Estate of Justin M Magleby v. Bonneville Power Administration et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Justin M Magleby
Defendant: Bonneville Power Administration, Northwest Helicopters LLC and MacKay & Sposito Inc
Case Number: 1:2023cv03060
Filed: May 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Northwest Helicopters LLC.(Attorney Mark Steven Northcraft added to party Northwest Helicopters LLC(pty:dft))(Northcraft, Mark)
June 2, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by MacKay & Sposito Inc.(Dishaw, Meredith)
May 23, 2023 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by Estate of Justin M Magleby re Bonneville Power Administration. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, p 5, #2 Appendix B, p 6, #3 Appendix C, p 7)(Dunn, Robert)
May 22, 2023 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by Estate of Justin M Magleby re Bonneville Power Administration. (Dunn, Robert)
May 22, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith E Dishaw on behalf of MacKay & Sposito Inc (Attorney Meredith E Dishaw added to party MacKay & Sposito Inc(pty:dft))(Dishaw, Meredith)
May 15, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Justin M Magleby re MacKay & Sposito Inc. (Dunn, Robert)
May 3, 2023 Filing 5 Clerk's ORDER OF RANDOM REASSIGNMENT. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. This text-only entry constitutes the order or notice by the Court. (LAS, Case Administrator)
May 3, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Estate of Justin M Magleby re Northwest Helicopters LLC. (Dunn, Robert)
May 3, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Northwest Helicopters LLC, #2 Summons Mackay & Sposito Inc)(LAS, Case Administrator)
May 2, 2023 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 5/12/2023. (LAS, Case Administrator)
May 2, 2023 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke assigned to case. (LAS, Case Administrator)
May 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Bonneville Power Administration, MacKay & Sposito, Inc., Northwest Helicopters, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-4283641) Jury Demand. Filed by In re the Estate of Justin M. Magleby, by and through Steven R. Magleby, Personal Representative and on behalf of the Estate's statutory beneficiaries. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bonneville Power Administration, #3 Summons Northwest Helicopters, #4 Summons MacKay & Sposito)(Dunn, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Justin M Magleby v. Bonneville Power Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Justin M Magleby
Represented By: Alexandria Tina Drake
Represented By: Kenneth A Thompson
Represented By: Robert A Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonneville Power Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Helicopters LLC
Represented By: Aaron D Bigby
Represented By: Melissa A Daniels
Represented By: Mark Steven Northcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacKay & Sposito Inc
Represented By: Meredith E Dishaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?