Short Stop Shell LLC v. Chevron Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Short Stop Shell LLC
Defendant: Chevron USA Inc and Chevron Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03103
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by Short Stop Shell LLC (Tupper, James)
June 25, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION by Cameron Long in Support re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AND STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS filed by Short Stop Shell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Long, Cameron)
June 25, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM re #8 Statement of Facts,, #22 Statement of Facts REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS NOT IN DISPUTE by Short Stop Shell LLC. (Long, Cameron)
June 25, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Short Stop Shell LLC. (Long, Cameron)
June 24, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; Motion for More Definitive Statement; Motion to Strike Defs' Response to Plaintiff's Evidence in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice)(Goodman, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION by Jon-Erik W. Magnus in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; Motion for More Definitive Statement; Motion to Strike filed by All Defendants. (Goodman, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; Motion for More Definitive Statement; Motion to Strike filed by All Defendants. (Goodman, Robert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of CHANGE OF HEARING DATE (text entry; no PDF document) re ECF No. #5 , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Motion for More Definitive Statement; Motion to Strike. Motion Hearing reset for August 2, 2019, at 10:00 AM Spokane Courtroom 901 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (DATE & LOCATION CHANGE) (MS, Judicial Assistant)
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence; Proposed Order filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA Inc. (Goodman, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion filed by All Defendants. (Goodman, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 22 STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Goodman, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION by Frank G. Soler in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goodman, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION by Whitney Miner in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Goodman, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION by Robert C. Goodman in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Goodman, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION by Eric G. Hetrick in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Goodman, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Goodman, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re: Alleged Liability Under MTCA filed by All Defendants. (Goodman, Robert)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Cameron Long In Support re #14 Response to Motion, by Short Stop Shell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Long, Cameron)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; Motion for More Definitive Statement; Motion to Strike filed by Short Stop Shell LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Long, Cameron)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon-Erik W Magnus on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Jon-Erik W Magnus added to party Chevron Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jon-Erik W Magnus added to party Chevron USA Inc(pty:dft))(Magnus, Jon-Erik)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron L Long on behalf of Short Stop Shell LLC (Long, Cameron)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Hearing on Motion by Court (text-only entry; no PDF will issue) re ECF No. #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing reset for August 2, 2019, at 10:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 901 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. LOCATION CHANGE ONLY. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION by Paul Jhuty in Support re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Short Stop Shell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tupper, James)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION by Cameron Long in Support re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Short Stop Shell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Tupper, James)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF Material FACTS re #7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Short Stop Shell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16, #17 Attachment 17, #18 Attachment 18, #19 Attachment 19)(Tupper, James)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Short Stop Shell LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tupper, James)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry;no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; Motion for More Definitive Statement; Motion to Strike : LOCATION CHANGE ONLY TO SPOKANE. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2019 at 10:00 AM Spokane Courtroom 901 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; Motion for More Definitive Statement; Motion to Strike by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goodman, Robert)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Doll on behalf of Short Stop Shell LLC (Attorney Bradford Doll added to party Short Stop Shell LLC(pty:pla))(Doll, Bradford)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynne Michele Cohee on behalf of Short Stop Shell LLC (Cohee, Lynne)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James A Tupper, Jr on behalf of Short Stop Shell LLC (Tupper, James)
May 13, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) by Defendant Chevron Corporation (Diversity) Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3164824 Filed by Chevron Corporation, a California company and CHEVRON U.S.A. INC., a Pennsylvania company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert C. Goodman in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(Goodman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short Stop Shell LLC v. Chevron Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Short Stop Shell LLC
Represented By: Lynne Michele Cohee
Represented By: James A Tupper, Jr
Represented By: Bradford Doll
Represented By: Cameron L Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA Inc
Represented By: Robert Cedric Goodman
Represented By: Edward Jacob Lubarsky
Represented By: Jon-Erik W Magnus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation
Represented By: Edward Jacob Lubarsky
Represented By: Robert Cedric Goodman
Represented By: Jon-Erik W Magnus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?