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1109 JOINDER signed by Joseph M. Welch (RE: Motion to Authorize#979, Response#1108). Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph). Modified on 9/20/2021 (TLJ).
September 20, 2021 Filing 1108 OBJECTION (filed as RESPONSE and corrected by court) signed by Thomas A. Buford (RE: Motion to Authorize#979). The Hearing date is set for 9/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 9/20/2021 (TLJ).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 ORDER Granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9010-1(a)(3) and Local Rule 83.2 of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington, Attorney Peter Gilhuly for AB Livestock LLC is hereby admitted pro hac vice to practice in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case and any related bankruptcy cases and adversary proceedings. Counsel of record, John D. Munding, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. SO ORDERED. Whitman L. Holt, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL BE ISSUED. RECEIPT Number 26TCKDJE, Fee Amount $200.00 (RE: #1105). (TLJ)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1106 RESPONSE signed by Christopher B. Durbin (RE: Motion to Authorize#979). The Hearing date is set for 9/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Durbin, Christopher) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 9/20/2021 (TLJ).
September 20, 2021 Filing 1105 APPLICATION for Peter M Gilhuly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filed by John D Munding on behalf of AB Livestock LLC. (Munding, John)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1104 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by Christa L Thompson on behalf of Washington State Department of Natural Resources (Thompson, Christa)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1103 NOTIFICATION of (I) Exhibit D (Equipment Removal Guidelines) to Equipment Purchase and Sale Agreement and (II) Second Amendment to Equipment Purchase Agreement (RE: Motion to Authorize#1048). The Hearing date is set for 9/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified and hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 9/17/2021 (TLJ).
September 16, 2021 Filing 1102 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notification of#1096). (Buford, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1101 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Declaration#1094, Declaration#1098, Notification of#1099). (Buford, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1100 MINUTE Entry Re: Combined Monthly Status Conferences and Omnibus Hearings. HELD. There were no matters set for hearing but the court did receive a case update concerning the plan, and regarding the Motion to Shorten Time/ Motion to Authorize Supplemental Interim Fee Application scheduled for hearing on 9/22/2021. The court also conveyed his thoughts and wants the parties on both sides to file briefs and address abandonment causes of action as to code section 554b. Appearances: Richard Pachulski, Alan Kornfeld, and Thomas Buford, attorneys for debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for US Trustee; Jay R. Indyke, attorney for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley Cosman, attorney for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC.; Michael Paukert, attorney for Equitable Financial Life Insurance Co; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Ellen Ostrow, attorney for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Jennifer Faubion and John Rizzardi, attorneys for Segale Properties, LLC; and Trevor R. Pincock, attorney for Washington Trust Bank. (RE: Order #125 ). (NNU)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1099 NOTIFICATION of Proposed Order Approving Sale of Equipment to Blue Tag Farms, LLC/Amendment to Purchase Agreement (RE: Motion to Authorize#486, Motion to Authorize#1048, Order on Motion to Authorize#1068). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1098 DECLARATION in Support of Sale of Equipment to Blue Tag Farms, LLC signed by Peter Richter (RE: Motion to Authorize#1048, Order on Motion to Authorize#1068). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 ORDER Approving Stipulation By and Between Debtors and Umatilla Electric Cooperative re Utility Deposit (RE: #1088). (TLJ)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1096 NOTIFICATION of Filing Proposed Form of Order (RE: Motion to Authorize#1073). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1095 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Sam Alberts on behalf of Former Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Extend Time to File Document#1090). (Alberts, Sam)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1094 DECLARATION in Support of Equipment Sale signed by Kim Stuart (RE: Motion to Authorize#1048, Order on Motion to Authorize#1068). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1093 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2021 10:59:39 AM ]. File Size [ 13384 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:27:53 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ORDER Extending the Period to Assume or Reject Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases (RE: #1022). (TLJ)
September 14, 2021 Filing 1091 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Alan D Smith on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (RE: Amended#1077). (Smith, Alan)
September 14, 2021 Filing 1090 NOTIFICATION of Extended Objection Deadline Re: First And Final Fee Application Of Dentons For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement, Time Extended to October 20, 2021 (filed as MOTION to Extend Time to File Document: Notice of Extended Objection Deadline Re: First And Final Fee Application Of Dentons For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement Of Expenses and corrected by court)(RE: Application for Award of Compensation#918, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#919). Filed by Sam Alberts on behalf of Former Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Alberts, Sam). Modified on 9/15/2021 (TLJ).
