Grigsby v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: James Grigsby
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv03097
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Fred Van Sickle
Referring Judge: Lonny R Suko
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle no longer assigned to case. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (RG, Chief Deputy)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Grigsby re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Brandt, Cory)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued to General Counsel Social Security Administration as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney General, #2 U.S. Attorney)(LTR, Case Administrator)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by James Grigsby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Brandt, Cory)
August 4, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grigsby v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Grigsby
Represented By: Cory J Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?