Boleyn v. Saul
Plaintiff: Vaile Boleyn
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv03273
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Eric Staples on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Jeffrey Eric Staples added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Staples, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vaile Boleyn re Andrew M Saul. (Brandt, Cory)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals that the named Plaintiff has no dependents. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 12/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator). This is a duplicate copy of the Order entered at ECF No. #5 . Modified on 11/27/2019 (PL, Case Administrator).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals a lack of information with respect to the relationship between the plaintiff and/or the minor or incompetent person. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 12/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (PL, Case Administrator)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 11/29/2019 (TR, Case Administrator) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/18/2019) (TR, Case Administrator).
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(TR, Case Administrator)
November 18, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Vaile Boleyn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Brandt, Cory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boleyn v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaile Boleyn
Represented By: Cory J Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Jeffrey Eric Staples
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?