Keller et al v. Virginia Mason Medical Center
Plaintiff: Sandy Gaytan, Sylvia Keller and Debbie Sills
Defendant: Virginia Mason Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv03025
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Virginia Mason Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Devin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Virginia Mason Medical Center. (Smith, Devin)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Sandy Gaytan, Sylvia Keller, Debbie Sills. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nusser, Erika)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sandy Gaytan, Sylvia Keller, Debbie Sills. (Nusser, Erika)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION by Jolene Seda in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Virginia Mason Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lehmann, Paula)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Virginia Mason Medical Center. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehmann, Paula)
February 26, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION re #1 Notice of Removal, Filing in State Court by Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Association Virginia Mason Medical Center. (Lehmann, Paula) Modified on 2/26/2020 to correct defendant's name (CLP, Case Administrator).
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Association Virginia Mason Medical Center. (Lehmann, Paula) Modified on 2/26/2020 to correct defendant's name (CLP, Case Administrator).
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 State Court Documents received filed by Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Association Virginia Mason Medical Center Re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lehmann, Paula) Modified on 2/26/2020 to correct defendant's name (CLP, Case Administrator).
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Association Virginia Mason Medical Center. (Lehmann, Paula) Modified on 2/26/2020 to correct defendant's name (CLP, Case Administrator).
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3408714 Filed by Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Association Virginia Mason Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lehmann, Paula) Modified on 2/26/2020 to correct defendant's name (CLP, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller et al v. Virginia Mason Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Gaytan
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Carson Flora
Represented By: Erika L Nusser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Keller
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Carson Flora
Represented By: Erika L Nusser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Sills
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Carson Flora
Represented By: Erika L Nusser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Mason Medical Center
Represented By: Kathryn Sarah Rosen
Represented By: Devin Smith
Represented By: Paula L Lehmann
Represented By: Devin M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?