In Re Hanford Nuclear Reservation Litigation
Plaintiff: Evenson, et al, Barbara Alvarado, Ruth Jilg, Aaron Spechko, William H Boyer, Bud Eugene Coon, Maxine Coon, Melvin Brittain, Mishie P Brown, Eugene W Burkwist, Dorothy Bushey, Pauline McCoy, Dorothy Ann Calahan, Jacquelyn Chiddister, Deborah G Clark, Dean Cooney, Janet Vercoe Corlett, Dean Gordon Vercoe, Teresa A Curtis, Russell Eager, Verdeen Edington, Abbe Gayle Fleming, Patricia Anne Fletcher, Patricia Fredricks, Sharon L Gaedeke, Eva C Garrett, Peggy L Getz, Max Graber, John D Franklin, Teresa Hanenburg, Jeanne Haycraft, Thomas - Jackson, Patricia Moore, Bea Herman, Robert Ray Herman, Allen Hilzer, Stella Hilzer, Richard - Hollenback, Doris Hollenback, Carla Howg, Cheryl Hutton, Charles Jackson, Richard Johannes, Louise Johannes, Ginger Keith McCoy, Ida Keith, Jacquelyn R Kempton, Linda Kromer, Carla Anne Lathrom, Joyce Lemasters, Linda Lenberg, Barbara A Lewis, Rose M Lindgren, Frank Lombard, Charles W Lombard, Nicole Maestretti, Victoria Maestretti, Julie Maple, Alfred Olsen, Nona Olsen, Neil David Martin, Jr, Erliss McCormack, Eldon McCormack, Ted McCoy, Charlotte Eager, Donna McDonell, James McElrath, Carole Means, Nancy Meise, Mary Mooney, Donald R Mooney, Ann I Murphy, Susan Neal-Thompson, Jerry Nielsen, Joan M Norem, Marcella Parish, Deanne Hames, Patricia Peasley, Nancy Retzloff, Sharon Rusch, Kenneth A Rusch, Bonnie - Schepcoff, Donna Schirmer, Ann K Schneider, Elsie M Sheard, Ruth Siria, Darlene Slaughter, Mickey L Smith, A W Nelson, Helen D Snyder, Monte W Stallcop, William T Stough, Arlene Stromberger, Loletta Carter, Lloyd Templeton, Donna Therriault Robertson, Walter Ramirez, Eva Vorderbrueggen, Donald Vorderbrueggen, Vickie Walsh, Kenneth W Whitmire, Nancy Williams, Wallace Williams, Delbert Wilson, Brenda L Wood, Marva Yandell, Ruth F Beauvais, Lois C Camp, Hadassah Cohen, Dominic J Curley, Everett Lee Evans, Paige A Gardner, Valinda D Grant, Dora Marie Hoefel, Paul F Hoefel, Patricia P Hoover, Bessie Ann Houck, Roderick Coles Jackson, Max Pierce, Harriet Elizabeth Pierce, Jean M Weaver, Noreen L Wynne, Verla J Zielke, Joni Aiyeku, Clint Alexander, Gerald Wallace Amsbury, R Niel Arbogast, Lea Retta Grace Arbogast, Claudia N Barton, Geraldine Anne Bauer, Sandra M Bishop, Kathleen Ann Bogen, Myrtle Neoma Bowman, Lawson G Brian, III, Nancy K Byrum, Adrian L Chenault, Barbara Eckmann, Jenneth Ann Gabel, Jacqueline Gallaway, Stanley Ben Gallaway, Lessie Lee Hess, Marilyn Hiatt, Laverne Kautz, Mary - Schultz, Thelma Lee Magnuson, Delores M McCulloch, Marylin F Mlnarik, Genevieve D Bowman, Deloris Miller, Gladys Dilly, James L Riggs, Hilda J Roberts, Carol Rossi, Gloria H Sackmann, Charlotte V Romjue, Donna K Schockey, Darcy Jae Sky, Steven H Stanton, Kay E Sutherland, Kenneth B Swearingen, Thomas D Thies, Paul R Troeh, Carla G Viken, Terry Michael