Villa v. Hispanic Markets Inc
Plaintiff: Juan Villa
Defendant: Hispanic Markets Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv03228
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Service of Process (USM directed to serve defendant) Case Management Deadline set for 2/7/2019. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (CV, Case Administrator)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 EX PARTE MOTION by Juan Villa. (Attachments: #1 Nando Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pechtel, Adam)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals a lack of information regarding total household income and monthly expenses. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 1/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hispanic Markets Inc. (TR, Case Administrator)
December 6, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against Hispanic Markets, Inc. Fee Waived Jury Demand. Filed by Juan F Villa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pechtel, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villa v. Hispanic Markets Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Villa
Represented By: Adam R Pechtel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hispanic Markets Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?