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1088 )
September 14, 2021 Filing 1088 EX PARTE MOTION to Authorize /Approve Stipulation Between Debtors and Umatilla Electric Cooperative Regarding Utility Deposit (RE: Stipulation#1085). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas). Modified on 9/15/2021 (TLJ).
September 14, 2021 Filing 1087 WITHDRAWAL of Motion to Authorize/Approve Stipulation, ECF No. 1086 (RE: Motion to Authorize#1086). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 1086 EX PARTE MOTION to Authorize /Approve Stipulation Between Debtors and Umatilla Electric Cooperative Regarding Utility Deposit. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 1085 STIPULATION. Signed by Chad M. Stokes for Umatilla Electric Cooperative and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1022 )
September 14, 2021 Filing 1083 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion for Extension of the Period to Assume or Reject Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases. NOT HELD. Parties have resolved the objection and a proposed form of order will be uploaded. (RE: Motion for Extension #1022 , Withdrawal of Motion or Other Pleading (text only event) 1078 , Objection #1063 ). (NNU)
September 14, 2021 Filing 1082 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notification of#1076). (Buford, Thomas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 1081 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#1073). (Buford, Thomas)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1080 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Darren Michael Digiacinto on behalf of Port of Pasco (RE: Motion for Extension#1022, Objection#1063, Affidavit in Support#1064, Withdrawal of Motion or Other Pleading (text only event) 1078 , Supplement to#1079). (Digiacinto, Darren)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1079 SUPPLEMENT to Withdrawal of Objection to Motion to Extend Deadline to Assume or Reject Real Property Leases (RE: Objection#1063, Affidavit in Support#1064, Withdrawal of Motion or Other Pleading (text only event) 1078 ). Filed by Darren Michael Digiacinto on behalf of Port of Pasco (Digiacinto, Darren). Modified on 9/14/2021 (TLJ).
September 13, 2021 Filing 1078 WITHDRAWAL of Objection to Motion to Extend Deadline to Assume or Reject Real Property Leases and Affidavit of Randy Hayden in Support of Objection, ECF No. 1063, 1064 (RE: Motion for Extension#1022, Objection#1063, Affidavit in Support#1064). Filed by Darren Michael Digiacinto on behalf of Port of Pasco (Digiacinto, Darren)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1077 AMENDED (RE: Notice of Continuance#1059). The Hearing date is set for 9/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Alan D Smith on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (Smith, Alan) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 9/14/2021 (TLJ).
September 13, 2021 Filing 1076 NOTIFICATION of Cancellation of Equipment Auction (RE: Order on Motion to Authorize#1068). The Hearing date is set for 9/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 9/14/2021 (TLJ).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1074 )
September 13, 2021 Filing 1074 MOTION to Shorten Time (RE: Motion to Authorize#1073) and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1073 MOTION to Authorize Supplemental Interim Fee Application and Expense Reimbursement Procedures and Notice. The Hearing date is set for 9/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 9/13/2021 (TLJ).
September 13, 2021 Filing 1072 AMENDED STATUS Report for September 15, 2021 status conference Signed by and the filer (RE: Status Report#1071). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas). Modified on 9/13/2021 (TLJ).
