Foster v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Darin Foster
Defendant: John Batiste, Washington State Patrol and State of Washington
Case Number: 1:2020cv03048
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Warring, Carl)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and proposed amended complaint filed by Darin Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Townsend, Josephine)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO ECF NO. 3, MOTION TO DISMISS. The Court GRANTS the parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, ECF No. 5, and associated Motion to Expedite, ECF No. 6. Plaintiff shall file his response to the Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 3, no later than June 1, 2020. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed no later than June 8, 2020. The Motion to Dismiss is still noted without oral argument on June 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Warring, Carl)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Warring, Carl)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: DEADLINES. The Court has received Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 3. Plaintiff's response shall be filed no later than May 20, 2020. Defendants' reply shall be filed no later than June 3, 2020. The Motion to Dismiss hearing remains set on June 18, 2020, without oral argument. The Court will set a telephonic scheduling conference, if necessary, after the Motion to Dismiss has been decided. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Warring, Carl)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by All Defendants.(Warring, Carl)
April 15, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3442053 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit Docket No. 1, #3 Exhibit Docket No. 2, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warring, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Batiste
Represented By: Carl Perry Warring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Patrol
Represented By: Carl Perry Warring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Represented By: Carl Perry Warring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Foster
Represented By: Josephine C Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?