Selah Alliance for Equality et al v. City of Selah et al
Plaintiff: Anita Callahan, Kalah James, Selah Alliance for Equality, Amanda Watson, Rev Donald Davis Jr, Laura Perez, Anna Whitlock, Charlotte Town, Courtney Hernandez and Rev Donald Davis, Jr
Defendant: Sherry Raymond, Donald Wayman and City of Selah
Case Number: 1:2020cv03228
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Roxanne Degens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Roxanne Degens added to party Anita Callahan(pty:pla), Attorney Roxanne Degens added to party Donald Davis, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Roxanne Degens added to party Courtney Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Roxanne Degens added to party Kalah James(pty:pla), Attorney Roxanne Degens added to party Laura Perez(pty:pla), Attorney Roxanne Degens added to party Selah Alliance for Equality(pty:pla), Attorney Roxanne Degens added to party Charlotte Town(pty:pla), Attorney Roxanne Degens added to party Amanda Watson(pty:pla), Attorney Roxanne Degens added to party Anna Whitlock(pty:pla))(Degens, Roxanne)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by All Defendants Re #1 Complaint, #17 Answer to Complaint. Description: Provided full attorney names on electronic signature lines. (Kerley, Christopher)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by All Defendants.(Kerley, Christopher) Modified on 1/22/2021: See Amended/Corrected document filed at ECF No. #18 (LTR, Case Administrator).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Daniel Robbins Case on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Daniel Robbins Case added to party City of Selah(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Robbins Case added to party Sherry Raymond(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Robbins Case added to party Donald Wayman(pty:dft))(Case, Daniel)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF shall issue) GRANTING the parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Respond to Complaint, ECF No. #14 , for good cause shown. Defendants' deadline to answer or respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to January 22, 2021. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on this matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer or Respond to Complaint by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Carolyn)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Joseph Kerley on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party City of Selah(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party Sherry Raymond(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Joseph Kerley added to party Donald Wayman(pty:dft))(Kerley, Christopher)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re All Defendants. (Gilbert, Carolyn)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (LTR, Case Administrator)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Anna Whitlock re #1 Complaint, by Anita Callahan, Donald Davis Jr, Courtney Hernandez, Kalah James, Laura Perez, Selah Alliance for Equality, Charlotte Town, Amanda Watson, Anna Whitlock. (Gilbert, Carolyn)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Amanda Watson re #1 Complaint, by Anita Callahan, Donald Davis Jr, Courtney Hernandez, Kalah James, Laura Perez, Selah Alliance for Equality, Charlotte Town, Amanda Watson, Anna Whitlock. (Gilbert, Carolyn)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Charlotte Town re #1 Complaint, by Anita Callahan, Donald Davis Jr, Courtney Hernandez, Kalah James, Laura Perez, Selah Alliance for Equality, Charlotte Town, Amanda Watson, Anna Whitlock. (Gilbert, Carolyn)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Laura Perez re #1 Complaint, by Anita Callahan, Donald Davis Jr, Courtney Hernandez, Kalah James, Laura Perez, Selah Alliance for Equality, Charlotte Town, Amanda Watson, Anna Whitlock. (Gilbert, Carolyn)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of Kalah James re #1 Complaint, by Anita Callahan, Donald Davis Jr, Courtney Hernandez, Kalah James, Laura Perez, Selah Alliance for Equality, Charlotte Town, Amanda Watson, Anna Whitlock. (Gilbert, Carolyn)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Courtney Hernandez re #1 Complaint, by Anita Callahan, Donald Davis Jr, Courtney Hernandez, Kalah James, Laura Perez, Selah Alliance for Equality, Charlotte Town, Amanda Watson, Anna Whitlock. (Gilbert, Carolyn)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECLARATION of Rev. Donald Davis Jr. re #1 Complaint, by Anita Callahan, Donald Davis Jr, Courtney Hernandez, Kalah James, Laura Perez, Selah Alliance for Equality, Charlotte Town, Amanda Watson, Anna Whitlock. (Gilbert, Carolyn)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECLARATION of Anita Callahan re #1 Complaint, by Anita Callahan, Donald Davis Jr, Courtney Hernandez, Kalah James, Laura Perez, Selah Alliance for Equality, Charlotte Town, Amanda Watson, Anna Whitlock. (Gilbert, Carolyn)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EXHIBITS A AND B TO #1 COMPLAINT CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by Anita Callahan, Donald Davis Jr, Courtney Hernandez, Kalah James, Laura Perez, Selah Alliance for Equality, Charlotte Town, Amanda Watson, Anna Whitlock Re #1 Complaint,. Description: Exhibits A and B to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Gilbert, Carolyn) Modified on 12/8/2020 to clarify docket entry. (LTR, Case Administrator).