September 13, 2021 Filing 1071 STATUS Report for September 15, 2021 monthly status conference Signed by and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1070 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Order on Motion to Authorize#1068). (Keeton, Richard)
September 10, 2021 ADVERSARY Proceeding 2:21-ap-80044 Closed. (CMR)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 ORDER Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion to Authorize (A) Designation of Stalking Horse Bidder and Related Bid Protections re Auction of Equipment ; (B) Form of Equipment Purchase Agreement; (C) Dates and Deadlines re Equipment Sale; and (D) Granting Related Relief (RE: #1049) . (TLJ)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 ORDER Approving (A) Designation of Stalking Horse Bidder and Related Bid Protections re Auction of Equipment; (B) Form of Equipment Purchase Agreement; (C) Dates and Deadlines re Equipment Sale; and (D) Granting Related Relief (RE: #1048) . (TLJ)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1067 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion for Derivative Standing and Authority to Prosecute Fraudulent Transfer Claims. NOT HELD. Hearing rescheduled from 8/15/2021 at 11:00AM to 9/22/2021 at 10:00AM by phone conference. (RE: Motion for Extension #1022 , Motion to Authorize #979 ). (NNU)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1066 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Darren Michael Digiacinto on behalf of Port of Pasco (RE: Affidavit in Support#1064). (Digiacinto, Darren)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1065 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Darren Michael Digiacinto on behalf of Port of Pasco (RE: Objection#1063). (Digiacinto, Darren)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1064 AFFIDAVIT in Support signed by Randy Hayden (RE: Motion for Extension#1022, Objection#1063). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) Filed by Darren Michael Digiacinto on behalf of Port of Pasco (Digiacinto, Darren). Modified on 9/9/2021 (TLJ).
September 9, 2021 Filing 1063 OBJECTION (RE: Motion for Extension#1022). Filed by Darren Michael Digiacinto on behalf of Port of Pasco (Digiacinto, Darren)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1062 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Alan D Smith on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (RE: Notice of Continuance#1059). (Smith, Alan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1061 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/8/2021 9:59:31 AM ]. File Size [ 9872 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:20:34 ]. (NydiaUrlacher).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #1048 )
September 8, 2021 Filing 1059 NOTICE of Continuance Filed by Alan D Smith on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#979). The Hearing date is set for 9/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at Hrg location - Tower Bldg, 2nd Floor Courtroom, 402 East Yakima Avenue, Yakima, WA. (Smith, Alan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1058 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Authorize (A) Designation of Stalking Horse Bidder and Related Bid Protections re Auction of Equipment (B) Form of Equipment Purchase Agreement (C) Dates and Deadlines re Equipment Sale and (D) Granting Related Relief; and Motion to Shorten Time. HELD. Debtor's counsel apprised the court and hearing no opposition from the parties to the motions, the court grants the motion to shorten time and the motion to authorize (minor revisions stated on the record). Debtor's counsel to submit orders. Appearances: Thomas A Buford and Jason Rosell, attorneys for debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for US Trustee; Jay R. Indyke, attorney for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Megan Adeyamo, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC.; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Ellen Ostrow, attorney for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; and Trevor R. Pincock, attorney for Washington Trust Bank. (RE: Motion to Authorize #1048 , Motion to Shorten Time #1049 ). (NNU)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1057 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Notice of Continuance#1054). (Buford, Thomas)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1056 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#1048, Notification of#1055). (Buford, Thomas)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1055 NOTIFICATION of Filing Revised List of Equipment Subject to the Equipment Stalking Horse Motion (RE: Motion to Authorize#1048). The Hearing date is set for 9/8/2021 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 9/8/2021 (TLJ).
