State of Washington et al v. United States Food and Drug Administration et al
Plaintiff: State of Washington, State of Oregon, State of Arizona, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, Attorney General of Michigan, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Maine, District of Columbia and State of Hawaii
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Xavier Becerra and Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Intervenor Plaintiff: State of Idaho, State of Iowa, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas and State of Utah
Amicus Curiae: Legal Voice, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Nurse-Midwives, American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Society of General Internal Medicine, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of Gynecologic Surgeons, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists and Washington State Medical Association
Case Number: 1:2023cv03026
Filed: February 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 5 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act - Right of Review
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DENYING #76 MOTION TO INTERVENE. Proposed State Plaintiff-Intervenors' State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Idaho and State of Iowa are terminated; granting #77 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Joshua N Turner for State of Idaho; granting #79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Peter M Torstensen, Jr for State of Montana; granting #85 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Thomas T Hydrick for State of South Carolina; granting #87 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Eric H Wessan for State of Iowa; granting #88 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Leif A Olson for State of Texas; granting #89 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Christopher A Bates for State of Utah. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (TNC, Case Administrator)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #76 MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Idaho, State of Iowa, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of Utah. (Wilson, Lincoln)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Shannon Rose Selden added for American Academy of Family Physicians; American Academy of Pediatrics; American College of Nurse-Midwives; American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists; American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society; American Medical Association; American Society for Reproductive Medicine; Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology; North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology; Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine; Society of General Internal Medicine; Society of Gynecologic Oncology; Society of Gynecologic Surgeons; Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists; and Washington State Medical Association. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Molly Meegan added for American Academy of Family Physicians; American Academy of Pediatrics; American College of Nurse-Midwives; American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists; American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society; American Medical Association; American Society for Reproductive Medicine; Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology; North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology; Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine; Society of General Internal Medicine; Society of Gynecologic Oncology; Society of Gynecologic Surgeons; Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists; and Washington State Medical Association. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Megan McGuiggan added for American Academy of Family Physicians; American Academy of Pediatrics; American College of Nurse-Midwives; American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists; American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society; American Medical Association; American Society for Reproductive Medicine; Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology; North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology; Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine; Society of General Internal Medicine; Society of Gynecologic Oncology; Society of Gynecologic Surgeons; Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists; and Washington State Medical Association. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jessica Morris added for American Academy of Family Physicians; American Academy of Pediatrics; American College of Nurse-Midwives; American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists; American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society; American Medical Association; American Society for Reproductive Medicine; Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology; North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology; Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine; Society of General Internal Medicine; Society of Gynecologic Oncology; Society of Gynecologic Surgeons; Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists; and Washington State Medical Association. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Adam Aukand-Peck added for American Academy of Family Physicians; American Academy of Pediatrics; American College of Nurse-Midwives; American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists; American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society; American Medical Association; American Society for Reproductive Medicine; Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology; North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology; Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine; Society of General Internal Medicine; Society of Gynecologic Oncology; Society of Gynecologic Surgeons; Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists; and Washington State Medical Association. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Erin N. Lau. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4272595. by State of Hawaii. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: For good cause shown, the Proposed Intervenors' unopposed #90 Motion to Expedite is GRANTED. The Proposed Intervenors shall file a reply to the #76 Motion to Intervene on or before April 20, 2023. A hearing is set for the #76 Motion to Intervene and #77 #79 #85 #87 #88 #89 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice on April 21, 2023 without oral argument. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER - NO PDF ATTACHED. (HH, Law Clerk)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Motion Hearing as to #76 MOTION to Intervene , #77 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Joshua N. Turner, #79 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Peter M. Torstensen, Jr., #85 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Thomas T. Hydrick, #87 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Eric H. Wessan, #88 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Leif A. Olson, and #89 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Christopher A. Bates. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2023 without oral argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (HH, Law Clerk)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Katzen, Noah)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 DECLARATION by Kristin Beneski in Opposition re #76 MOTION to Intervene filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beneski, Kristin)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE to Motion re #76 MOTION to Intervene filed by All Plaintiffs. (Beneski, Kristin)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #76 MOTION to Intervene filed by Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration. (Katzen, Noah)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting ECF No. #81 Motion to Clarify; granting ECF No. #82 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice.