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Selah, Sherry Raymond, Donald Wayman ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # 0980-3637771) Jury Demand. Filed by Laura Perez, Anita Callahan, Anna Whitlock, Kalah James, Courtney Hernandez, Donald Davis Jr, Charlotte Town, Selah Alliance for Equality, Amanda Watson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gilbert, Carolyn) Modified on 12/8/2020: COMPLAINT EXHIBITS A AND B ARE FILED UNDER ECF #2 . (LTR, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selah Alliance for Equality et al v. City of Selah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Callahan
Represented By: Antoinette M Davis
Represented By: Jane Carmody
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Crystal A Pardue
Represented By: Nancy L Talner
Represented By: Jacob James Stillwell
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Represented By: Roxanne Degens
Represented By: Reina A Almon-Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalah James
Represented By: Antoinette M Davis
Represented By: Jane Carmody
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Crystal A Pardue
Represented By: Nancy L Talner
Represented By: Jacob James Stillwell
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Represented By: Roxanne Degens
Represented By: Reina A Almon-Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selah Alliance for Equality
Represented By: Antoinette M Davis
Represented By: Jane Carmody
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Crystal A Pardue
Represented By: Nancy L Talner
Represented By: Jacob James Stillwell
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Represented By: Roxanne Degens
Represented By: Reina A Almon-Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Watson
Represented By: Antoinette M Davis
Represented By: Jane Carmody
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Crystal A Pardue
Represented By: Nancy L Talner
Represented By: Jacob James Stillwell
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Represented By: Roxanne Degens
Represented By: Reina A Almon-Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev Donald Davis Jr
Represented By: Antoinette M Davis
Represented By: Jane Carmody
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Crystal A Pardue
Represented By: Nancy L Talner
Represented By: Jacob James Stillwell
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Perez
Represented By: Antoinette M Davis
Represented By: Jane Carmody
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Nancy L Talner
Represented By: Jacob James Stillwell
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Represented By: Roxanne Degens
Represented By: Reina A Almon-Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Whitlock
Represented By: Antoinette M Davis
Represented By: Jane Carmody
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Crystal A Pardue
Represented By: Nancy L Talner
Represented By: Jacob James Stillwell
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Represented By: Roxanne Degens
Represented By: Reina A Almon-Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Town
Represented By: Antoinette M Davis
Represented By: Jane Carmody
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Crystal A Pardue
Represented By: Jacob James Stillwell
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Represented By: Roxanne Degens
Represented By: Reina A Almon-Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Hernandez
Represented By: Antoinette M Davis
Represented By: Jane Carmody
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Crystal A Pardue
Represented By: Nancy L Talner
Represented By: Jacob James Stillwell
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Represented By: Roxanne Degens
Represented By: Reina A Almon-Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev Donald Davis, Jr
Represented By: Antoinette M Davis
Represented By: Jane Carmody
Represented By: Crystal A Pardue
Represented By: Nancy L Talner
Represented By: Jacob James Stillwell
Represented By: Carolyn S Gilbert
Represented By: Roxanne Degens
Represented By: Reina A Almon-Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Raymond
Represented By: Daniel Robbins Case
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Wayman
Represented By: Daniel Robbins Case
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Selah
Represented By: Daniel Robbins Case
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?