Gopher v. Saul
Plaintiff: Clarinda Rose Gopher
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv03126
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha A Boden on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Martha A Boden added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Boden, Martha)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by Clarinda Rose Gopher re Andrew M Saul. (Tree, D)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(AN, Courtroom Deputy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 8/27/2020. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
August 17, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3534816) Filed by Clarinda Rose Gopher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gopher v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Martha A Boden
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarinda Rose Gopher
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?