Rutz v. Saul
Plaintiff: John Rutz
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv03240
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant Andrew M Saul. Attorney Rudy J. Verschoor is withdrawing. John T Drake is substituted as counsel for Defendant. (Attorney John T Drake added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Drake, John)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lane Martin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Justin Lane Martin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Martin, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rudolf J Verschoor on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Rudolf J Verschoor added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Verschoor, Rudolf)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Rutz re Andrew M Saul. (Tree, D)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons Issued as to Attorney General)(LR, Case Administrator)
October 11, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (LR, Case Administrator)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by John Rutz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutz v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin
Represented By: John T Drake
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rutz
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?