Loupee v. Saul
Plaintiff: Becky Loupee
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv03236
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Becky Loupee re Andrew M Saul. (Tree, D)
October 7, 2019 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #YAK004206 in the amount of $150.00 from D JAMES TREE. (TR, Case Administrator)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (JW, ECF Admin)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SETTING A PARTIAL FEE. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay a filing fee of $150.00 to initiate this action, which sum shall also satisfy any administrative fee. Filing Fee due by 11/4/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(AN, Courtroom Deputy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 10/15/2019. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
October 3, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Becky Loupee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loupee v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Loupee
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?