Carrizosa et al v. Curt Baney, Inc. d/b/a Oxford Inn Yakima
Plaintiff: Anthony Carrizosa and Carla Carrizosa
Defendant: Curt Baney Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv03186
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 STIPULATED MOTION TO REMAND, granting #9 Motion to Expedite; and denying as moot #6 Motion to Remand. The matter is REMANDED to Yakima County Superior Court. Case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (LR, Case Administrator)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Stipulated Motion and Agreed Order to Remand Case to State Court by Curt Baney Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Becker, Catherine)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Curt Baney Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Becker, Catherine)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Cancellation by Court (text entry - no PDF document). The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for October 1, 2019, is CANCELLED. If necessary, the Court will reset a scheduling conference after resolution of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand at ECF No. #6 . (MS, Judicial Assistant)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Thomas J. Degan Jr. in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Degan, Thomas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Thomas Jesse Degan, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Thomas Jesse Degan, Jr added to party Anthony Carrizosa(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas Jesse Degan, Jr added to party Carla Carrizosa(pty:pla))(Degan, Thomas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in via Teleconference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
August 13, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Curt Baney, Inc. d/b/a Oxford Inn Yakima. (Becker, Catherine)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Curt Baney, Inc. d/b/a Oxford Inn Yakima. (Becker, Catherine)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3236964 Filed by Curt Baney, Inc. d/b/a Oxford Inn Yakima. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Superior Court, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Catherine A. Becker in Support of Notice of Removal, with pleadings and docket attached)(Becker, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrizosa et al v. Curt Baney, Inc. d/b/a Oxford Inn Yakima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Baney Inc
Represented By: Catherine A Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Carrizosa
Represented By: Roxanne Eberle
Represented By: Rebeccah Graham
Represented By: Anna Cunningham
Represented By: Thomas Jesse Degan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Carrizosa
Represented By: Roxanne Eberle
Represented By: Rebeccah Graham
Represented By: Anna Cunningham
Represented By: Thomas Jesse Degan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?