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION to Expedite by State of Idaho, State of Iowa, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of Utah. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Wilson, Lincoln)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Christopher A. Bates. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4267990. by State of Utah. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Wilson, Lincoln)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Leif A. Olson. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4267976. by State of Texas. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Wilson, Lincoln)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Eric H. Wessan. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4267873. by State of Iowa. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Wilson, Lincoln)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #82 MOTION to Expedite filed by Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration. (Katzen, Noah)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Thomas T. Hydrick. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4267782. by State of South Carolina. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Wilson, Lincoln)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE to Motion re #82 MOTION to Expedite filed by All Plaintiffs. (Beneski, Kristin)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Joshua Perry. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4267047. by State of Connecticut. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Expedite by Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Katzen, Noah)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Clarify by Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Katzen, Noah)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying ECF No. #52 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief; denying ECF No. #69 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting in part and denying in part ECF No. #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice.
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Peter M. Torstensen, Jr.. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4265245. by State of Montana. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Wilson, Lincoln)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing. Proceedings held on 3/28/2023 in Spokane, Washington before Judge Thomas O. Rice. Page Numbers: 1 - 28 Parties have seven (7) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court website at www.waed.uscourts.gov. To purchase a copy of the transcript contact Court Reporter/Transcriber Allison Anderson at 509-458-3465 or Allison_Anderson@waed.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/25/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2023. (Anderson, Allison)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Joshua N. Turner. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4260708. by State of Idaho, State of Iowa, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of Utah. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Wilson, Lincoln)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to Intervene by State of Idaho, State of Iowa, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of Utah. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Wilson, Lincoln)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Eleanor Spottswood. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4260649. by State of Vermont. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Steven M. Sullivan. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4260645. by State of Maryland. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Heidi Parry Stern. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4260631. by State of Nevada. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RESPONSE to Notice of Supplemental Information by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Beneski, Kristin)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Supplemental NOTICE by Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration (Katzen, Noah)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas O. Rice: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2023. (Reported by: Allison Anderson) (BF, Paralegal)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Nurse-Midwives, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society, American Medical Association, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, Society of General Internal Medicine, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of Gynecologic Surgeons, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists, Washington State Medical Association. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiskopf, Daniel)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Shannon R. Selden. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4256453. by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Nurse-Midwives, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society, American Medical Association, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, Society of General Internal Medicine, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of Gynecologic Surgeons, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists, Washington State Medical Association. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiskopf, Daniel)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Molly Meegan. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4256450. by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Nurse-Midwives, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society, American Medical Association, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, Society of General Internal Medicine, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of Gynecologic Surgeons, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists, Washington State Medical Association. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiskopf, Daniel)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Megan McGuiggan. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4256448. by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Nurse-Midwives, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society, American Medical Association, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, Society of General Internal Medicine, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of Gynecologic Surgeons, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists, Washington State Medical Association. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiskopf, Daniel)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jessica Morris. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4256443. by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Nurse-Midwives, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society, American Medical Association, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, Society of General Internal Medicine, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of Gynecologic Surgeons, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists, Washington State Medical Association. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiskopf, Daniel)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Adam Aukand-Peck. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4256420. by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Nurse-Midwives, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society, American Medical Association, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, Society of General Internal Medicine, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of Gynecologic Surgeons, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists, Washington State Medical Association. