Houck v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tracy K Houck
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv03248
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Referring Judge: John T Rodgers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lars Joseph Nelson on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Lars Joseph Nelson added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Nelson, Lars)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; The Report and Recommendation, ECF No. #7 , is adopted in its entirety. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals Tracy's answers to questions three and four of the Application illustrate that she has sufficient funds to pay the filing fee. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee,or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Case Management Deadline set for 12/22/2019. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (TR, Case Administrator) Modified on 11/22/2019 (MS, Judicial Assistant).
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ORDER OF RANDOM REASSIGNMENT. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (PL, Case Administrator)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by: Tracy K Houck. Objections to R&R due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (PL, Case Administrator)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (JW, ECF Admin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy K Houck re Andrew M Saul. (Tree, D)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(AN, Courtroom Deputy)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 10/28/2019 (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
October 16, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Tracy K Houck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houck v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy K Houck
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Represented By: Lars Joseph Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?