September 7, 2021 Filing 1054 NOTICE of Continuance Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966). The Hearing date is set for 10/20/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Keeton, Richard)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1053 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#1048). (Buford, Thomas)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1052 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of B. Riley Advisory Services (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1051). (Durbin, Christopher)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1051 FOURTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for B. Riley Advisory Services, Financial Advisor, Period: 6/1/2021 to 6/30/2021, Fee: $112,962.00, Expenses: $871.13. and Notice. Filed by B. Riley Advisory Services. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #1049 )
September 3, 2021 Filing 1049 MOTION to Shorten Time (RE: Motion to Authorize#1048) for Hearing on Debtors' Motion for Approval of Designation of Stalking Horse Bidder/Related Relief. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Buford, Thomas)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1048 NOTIFICATION of Intent to Pursue Bulk Sale of Certain Equipment, MOTION to Authorize (A) Designation of Stalking Horse Bidder and Related Bid Protections re Auction of Equipment ; (B) Form of Equipment Purchase Agreement; (C) Dates and Deadlines re Equipment Sale; and (D) Granting Related Relief. The Hearing date is set for 9/8/2021 at 10:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified and hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 9/3/2021 (TLJ).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Tyson's Motion For Protective Order (RE: #1014). (TLJ)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Debtor's Attorney, fees awarded: $3772291.50, expenses awarded: $83952.19 (RE: #871). (TLJ)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1045 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Joinder#1043). (Welch, Joseph)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1044 JOINDER signed by Joseph M. Welch (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1042). Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1043 JOINDER signed by Joseph M. Welch (RE: Objection to Claim(s)#1041). Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1042 OBJECTION to Claim(s) by Claimant Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. The Hearing date is set for 10/20/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1041 OBJECTION to Claim(s) by Claimant The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Notice. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. The Hearing date is set for 10/20/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. (Buford, Thomas)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1040 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of B. Riley Advisory Services (RE: Declaration#1037). (Durbin, Christopher)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1039 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1038). (Welch, Joseph)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1038 FIFTH APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Joseph M. Welch, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 7/1/2021 to 7/31/2021, Fee: $272,019.60, Expenses: $4,372.11 and Notice. Filed by Joseph M. Welch. (Welch, Joseph) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Document includes notice. Modified on 9/1/2021 (TLJ).
August 31, 2021 Filing 1037 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION signed by Seth R. Freeman (RE: Application to Approve Employment#477, Supplement to#478, Declaration#479, ORDER Approving Employment#540, Declaration#718, Declaration#809). Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of B. Riley Advisory Services (Durbin, Christopher)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1036 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Christopher Durbin on behalf of Cooley LLP (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#1033). (Durbin, Christopher)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1035 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by Nancy L Isserlis on behalf Public Utility District No. 1 of Benton County (Isserlis, Nancy) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified to correct party information. Modified on 8/31/2021 (KAC).
August 31, 2021 Filing 1034 REQUEST to Discontinue Email Notification. Filed by David P Gardner Public Utility District No. 1 of Benton County(Gardner, David) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Entry clarified to correct party information. Modified on 8/31/2021 (KAC).
August 31, 2021 Filing 1033 THIRD APPLICATION for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) for Cooley LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 7/1/2021 to 7/31/2021, Fee: $206,547.28, Expenses: $2,734.99. and Notice. Filed by Cooley LLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Durbin, Christopher)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1032 Audio File Request by Transcriptionist: Phyllis Lykken, Central Court Reporting. (RE: Audio File#1021, Minutes of Proceedings 1029 ). (NNU)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1028 Audio File Request by Transcriptionist: Phyllis Lykken, Central Court Reporting. (RE: Audio File#439, Minutes of Proceedings 440 , Minutes of Proceedings 441 ). (NNU)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #871 )
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Joseph M. Welch - Creditor Comm Atty, fees awarded: $1485483.50, expenses awarded: $5679.66 (RE: #962). (JL)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Smith, Alan. (RE: #1014 )
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 ORDER (A) Approving Private Sale of Assets to AB Livestock LLC and (B) Granting Related Relief (RE: MOTION to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens #920). (JL)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1023 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion for Extension#1022). (Buford, Thomas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1022 MOTION for Extension of the Period to Assume or Reject Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases and Notice. Hearing scheduled 9/15/2021 at 11:00 AM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041 - Yakima. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order) (Buford, Thomas) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Docket text clarified to include hearing date and time. Modified on 8/30/2021 (NNU).