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiskopf, Daniel)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DECLARATION by Courtney Schreiber, M.D., M.P.H. in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Beneski, Kristin)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DECLARATION by Karen Nelson in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Beneski, Kristin)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DECLARATION by Andrew Hughes in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Beneski, Kristin)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Beneski, Kristin)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M Weiskopf on behalf of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Nurse-Midwives, American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society, American Society for Reproductive Medicine, Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology, North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology, Society of General Internal Medicine, Society of Gynecologic Oncology, Society of Gynecologic Surgeons, Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists, Washington State Medical Association (Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party American Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party American Academy of Family Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party American Academy of Pediatrics(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party American College of Nurse-Midwives(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party American Society for Reproductive Medicine(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party Society of General Internal Medicine(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party Society of Gynecologic Oncology(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party Society of Gynecologic Surgeons(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists(pty:am), Attorney Daniel M Weiskopf added to party Washington State Medical Association(pty:am))(Weiskopf, Daniel)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Halliday Moncure added for Plaintiff State of Maine. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Halliday Moncure. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number CWAEDC-4254390. by State of Maine. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' Unopposed #54 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and #55 Motion to Expedite are GRANTED. Plaintiffs' reply shall not exceed 17 pages. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER - NO PDF ATTACHED. (HH, Law Clerk)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Exceed Page Limits by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Beneski, Kristin)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Beneski, Kristin)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMICUS BRIEF by Legal Voice. (Beane, Amanda)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Legal Voice. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beane, Amanda)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Katzen Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Katzen, Noah)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: For good cause shown, Defendants' #48 Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and #49 Consent Motion to Expedite are GRANTED. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall not exceed 35 pages. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER - NO PDF ATTACHED. (HH, Law Clerk) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Consent MOTION to Expedite by Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Katzen, Noah)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Katzen, Noah)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Vanessa L. Kassab added for Plaintiff District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nicole S. Hill added for Plaintiff District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Vanessa L. Kassab. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4245806. by State of Delaware. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Nicole S. Hill. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4245466. by District of Columbia. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Caitlyn G. McEllis for Plaintiff State of Illinois. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Liz Kramer added for Plaintiff State of Minnesota. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jennifer Olson added for Plaintiff State of Minnesota. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jill M. Graziano added for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Caitlyn G. McEllis. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4244596. by State of Illinois. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Liz Kramer. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4244593. by State of Minnesota. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jennifer Olson. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4244590. by State of Minnesota. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jill M. Graziano. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4244559. by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by All Plaintiffs.(Beneski, Kristin)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel C. Barr added for Plaintiff State of Arizona. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Luci D. Davis added for Plaintiff State of Arizona. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Stephanie M. Service added for Plaintiff Attorney General of Michigan. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael D. McMaster added for Plaintiff State of Colorado. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Eric R. Olson added for Plaintiff State of Colorado. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Aletheia Allen added for Plaintiff State of New Mexico. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Tera M Heintz on behalf of State of Washington (Attorney Tera M Heintz added to party State of Washington(pty:pla))(Heintz, Tera)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Scott on behalf of State of Oregon (Attorney Carla Scott added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla))(Scott, Carla)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Daniel C. Barr. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4240270. by State of Arizona. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Luci D. Davis. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4240264. by State of Arizona. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Stephanie M. Service. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4240190. by Attorney General of Michigan. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Michael D. McMaster. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4240182. by State of Colorado. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Eric R. Olson. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4240068. by State of Colorado. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Aletheia Allen. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4240057, by State of New Mexico Washington. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Hughes, Andrew) Modified on 3/3/2023 to correct the filing party (CV, Courtroom Deputy).
