Cochran v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Isaac Cochran
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv03164
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by Isaac Cochran re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Tree, D)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Peter Phillips on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Jacob Peter Phillips added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Phillips, Jacob)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Summons- USA, #2 Summons-USAG)(MRJ, Case Administrator)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3940110) Filed by Isaac Cochran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons (Tree, D) Modified on 12/15/2021: Titles (MRJ, Case Administrator).
December 15, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (MRJ, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochran v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Cochran
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Represented By: Jacob Peter Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?