Schultz v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Samantha Schultz
Defendant: Andrew M Saul and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv03093
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Fred Van Sickle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by Samantha Schultz re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Tree, D)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
July 27, 2021 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #26SQU652 in the amount of $75.00 from Tree Law Office. (CLP, Case Administrator)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SETTING A PARTIAL FILING FEE. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay a filing fee of $75.00 to initiate this action, which sum shall also satisfy any administrative fee. Filing Fee due by 8/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals a lack of information regarding Plaintiff's expenses. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 8/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (MRJ, Case Administrator)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MRJ, Case Administrator)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Samantha Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)
July 12, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle assigned to case. (MRJ, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schultz v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Schultz
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?