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: For good cause shown, Defendants' #16 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED in part. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before 3/17/2023. Plaintiffs' Reply, if any, is due on or before 3/24/2023. The hearing on the motion is RESET to 3/28/2023 at 8:30 AM in Spokane Courtroom 902 before Judge Thomas O. Rice. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF ATTACHED. (BF, Paralegal)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Motion Hearing as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing reset for 3/28/2023 at 8:30 AM in Spokane Courtroom 902 before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by All Plaintiffs. (Beneski, Kristin)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: For good cause shown, Defendants' #17 Unopposed Motion to Expedite is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendants' #16 Motion for Extension of Time no later than March 6, 2023. A hearing on the motion is set for March 7, 2023 without oral argument. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER - NO PDF ATTACHED. (HH, Law Clerk)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Motion Hearing as to #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2023 without oral argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (HH, Law Clerk)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite by Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Katzen, Noah)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Katzen, Noah)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah T Katzen on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Robert M Califf, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration (Attorney Noah T Katzen added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Noah T Katzen added to party Robert M Califf(pty:dft), Attorney Noah T Katzen added to party United States Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Noah T Katzen added to party United States Food and Drug Administration(pty:dft))(Katzen, Noah)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Julia C. Harvey added for State of Washington. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney YoungWoo Joh added for State of Oregon. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is accepted as filed. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Beneski, Kristin)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re All Defendants. (Beneski, Kristin)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re All Defendants. (Beneski, Kristin)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #2 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Beneski, Kristin)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Julia C. Harvey. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4234894 by State of Rhode Island Washington. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2023 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Hughes, Andrew) Modified on 3/3/2023 to correct the filing party (LAS, Case Administrator).
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Department of Health and Human Services, #2 Summons Robert Califf, #3 Summons Xavier Becerra)(TNC, Case Administrator)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: YoungWoo Joh. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4234593. by State of Oregon. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2023 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Hull, Sander)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECLARATION by Plaintiff States in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-19)(Beneski, Kristin)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beneski, Kristin)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2023 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beneski, Kristin)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Motion Hearings for 3/27/2023 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Julia C. Harvey. #2 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: YoungWoo Joh. (CLP, Case Administrator Team Lead)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TNC, Case Administrator)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-4234043) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Summons FDA, #22 Summons Califf, #23 Summons HHS, #24 Summons Becerra, #25 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beneski, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington et al v. United States Food and Drug Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Andrew Wenderoff Hughes
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Lauryn K Fraas
Represented By: Noah G Purcell
Represented By: Colleen M Melody
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Sander Marcus Hull
Represented By: Carla Scott
Represented By: YoungWoo Joh
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arizona
Represented By: Daniel C Barr
Represented By: Luci Danielle Davis
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Eric R Olson
Represented By: Michael D McMaster
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Caitlyn Gulia McEllis
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attorney General of Michigan
Represented By: Stephanie M Service
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Aletheia Allen
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Julia C Harvey
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Olson
Represented By: Liz C Kramer
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Jill M Graziano
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maine
Represented By: Halliday Moncure
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Nicole Suzanne Hill
Represented By: Vanessa L Kassab
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Califf
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Noah T Katzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State of Idaho
Represented By: Joshua N Turner
Represented By: Lincoln Davis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State of Iowa
Represented By: Eric H Wessan
Represented By: Lincoln Davis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State of Montana
Represented By: Peter M Torstensen, Jr
Represented By: Lincoln Davis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Lincoln Davis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Thomas T Hydrick
Represented By: Lincoln Davis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Leif A Olson
Represented By: Lincoln Davis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State of Utah
Represented By: Christopher A Bates
Represented By: Lincoln Davis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Voice
Represented By: Amanda J Beane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Family Physicians
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Nurse-Midwives
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Gynecological and Obstetrical Society
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society for Reproductive Medicine
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Council of University Chairs of Obstetrics & Gynecology
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North American Society for Pediatric and Adolescent Gynecology
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society of General Internal Medicine
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society of Gynecologic Oncology
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society of Gynecologic Surgeons
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society of OB/GYN Hospitalists
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington State Medical Association
Represented By: Adam B Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Daniel M Weiskopf
Represented By: Jessica Morris
Represented By: Molly A Meegan
Represented By: Megan McGuiggan
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?