Evans Fruit Co Inc et al v. United States Department of Labor et al
Plaintiff: McDougall & Sons Inc, Evans Fruit Co Inc, Wade & Wade LLC, WGE Holdings LLC, Columbia Fruit Packers Inc, McDougall Family Farming Inc, Double S Orchards LLC and Columbia Orchard Management Inc
Defendant: United States Department of Labor, Cheryl M Stanton, John P Pallasch and Patrick Pizzella
Intervenor Defendant: Washington State Employment Security Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv03202
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING #33 DEFENDANT-INTERVENOR'S MOTION TO INTERVENE; denying #49 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Non-Party Employment Security Department's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING #15 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 10, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Jonathan E Pitel by Bruce L Turcott on behalf of Intervenor Washington State Employment Security Department (Pitel, Jonathan). Modified on 10/11/2019 to correct docket text to reflect withdrawing attorney on document (LR, Case Administrator).
October 9, 2019 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2019 re #33 MOTION to Intervene filed by Washington State Employment Security Department, #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by McDougall & Sons Inc, Columbia Fruit Packers Inc, Wade & Wade LLC, Evans Fruit Co Inc, Columbia Orchard Management Inc, McDougall Family Farming Inc, Double S Orchards LLC, WGE Holdings LLC. (Reported/Recorded by: Kimberly Allen) (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
October 8, 2019 Filing 54 DECLARATION by Sally W. Harmeling in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, ECF No. #50 , is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Non-Party Employment Security Department's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 49, shall be noted for hearing at 6:30 PM on October 9, 2019, without oral argument. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO PDF TO ISSUE. THIS CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re #49 MOTION to Strike #32 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Washington State Employment Security Department. (Pitel, Jonathan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #33 MOTION to Intervene filed by Washington State Employment Security Department. (Pitel, Jonathan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Strike by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harmeling, Sally)
October 4, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Strike #32 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harmeling, Sally)
October 3, 2019 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Intervene filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harmeling, Sally)
October 3, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry;no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re #33 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 at 08:45 AM Richland Courtroom 189 before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Defendant-Intervenor State of Washington, Employment Security Department's Motion to Expedite, ECF No. #34 , is GRANTED. A hearing on Defendant-Intervenor's Motion to Intervene, ECF No. 33, is SET for Wednesday, October 9, 2019 at 8:45 AM in Richland. Counsel for Defendant-Intervenor shall also be prepared to participate in the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 15, which will commence thereafter. Plaintiffs shall submit their response memorandum to the Motion to Intervene, ECF No. 34, no later than 12:00 PM on Friday, October 4, 2019. Defendants may also submit an optional response, if any, to the Motion to Intervene, ECF No. 34, by no later than 12:00 PM on Friday, October 4, 2019. Defendant-Intervenors shall submit a single, optional reply memorandum, if any, by no later than 12:00 PM on Saturday, October 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO PDF TO ISSUE. THIS CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply, ECF No. #41 , is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' reply memorandum shall be considered in full. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO PDF TO ISSUE. THIS CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
October 3, 2019 Filing 43 DECLARATION by Madison McPherson in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
October 3, 2019 Filing 42 DECLARATION by Stephen G. Bronars in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
October 3, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harmeling, Sally)
October 3, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
October 3, 2019 Filing 39 DECLARATION by Sally F. White in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
October 3, 2019 Filing 38 DECLARATION by D. Michael Wade in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
October 3, 2019 Filing 37 DECLARATION by John McQuaig in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
October 3, 2019 Filing 36 DECLARATION by Irene Birdsall in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
October 2, 2019 Filing 35 Praecipe filed by John P Pallasch, Patrick Pizzella, Cheryl M Stanton, United States Department of Labor: Re #29 Declaration in Support of Motion,,. Description: Exhibit J was mislabeled. (Verschoor, Rudolf)
