Gilpin v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: John Wesley Gilpin
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv03002
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Edward F Shea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Eric Staples on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Jeffrey Eric Staples added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Staples, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2022 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by John Wesley Gilpin re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Tree, D)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; finding as moot #5 Magistrate Judge Goeke's Report and Recommendation and therefore NOT ADOPTED. Signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea. (AY, Case Administrator)
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion Report and Recommendation filed by John Wesley Gilpin. (Tree, D)
January 14, 2022 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #26UKUGSN in the amount of $402.00 from D James Tree. (LTR, Case Administrator)
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re ECF No. 2 ***Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by: John Wesley Gilpin. (Tree, D). Objections to R&R due by 1/26/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (TR, Case Administrator)
January 12, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued to General Counsel, Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney General) as to Kilolo Kijakazi.(AY, Case Administrator)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by John Wesley Gilpin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)
January 6, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Edward F. Shea assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilpin v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wesley Gilpin
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Represented By: Jeffrey Eric Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?