Nora K et al et al v. United Healthcare Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel B., Nors K.n, Thomas B., Nora K, Gabriel B and Thomas B
Defendant: The Schumacher Group of Delaware, Inc., United Healthcare Services Incorporated, United Healthcare Services Inc doing business as United Healthcare, Schumacher Group of Delaware Inc as plan Administrator doing business as The Schumacher Group or SCP - Health and Schumacher Group Choice Plus Plan (7OC)
Case Number: 1:2020cv03162
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Healthcare Services Inc. (Duffy, Barbara)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Parties' Stipulated Motion Extending Time for Defendant United Healthcare Services, Inc. to File Responsive Pleading, ECF No. #13 , is GRANTED. Defendant United Healthcare Services, Inc. shall file its response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before December 20, 2020. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. THIS TEXT-ONLY ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S ORDER OR NOTICE ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by United Healthcare Services Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duffy, Barbara)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Schumacher Group Choice Plus Plan (7OC). (Wood, John)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Schumacher Group of Delaware Inc. (Wood, John)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Schaer on behalf of United Healthcare Services Inc (Attorney Aaron Schaer added to party United Healthcare Services Inc(pty:dft))(Schaer, Aaron)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Schumacher Group of Delaware Inc. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Schumacher Group Choice Plus Plan (7OC). (AY, Case Administrator)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #4 Amended Complaint filed by Gabriel B, Thomas B, Nora K. (Wood, John)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Schumacher Group of Delaware Inc. (Wood, John)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Schumacher Group Choice Plus Plan (70C). Filed by Thomas B, Nora K, Gabriel B. (Attachments: #1 Summons for The Schumacher Group Choice Plus Plan (7OC))(Wood, John)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara J Duffy on behalf of United Healthcare Services Inc (Attorney Barbara J Duffy added to party United Healthcare Services Inc(pty:dft))(Duffy, Barbara)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued to United Healthcare Services Inc John Walker Wood (Attachments: #1 Summons Schumacher Group of Delaware) John Walker Wood as to all Defendants. (AY, Case Administrator) Modified on 10/8/2020 to correctly reflect the language re summons presented to be issued (AY, Case Administrator).
October 6, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3581194) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Wood, John)
October 6, 2020 Payment for Civil Case ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3581188). (Wood, John) Modified on 10/7/2020 See #1 Complaint Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3581194 (AY, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nora K et al et al v. United Healthcare Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Schumacher Group of Delaware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services Inc doing business as United Healthcare
Represented By: Aaron Schaer
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schumacher Group of Delaware Inc as plan Administrator doing business as The Schumacher Group or SCP - Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schumacher Group Choice Plus Plan (7OC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel B.
Represented By: John Walker Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nors K.n
Represented By: John Walker Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas B.
Represented By: John Walker Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora K
Represented By: John Walker Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel B
Represented By: John Walker Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas B
Represented By: John Walker Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?