October 2, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Expedite by - Washington State Employment Security Department. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Turcott, Bruce)
October 2, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Intervene by - Washington State Employment Security Department. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Turcott, Bruce)
October 2, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by - Washington State Employment Security Department. (Turcott, Bruce)
October 2, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John P Pallasch, Patrick Pizzella, Cheryl M Stanton, United States Department of Labor. (Verschoor, Rudolf)
October 2, 2019 Filing 30 DECLARATION by Joshua Moll in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John P Pallasch, Patrick Pizzella, Cheryl M Stanton, United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Verschoor, Rudolf)
October 2, 2019 Filing 29 DECLARATION by Brian D. Pasternak in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John P Pallasch, Patrick Pizzella, Cheryl M Stanton, United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, See Praecipe filed at ECF No. #35 #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y)(Verschoor, Rudolf) Modified on 10/2/2019 to link docket entry to Praecipe. (AY, Case Administrator).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Excess Pages, ECF No. #25 , and related motion to expedite, ECF No. #26 , are GRANTED. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 15, which is due no later than October 2, 2019 at 12:00 PM, shall not exceed 30 pages. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY. NO PDF TO ISSUE. THIS CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 27 Praecipe filed by John P Pallasch, Patrick Pizzella, Cheryl M Stanton, United States Department of Labor: Re #26 MOTION to Expedite . Description: Plaintiff's object to anything over 10 pages. (Verschoor, Rudolf)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Expedite by John P Pallasch, Patrick Pizzella, Cheryl M Stanton, United States Department of Labor. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Verschoor, Rudolf)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by John P Pallasch, Patrick Pizzella, Cheryl M Stanton, United States Department of Labor. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Verschoor, Rudolf)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Stipulated Motion for Modification of Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #23 . The Court finds the briefing schedule proposed by the parties insufficient to permit adequate consideration of the issues raised in Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and accordingly DENIES the motion, ECF No. #23 . The Government shall file its response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. 15, by no later than October 2, 2019 at 12:00 PM. Plaintiffs must file their optional reply memorandum, if any, by no later than October 3, 2019 at 12:00 PM. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO PDF TO ISSUE. THIS CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 23 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Briefing Schedule by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harmeling, Sally)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #19 , is GRANTED. A hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #15 , is SET for October 9, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Richland The Government shall file its Response to Plaintiffs' motion by no later than October 2, 2019 at 12:00 PM. Plaintiffs may file their optional Reply memorandum, if any, by no later than October 3, 2019 at 12:00 PM. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO PDF TO ISSUE. THIS CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry;no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing RESET for 10/9/2019 at 09:00 AM Richland Courtroom 189 before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. Hearing is in Richland and not in Yakima.(DB, Courtroom Deputy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by John T Drake on behalf of John P Pallasch, Patrick Pizzella, Cheryl M Stanton, United States Department of Labor (Attorney John T Drake added to party John P Pallasch(pty:dft), Attorney John T Drake added to party Patrick Pizzella(pty:dft), Attorney John T Drake added to party Cheryl M Stanton(pty:dft), Attorney John T Drake added to party United States Department of Labor(pty:dft))(Drake, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harmeling, Sally)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION by Darrin Belton in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION by Stephen G. Bronars, Ph.D. in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION by Sally W. Harmeling in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Harmeling, Sally)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 at 09:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324 before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harmeling, Sally)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa Ruth Waldref on behalf of John P Pallasch, Patrick Pizzella, Cheryl M Stanton, United States Department of Labor (Attorney Vanessa Ruth Waldref added to party John P Pallasch(pty:dft), Attorney Vanessa Ruth Waldref added to party Patrick Pizzella(pty:dft), Attorney Vanessa Ruth Waldref added to party Cheryl M Stanton(pty:dft), Attorney