Robinson v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Micki Jean Robinson
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv03006
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE by Micki Jean Robinson re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Tree, D)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
January 18, 2022 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #26ULH3GR in the amount of $200 from James Tree. (AY, Case Administrator)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SETTING A PARTIAL FEE. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay a filing fee of $200.00 to initiate this action, which sum shall also satisfy any administrative fee. Filing Fee due by 2/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (CLP, Case Administrator)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Summons AUSA, #2 Summons General Counsel).(CLP, Case Administrator)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Micki Jean Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)
January 10, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micki Jean Robinson
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?