Guillen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jessica Guillen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv03101
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Frances Highland on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Erin Frances Highland added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Highland, Erin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LR, Case Administrator)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Guillen re Commissioner of Social Security. (Tree, D)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued to Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney) as to Commissioner of Social Security.(AY, Case Administrator)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by 05/23/2019. Case Management Deadline set for 5/23/2019. (AY, Case Administrator)
May 13, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Jessica Guillen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Guillen
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Represented By: Erin Frances Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?