Vanessa Ruth Waldref added to party United States Department of Labor(pty:dft))(Waldref, Vanessa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Q Ridgeway on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Joseph Q Ridgeway added to party Columbia Fruit Packers Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Q Ridgeway added to party Columbia Orchard Management Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Q Ridgeway added to party Double S Orchards LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Q Ridgeway added to party Evans Fruit Co Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Q Ridgeway added to party McDougall & Sons Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Q Ridgeway added to party McDougall Family Farming Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Q Ridgeway added to party WGE Holdings LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Q Ridgeway added to party Wade & Wade LLC(pty:pla))(Ridgeway, Joseph)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rudolf J Verschoor on behalf of John P Pallasch, Patrick Pizzella, Cheryl M Stanton, United States Department of Labor (Attorney Rudolf J Verschoor added to party John P Pallasch(pty:dft), Attorney Rudolf J Verschoor added to party Patrick Pizzella(pty:dft), Attorney Rudolf J Verschoor added to party Cheryl M Stanton(pty:dft), Attorney Rudolf J Verschoor added to party United States Department of Labor(pty:dft))(Verschoor, Rudolf)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WGE Holdings, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Wade & Wade, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT bv McDougall Family Farming, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McDougal & Sons, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evans Fruit Company, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Double S Orchards, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Columbia Orchard Management, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT bu Columbia Fruit Packers, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Harmeling, Sally)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Columbia Fruit Packers Inc, Columbia Orchard Management Inc, Double S Orchards LLC, Evans Fruit Co Inc, McDougall & Sons Inc, McDougall Family Farming Inc, WGE Holdings LLC, Wade & Wade LLC. (Harmeling, Sally)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued to United States Department of Labor (Attachments: #1 Summons Patrick Pizzella, #2 Summons Cheryl M Stanton, #3 Summons John P Pallasch) (AY, Case Administrator)
September 3, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3251412) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Harmeling, Sally)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans Fruit Co Inc et al v. United States Department of Labor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McDougall & Sons Inc
Represented By: Robert R Siderius, Jr
Represented By: Peter Anthony Spadoni
Represented By: Sally W Harmeling
Represented By: Joseph Q Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evans Fruit Co Inc
Represented By: Robert R Siderius, Jr
Represented By: Peter Anthony Spadoni
Represented By: Sally W Harmeling
Represented By: Joseph Q Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade & Wade LLC
Represented By: Robert R Siderius, Jr
Represented By: Peter Anthony Spadoni
Represented By: Sally W Harmeling
Represented By: Joseph Q Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WGE Holdings LLC
Represented By: Robert R Siderius, Jr
Represented By: Peter Anthony Spadoni
Represented By: Sally W Harmeling
Represented By: Joseph Q Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Fruit Packers Inc
Represented By: Robert R Siderius, Jr
Represented By: Peter Anthony Spadoni
Represented By: Sally W Harmeling
Represented By: Joseph Q Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McDougall Family Farming Inc
Represented By: Robert R Siderius, Jr
Represented By: Peter Anthony Spadoni
Represented By: Sally W Harmeling
Represented By: Joseph Q Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Double S Orchards LLC
Represented By: Robert R Siderius, Jr
Represented By: Peter Anthony Spadoni
Represented By: Sally W Harmeling
Represented By: Joseph Q Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Orchard Management Inc
Represented By: Robert R Siderius, Jr
Represented By: Peter Anthony Spadoni
Represented By: Sally W Harmeling
Represented By: Joseph Q Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Represented By: Vanessa Ruth Waldref
Represented By: John T Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl M Stanton
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Represented By: Vanessa Ruth Waldref
Represented By: John T Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Pallasch
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Represented By: Vanessa Ruth Waldref
Represented By: John T Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Pizzella
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Represented By: Vanessa Ruth Waldref
Represented By: John T Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Washington State Employment Security Department
Represented By: Brendan C Selby
Represented By: Bruce L Turcott
Represented By: Eric Daniel Peterson
Represented By: Jonathan E Pitel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?