August 25, 2021 Filing 1031 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion for Protective Order or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Discovery. HELD. The court heard argument of counsel and for reasons stated on the record, the court grants the motion in part and denies in part. The parties to work together on an agreed order consistent with the court's ruling. See list of hearing participants in minute entry ECF 1029 (RE: Motion for Protective Order #1014 ). (NNU)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1030 MINUTE Entry Re: Motion to Sell Property Under Section 363(b); Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Pursuant to 11 USC & 363(f) as to 1985 Beechcraft King Air C-90A turbojet aircraft and related aviation assets; Motion to Shorten Time. HELD. No objections were filed or stated on the record. The court concludes motions are appropriate and grants the motion to shorten time and motion to sell. Mr. Wallen to submit an updated form of order consistent with minor revisions stated on the record. See list of hearing participants in minute entry ECF 1029 . (RE: MOTION to Sell, Use or Lease Property Under Section 363(b),MOTION to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens #992 , Motion to Shorten Time #993 ). (NNU)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1029 MINUTE Entry Re: Application for Award of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (LF 2016) . HELD. The court heard argument of counsel, and for reasons stated on the record the court overruled the objection as it relates to the hourly rate, overruled objection as to the miscounted fee entries, overruled objection concerning typo(s) and vague descriptions of services provided, and as it relates to the attendance of court hearings the court granted in part and denied in part. Mr. Pachulski to submit order consistent with ruling. Appearances: Richard M. Pachulski, Thomas A. Buford, Alan Kornfeld, Paul Labov, and Benjamin Wallen, attorneys for the debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Christopher B. Durvin and Jay R. Indyke, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Bradley A. Cosman, and James Williams, attorneys for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey D. Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; Michael J. Paukert, attorney for Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker and Ellen Ostrow, attorneys for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Jennifer K. Faubion, attorney for Segale Properties LLC; Paul Larson, attorney for PHI Financial Services, Inc.; Bradley Duncan, attorney for John Wilson and Beef NW Feeders; and Trevor R. Pincock, attorney for Washington Trust Bank. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation #871 ). (NNU)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1021 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/25/2021 1:30:08 PM ]. File Size [ 85856 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:58:52 ]. (TylerLindsey).
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 ORDER Shortening Time for Hearing on Debtors Motion for Entry of Order (A) Approving Private Sale of Aircraft to Albert G. Lee Jr. and (B) Granting Related Relief (RE: #993). (TLJ)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Buford, Thomas. (RE: #922 )
August 24, 2021 Filing 1018 OBJECTION (RE: Motion for Protective Order#1014). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Welch, Joseph. (RE: #962 )
August 24, 2021 Filing 1016 DECLARATION of No Objections to First Interim Application of Buchalter, A Professional Corporation. Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #962) and Notice (Docket No. #963), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #967). No objections have been filed (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#962, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#963). Filed by Joseph M. Welch on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms, a Washington General Partnership (Welch, Joseph)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1015 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Alan D Smith on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (RE: Motion for Protective Order#1014). (Smith, Alan)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1014 MOTION for Protective Order or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Discovery. The Hearing is set for 8/25/2021 at 01:30 PM at (877) 402-9757, Access 7036041. Filed by Alan D Smith on behalf of Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - J) (Smith, Alan) DEPUTY Clerk Note: Hearing information added to docket text. Modified on 8/23/2021 (TLJ).
