Luna v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Joel Luna
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 1:2023cv03186
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Opening Brief to be filed by 2/26/2024. Commissioner's Brief to be filed by 3/27/2024. Response to Commissioner's Brief due by 4/10/2024. Social Security Hearing set for 5/1/2024 Without Oral Argument. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the Court. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (thb)
January 25, 2024 Filing 7 Administrative Record by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Highland, Erin)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Mary K. Dimke for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian no longer assigned to case. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (RG, Chief Deputy)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Frances Highland on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Erin Frances Highland added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Highland, Erin)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (HF)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3: Service, the Court hereby notifies the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of Washington of the commencement of this action by transmitting to them this docket entry via Notice of Electronic Filing. If Plaintiff is proceeding pro se and is not registered to receive electronic notice of filings, this Notice will be delivered to plaintiff via U.S. mail. Per Rule 3, "the plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4." TEXT ENTRY - No PDF Document. (TNC, Case Administrator)
November 28, 2023 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (TNC, Case Administrator)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Joel Luna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Luna
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Represented By: Erin Frances Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?