Beck v. Saul
Plaintiff: Brenda Beck
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv03185
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert H Whaley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Frances Highland on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Erin Frances Highland added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Highland, Erin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
August 14, 2019 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #YAK004183 in the amount of $25.00 from Smart Law Offices. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SETTING A PARTIAL FEE. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay a filing fee of $25.00 to initiate this action, which sum shall also satisfy any administrative fee. Filing Fee due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (CLP, Case Administrator)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(CLP, Case Administrator)
August 9, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Brenda Beck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Jordan, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Beck
Represented By: Nicholas David Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Represented By: Erin Frances Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?