Berg v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: James Berg
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv03216
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/15/2021 09:30 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 11:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2021 at 09:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson.. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson: Scheduling Conference held on 10/17/2019. (Reported/Recorded by: Allison Anderson) (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
October 14, 2019 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Tompkins, Christopher)
October 10, 2019 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT Joint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Discovery Plan)(Khachatourians, Natasha)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #20 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney James F. Rogers, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for Defendants CR Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
September 17, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: James F. Rogers. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3264528. by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 01:30 PM in via Teleconference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Tompkins, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Natasha A Khachatourians on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Khachatourians, Natasha)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Christopher W Tompkins and Natasha A. Khachatourians on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attorney Christopher W Tompkins added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher W Tompkins added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Tompkins, Christopher) Modified on 9/13/2019 to add association of counsel. (AN, Courtroom Deputy).
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 MASTER AND SHORT-FORM PLEADINGS Ct Rec 364 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 303-2, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 366, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 1153-1, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 1153-2) (JW, ECF Admin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 MISCELLANEOUS ORDERS Ct Rec 269 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 8872, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 8874, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 10404, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 10587, #5 15md2641 Ct Rec 11321, #6 15md2641 Ct Rec 12007, #7 15md2641 Ct Rec 12202, #8 15md2641 Ct Rec 12589, #9 15md2641 Ct Rec 12593, #10 15md2641 Ct Rec 17008, #11 15md2641 Ct Rec 18038) (JW, ECF Admin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 DEPOSITION DESIGNATION ORDERS Ct Rec 10348 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 10403, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 10438, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 10486, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 10497, #5 15md2641 Ct Rec 10524, #6 15md2641 Ct Rec 10922, #7 15md2641 Ct Rec 11064, #8 15md2641 Ct Rec 11073, #9 15md2641 Ct Rec 11080, #10 15md2641 Ct Rec 11313, #11 15md2641 Ct Rec 12357, #12 15md2641 Ct Rec 12508, #13 15md2641 Ct Rec 12590, #14 15md2641 Ct Rec 12595, #15 15md2641 Ct Rec 12598, #16 15md2641 Ct Rec 17386, #17 15md2641 Ct Rec 17513, #18 15md2641 Ct Rec 17582) (JW, ECF Admin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 MOTIONS IN LIMINE ORDERS Ct Rec 9861 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 9881, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 10075, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 10258, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 10382, #5 15md2641 Ct Rec 10489, #6 15md2641 Ct Rec 10819, #7 15md2641 Ct Rec 10920, #8 15md2641 Ct Rec 10947, #9 15md2641 Ct Rec 11041, #10 15md2641 Ct Rec 11082, #11 15md2641 Ct Rec 11256, #12 15md2641 Ct Rec 12507, #13 15md2641 Ct Rec 12533, #14 15md2641 Ct Rec 17401) (JW, ECF Admin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 DAUBERT ORDERS Ct Rec 9428 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 9432, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 9433, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 9434, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 9770, #5 15md2641 Ct Rec 9771, #6 15md2641 Ct Rec 9772, #7 15md2641 Ct Rec 9773, #8 15md2641 Ct Rec 9991, #9 15md2641 Ct Rec 10051, #10 15md2641 Ct Rec 10052, #11 15md2641 Ct Rec 10072, #12 15md2641 Ct Rec 10230, #13 15md2641 Ct Rec 10231, #14 15md2641 Ct Rec 16992, #15 15md2641 Ct Rec 17285) (JW, ECF Admin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 DISCOVERY AND PRIVILEGE ORDERS Ct Rec 699 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 2813, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 8315) (JW, ECF Admin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 DISCOVERY ORDERS Ct Rec 3272 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 3312, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 3313, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 3314, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 3398, #5 15md2641 Ct Rec 4339, #6 15md2641 Ct Rec 4865) (JW, ECF Admin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATED RECORD MDL CASE 15-md-2641 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS Ct Rec 248 (Attachments: #1 15md2641 Ct Rec 4016, #2 15md2641 Ct Rec 5285, #3 15md2641 Ct Rec 15098, #4 15md2641 Ct Rec 249, #5 15md2641 Ct Rec 314, #6 15md2641 Ct Rec 363, #7 15md2641 Ct Rec 1108, #8 15md2641 Ct Rec 1485, #9 15md2641 Ct Rec 365, #10 15md2641 Ct Rec 927, #11 15md2641 Ct Rec 372, #12 15md2641 Ct Rec 401, #13 15md2641 Ct Rec 519, #14 15md2641 Ct Rec 1259, #15 15md2641 Ct Rec 1319, #16 15md2641 Ct Rec 1662, #17 15md2641 Ct Rec 1663, #18 15md2641 Ct Rec 2238, #19 15md2641 Ct Rec 2239, #20 15md2641 Ct Rec 3214, #21 15md2641 Ct Rec 3215, #22 15md2641 Ct Rec 4141, #23 15md2641 Ct Rec 3372, #24 15md2641 Ct Rec 4015, #25 15md2641 Ct Rec 3685, #26 15md2641 Ct Rec 4311, #27 15md2641 Ct Rec 4335, #28 15md2641 Ct Rec 4866, #29 15md2641 Ct Rec 5007, #30 15md2641 Ct Rec 5770, #31 15md2641 Ct Rec 5881, #32 15md2641 Ct Rec 5883, #33 15md2641 Ct Rec 6227, #34 15md2641 Ct Rec 6799, #35 15md2641 Ct Rec 8113, #36 15md2641 Ct Rec 8871, #37 15md2641 Ct Rec 9415, #38 15md2641 Ct Rec 9775, #39 15md2641 Ct Rec 10323, #40 15md2641 Ct Rec 11011, #41 15md2641 Ct Rec 11320, #42 15md2641 Ct Rec 11659, #43 15md2641 Ct Rec 11871, #44 15md2641 Ct Rec 12061, #45 15md2641 Ct Rec 12830, #46 15md2641 Ct Rec 12853, #47 15md2641 Ct Rec 12971, #48 15md2641 Ct Rec 13329, #49 15md2641 Ct Rec 15176, #50 15md2641 Ct Rec 16343, #51 15md2641 Ct Rec 17494) (JW, ECF Admin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulation of Designation of Records on Remand or Transfer (JW, ECF Admin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01607. Docket sheet received.
September 12, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Washington via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 9, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-1607-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16632016 filed by James Berg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: James F Rogers
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Represented By: James F Rogers
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Berg
Represented By: Thomas William Arbon
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?