Paget v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Devon Elizabeth Paget
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 1:2024cv03049
Filed: April 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Edward F Shea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Filing 6 Administrative Record by Defendant Martin O'Malley. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(Becia, Franco)
April 17, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Franco L Becia appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (Attorney Franco L Becia added to party Martin O'Malley(pty:dft))(Becia, Franco)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (HF)
April 3, 2024 Filing 3 Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3: Service, the Court hereby notifies the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of Washington of the commencement of this action by transmitting to them this docket entry via Notice of Electronic Filing. If Plaintiff is proceeding pro se and is not registered to receive electronic notice of filings, this Notice will be delivered to plaintiff via U.S. mail. Per Rule 3, "the plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4." TEXT ENTRY - No PDF Document. (SG, Case Administrator)
April 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley IFP Pending Filed by Devon E Paget. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tree, D)
April 3, 2024 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Edward F. Shea assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paget v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Elizabeth Paget
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Represented By: Franco L Becia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?