Fiander v. MXR Imaging Inc et al
Plaintiff: Narceaseus Fiander
Defendant: John McBride, MXR Imaging, Inc. and MXR Imaging Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv03036
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE - Text entry; no PDF document: DATE AND TIME CHANGE. The Court will be in trial the week of May 3, 2021 and not available for the hearing on 5/6/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2021 is RESET to 5/11/2021 at 02:30 PM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT and Joint Discovery Plan by All Defendants. (Shea, Timothy)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy D Shea (Shea, Timothy)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 203 Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MXR Imaging Inc. (Shea, Timothy)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy D Shea on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Timothy D Shea added to party MXR Imaging Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy D Shea added to party John McBride(pty:dft))(Shea, Timothy)
March 5, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # BWAEDC-3741143) Jury Demand. Filed by Narceaseus Fiander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hinckley, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiander v. MXR Imaging Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McBride
Represented By: Timothy D Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MXR Imaging, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MXR Imaging Inc
Represented By: Timothy D Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narceaseus Fiander
Represented By: Tyler Michael Hinckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?