Decker v. Saul
Plaintiff: Hope Caroline Decker
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv03125
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Referring Judge: John T Rodgers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Leisa A Wolf on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Leisa A Wolf added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Wolf, Leisa)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by Hope Caroline Decker re Andrew M Saul. (Tree, D)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: On August 17, 2020, Magistrate Judge Rodgers recommended that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis be denied. ECF No. #5 . Because Plaintiff paid the filing fee on August 18, 2020, Magistrate Judge Rodgers's Report and Recommendation, ECF No. #5 , is DENIED AS MOOT. Additionally, in accordance with the parties' Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge, ECF No. #7 , this matter is DIRECTED to Magistrate Judge Rodgers for further proceedings. The Clerk's Office is ordered to REASSIGN this case to Magistrate Judge Rodgers. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. THIS TEXT-ONLY ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S ORDER OR NOTICE ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (CV, Case Administrator)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
August 18, 2020 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #26PNP5PJ in the amount of $400.00 from Douglas James Tree. (LMR, Case Administrator)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Clerk's ORDER OF RANDOM REASSIGNMENT. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. This text-only entry constitutes the order or notice by the Court. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 ***Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by: Hope Caroline Decker. (Tree, D) filed by Hope Caroline Decker. Objections to R&R due by 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons AUSA, #2 Summons General Counsel)(CLP, Case Administrator)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 8/27/2020. (CLP, Case Administrator)
August 17, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Hope Caroline Decker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decker v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Leisa A Wolf
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Caroline Decker
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?