Nafdel Petroleum Solutions International LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association et al

Plaintiff: Nafdel Petroleum Solutions International LLC
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington and JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv03109
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Burnside, Fred)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION TO RESTRAIN TRUSTEE SALE AND OTHER RELIEF. Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Restrain Trustee Sale and Other Relief ECF No. #10 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice: Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2019. (Reported by: Allison Anderson) (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT re #16 Response to Motion, #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Restrain Trustee Sale Schedule for July 19, 2019 by Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Trustee's Supplemental Response, #2 Exhibits)(McDonald, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Restrain Trustee Sale Schedule for July 19, 2019 filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Trustee's Response, #2 Exhibits)(McDonald, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION by Jeffrey Moody in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Restrain Trustee Sale filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, pgs 6-15, #2 Exhibit 2, pgs 16-23, #3 Exhibit 3, pgs 24-34)(Haist, Frederick)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Restrain Trustee Sale filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Haist, Frederick)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE RE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S #10 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. To participate in the telephonic hearing scheduled for 7/10/2019 at 2:00 PM, the parties are directed to call the Court's conference line at (888) 273-3658 five (5) minutes prior to the designated hearing time. When prompted, enter Access Code 2982935 and Security Code 3109. The use of cellular or speaker phones is not permitted for telephonic proceedings. TEXT ONLY NOTICE; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
July 3, 2019 Set/Reset Motion Hearing as to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Restrain Trustee Sale. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION by Carol Gralfs in Support re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Restrain Trustee Sale filed by Nafdel Petroleum Solutions International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Carlson, Timothy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION by Timothy J Carlson in Support re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Restrain Trustee Sale filed by Nafdel Petroleum Solutions International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Carlson, Timothy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Restrain Trustee Sale by Nafdel Petroleum Solutions International LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carlson, Timothy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Joinder by Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (McDonald, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, pg 14-23, #2 Exhibit 2, pg 24-31, #3 Exhibit 3, pg 32-40, #4 Exhibit 4, pg 41-47, #5 Exhibit 5, pg 48-50, #6 Exhibit 6, pg 51-53, #7 Exhibit 7, pg 54-56, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Burnside, Fred)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William McDonald on behalf of Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington (Attorney Robert William McDonald added to party Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington(pty:dft))(McDonald, Robert)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal (Supplemental State Court Records) by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Haist, Frederick)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy John Carlson on behalf of Nafdel Petroleum Solutions International LLC (Carlson, Timothy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal Filed with Yakima County Superior Court by Fred B Burnside on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association (Burnside, Fred)
May 22, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Praecipe filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association: Re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Description: Correction of typographical error at end of case number. (Burnside, Fred)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Burnside, Fred) See Praecipe filed at ECF No. #3 with corrected document attached. Modified on 5/23/2019 (SG, Case Administrator).
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3173171 Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burnside, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nafdel Petroleum Solutions International LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington
Represented By: Robert William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By: Frederick A Haist
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nafdel Petroleum Solutions International LLC
Represented By: Timothy John Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?