Uribe v. Saul
Plaintiff: Emilio Uribe
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv03234
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Fred Van Sickle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Leigh Martin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Sarah Leigh Martin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Martin, Sarah)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emilio Uribe re Andrew M Saul. (Tree, D)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (EW, Law Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued to General Counsel, Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney) as to Andrew M Saul. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 2, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Emilio Uribe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uribe v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Uribe
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Sarah Leigh Martin
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?