Peralez v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Belinda Peralez
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv03009
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Frances Highland on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Erin Frances Highland added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Highland, Erin)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE by Belinda Peralez re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Tree, D)
February 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (KP, Law Clerk)
January 28, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney, #2 Attorney General)(SG, Case Administrator)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Belinda Peralez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)
January 28, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peralez v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Peralez
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Represented By: Erin Frances Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?