Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, St Paul Guardian Insurance Company and Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company
Defendant: Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc, Columbia Ready-Mix Inc, LSL Properties LLC, Lawrence Sali, Steven Sali, Deleta Sali, Gayle Sali and Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv03094
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Dow on behalf of Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company (Attorney William J Dow added to party Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company(pty:dft))(Dow, William)
September 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis S Floyd on behalf of Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company (Attorney Francis S Floyd added to party Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company(pty:dft))(Floyd, Francis)
August 17, 2021 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas)
August 17, 2021 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St Paul Guardian Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas)
August 17, 2021 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Lether, Thomas)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Lether, Thomas)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company. (Lether, Thomas)
July 21, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Deleta Sali. (Kashimoto, Kasie)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Gayle Sali. (Kashimoto, Kasie)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Lawrence Sali. (Kashimoto, Kasie)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Steven Sali. (Kashimoto, Kasie)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Columbia Ready-Mix Inc. (Kashimoto, Kasie)
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc. (Kashimoto, Kasie)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M Ritchie on behalf of Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc, Columbia Ready-Mix Inc, Deleta Sali, Gayle Sali, Lawrence Sali, Steven Sali (Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Columbia Ready-Mix Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Deleta Sali(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Gayle Sali(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Lawrence Sali(pty:dft), Attorney Peter M Ritchie added to party Steven Sali(pty:dft))(Ritchie, Peter)
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re LSL Properties LLC. (Lether, Thomas)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Columbia Ready-Mix Inc, #2 LSL Properties LLC, #3 Lawrence Sali, #4 Steven Sali, #5 Deleta Sali, #6 Gayle Sali, #7 Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company)(TR, Case Administrator)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3829013) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Columbia Asphalt & Gravel, Inc., #3 Summons Columbia Ready-Mix, Inc., #4 Summons LSL Properties, LLC, #5 Summons Lawrence Sali, #6 Summons Steven Sali, #7 Summons Deleta Sali, #8 Summons Gayle Sali, #9 Summons Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company)(Lether, Thomas)
July 13, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Represented By: Kasie Kashimoto
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Represented By: Kasie Kashimoto
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Represented By: Kasie Kashimoto
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St Paul Guardian Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Represented By: Kasie Kashimoto
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Represented By: Kasie Kashimoto
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Asphalt & Gravel Inc
Represented By: Peter M Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Ready-Mix Inc
Represented By: Peter M Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSL Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Sali
Represented By: Peter M Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sali
Represented By: Peter M Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deleta Sali
Represented By: Peter M Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle Sali
Represented By: Peter M Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Concrete and Asphalt Company
Represented By: Francis S Floyd
Represented By: William J Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?