August 19, 2021 Filing 1013 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for Member Case Number 21-00176 for the Month Ending: 07/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1012 CHAPTER 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 07/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1011 STATEMENT signed by Oren B. Haker of Farmland Reserve, Inc. re Farmland Reserve, Inc.'s Statement in Support of First Interim Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period February 1, 2021 through May 31, 2021. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#871). Filed by Oren B Haker on behalf of Farmland Reserve, Inc. (Haker, Oren)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1010 MINUTE Entry RE: Monthly Status Conference/Omnibus Hearing. HELD. The court heard updates on the Disclosure Statement and Plan and provided direction as to a discovery dispute between the debtors and Tyson Fresh Meats. Tyson Fresh Meats has until Friday, 8/20/21, to file moving papers, and counsel for the debtors shall have until the end of the day on 8/24/21 to respond. The court will rule on the issue at the hearing on 8/25/21. Appearances: Thomas A. Buford, Alan Kornfeld, Richard M. Pachulski, and Jason Rosell, attorneys for the debtor; Gary Dyer, attorney for the US Trustee; Christopher B. Durvin and Jay R. Indyke, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc.; Joseph M. Welch and Julian Gurule, attorneys for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Farms; Alan D. Smith and Bradley A. Cosman, attorneys for Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Jeffrey D. Cawdrey, attorney for Canyon Farm II, LLC; Michael J. Paukert, attorney for Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company; Jeffrey C. Misley, attorney for Cody and Debby Easterday; Timothy Conway, attorney for Karen Easterday; Oren Haker and Ellen Ostrow, attorneys for Farmland Reserve, Inc.; Jennifer K. Faubion, attorney for Segale Properties LLC; and Trevor R. Pincock, attorney for Washington Trust Bank. (RE: Set). (JRG)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1009 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Sam Alberts on behalf of Former Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#918, Notice of Motion and Time to Object#919). (Alberts, Sam)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1008 REPLY signed by Thomas Buford (RE: Application for Award of Compensation#871, Objection#933). Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1007 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/18/2021 11:02:46 AM ]. File Size [ 22352 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:46:34 ]. (JanellGrubb).
August 18, 2021 Filing 1006 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#979). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Production #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Deposition) (Buford, Thomas)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Thomas A Buford, Debtor's Attorney, fees awarded: $209917.50, expenses awarded: $33080.82 (RE: #873). (TLJ)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 ORDER Granting Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, Special Counsel, fees awarded: $394132.00, expenses awarded: $180225.31 (RE: #872). (TLJ)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1003 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: Motion to Authorize#966). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Matrix) (Buford, Thomas)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1002 MINUTE Entry re: Motion for Extension. NOT HELD. Judge signed order granting the extension motion. MONTHLY HEARING TO STILL TAKE PLACE on August 18, 2021 at 11:00am. (related document(s): Set, #892 Motion for Extension filed by Easterday Ranches, Inc.) (CES) Modified on 8/17/2021 (CES).
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 ORDER Granting Motion for Relief from Stay re Creditor CNH Industrial Capital, LLC (RE: #913). (TLJ)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1000 FIFTH STATUS Report for August 18, 2021 Status Conference Signed by and the filer.. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Buford, Thomas)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 999 ORDER Further Extending the Period to Remove Civil Actions. Time Extended through 11/1/2021 (RE: #892). (TLJ)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 998 ORDER Approving Private Sale of Assets to AB Livestock LLC and Granting Related Relief (RE: #920). (TLJ)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 997 ORDER Uploaded. Filed by Keeton, Richard. (RE: #892 )
August 16, 2021 Filing 996 DECLARATION of No Objections . Filer represents to the Court, under penalty of perjury, that the Motion (Docket No. #892) and Notice (Docket No. #892), were served as documented in the Certificate of Service (Docket No. #901). No objections have been filed (RE: Motion for Extension#892, Declaration#893). Filed by Richard B Keeton on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (Keeton, Richard)
August 13, 2021 Filing 995 CERTIFICATE of Service. Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Easterday Ranches, Inc. (RE: MOTION to Sell, Use or Lease Property Under Section 363(b)#992, MOTION to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens). (Buford, Thomas)
August 13, 2021