Larkin et al v. Community Health Systems Inc

Plaintiff: Charles Walter Larkin, III, Eva Larkin and Estate of Stephanie Nicole Larkin
Defendant: Community Health Systems Inc
Guardian Ad Litem: Sidney P Ottem
Case Number: 1:2019cv03005
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry;no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Jurisdiction : DUE TO SCHEDULING CONFLICTS WITH THE COURT'S CALENDAR - Change in Time Only Motion Hearing currently set for 4/16/2019 at 11:15 AM is RESET for 4/16/2019 at 08:30 AM Yakima Courtroom 324 before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION by Richard C. Eymann in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Charles Walter Larkin, III, Estate of Stephanie Nicole Larkin, Eva Larkin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H-1, #9 Exhibit H-2, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Eymann, Richard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Charles Walter Larkin, III, Estate of Stephanie Nicole Larkin, Eva Larkin. (Eymann, Richard)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry;no PDF document. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing currently 3/11/2019 without oral argument is RESET for for 4/1/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. As this is a dispositive motion counsel should have noted 50 days out for the hearing date.(DB, Courtroom Deputy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION by Casey M. Bruner in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Community Health Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Bruner, Casey)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION by Justin Pitt in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Community Health Systems Inc. (Rekofke, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Jurisdiction by Community Health Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction)(Rekofke, Brian)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance LIMITED AND SPECIAL by Casey M Bruner on behalf of Community Health Systems Inc (Attorney Casey M Bruner added to party Community Health Systems Inc(pty:dft))(Bruner, Casey)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance LIMITED AND SPECIAL by Brian T Rekofke on behalf of Community Health Systems Inc (Attorney Brian T Rekofke added to party Community Health Systems Inc(pty:dft))(Rekofke, Brian)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eymann, Richard)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Community Health Systems Inc. (PL, Case Administrator)
January 11, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (PL, Case Administrator)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Community Health Systems Inc ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3071399) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Eymann, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larkin et al v. Community Health Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Walter Larkin, III
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Larkin
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Stephanie Nicole Larkin
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems Inc
Represented By: Brian T Rekofke
Represented By: Casey M Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Guardian ad litem: Sidney P Ottem
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Sidney Phillip Ottem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?