Wood, Duane L Wright, Judith Ann Abken, Diane L Adams, Adabelle H Altmeyer, Linda Rae Alvarado, Marquerite K Amstadt, Beverly R Andersen, Donna Ruth Arrington, Irene M Atterberry, Janet L Balfe, Patricia N Banta, Dixie M Bass, Karen A Bell, E Lee Bero, Vera Berry, Charles U Blakley, Donna Blakley, Geraldine Blumenschein, Shirley J Borgen, Evelyn J Bowers, Amy L Bright, Charles E Brinkman, Marc B Brown, Carole J Brummett, Gloria J Bryant, Mary Lou Bryant, Bonnie Buchanan, Michael J Buckmaster, Robert D Bullard, Judith Burke-Holya, William H Butherus, Donna D Butler, Julie M Bynum, Ruth N Cahalan, Patsy J Califf, Ruth I Callaway, Marlene L Campbell, Kathleen B Cannon, Roberta J Case, Everett Edwin Christen, Beatrice A Christoph, Mary A Clauson, Evelyn Ann Closson, Kathleen G Collins, James J Compton, Henry C Cone, Katherine R Connerly, E Marjorie Cosgrove, Carol Covington, Frances E Cox, Ann Garvie Criss, James T Davis, Veronica Denslow, Loren G Devers, Linda A Dewall, Brian C Diehm, Linda C Donoghue, Vicki A Duggins, Betty J Dupree, Jeanie England, Joyce Beverly Fitch, Lois Foraker, Deanna L Frantum, Edwin J Frazier, Karen D Freeman, Joseph M Fry, Susan K Funk, Gregg H Fusman, Sara Z George, Mary S Gilbert, Philip E Gill, Joyce Gottschalk, Irene Gwen Grant, Frances L Gregory, Carol L Gunnels, Sheila M Gustafson, Mildred A Haines, Linda Sue Hainline, Nancy R Hansel, Donald A Hanson, Daniel L Harmon, Sharon Kay Harrington, Ralph J Hein, Michael M Helland, Mary - Hengen, Dennis Herron, Merry E Herron, Suzann Holman, Lucile Hopkins, Patricia M Horne-Brine, Sandra J Ireland, David A Isom, Joan Jans, Carolyn Jewell, Mary V Johnson, Kathey Johnston, Julie D Jones, Loraine Savage Jones, Gary V Jordan, Sandra L Karshen, Nancy J Keeler, Dale W Kendall, Nancy C Kenner, Kathleen King, Mark O Koller, Genevieve Koprock, James D Koprock, Dorita C Kramer, Julita E Kramer, Sharon M Krause, Dana E Lafferty, Betty Laroche, Judy R Leonard, Ernest J Lewandowski, Laura Liester, Doris C Lightfoot, Keith A Lindaas, Sally Jo Little, Donna Lomen, Aloa I Longworth, Russell L Love, Vivian K Lynch, Winston B Mader, Carolyn B Maillet, Amaryellis Mandelin, Carla K Martin, Elizabeth E Maxwell, Rebecca Lyn McAllister, Marion L McCauley, Martha J McNeely, Joan A McVey, Maxine A Mebius, Virginia K Schafer Metcalf, June B Miner, June L Monson, Catherine Mowery, Linda Mueller-Sargent, Jay Mullen, Marion Dale Myers, Connie Jo Nelson, Frederick W Nelson, Carole L Norris, James H O'Brien, Janey Olvera, Glenda E Orgill, L Johann Ostman, Ruth M Owen, Mary B Parish, Pamela R Pearson, Dixie E Peer, Charles E Pefley, Sharon Perrigo, Pauline J Peterson, Dorothy J Phillips, Vicki L Pierce, Douglas Polley, Jennifer L Powell, Joan S Prchal, Trisha T Pritikin, Bonnie Rae, Cathie R Ransom, Robert R Reeves, Clara Reiss, Elaine Rey, Karen L Reynolds, Joel E Rinker, Wanda F Rivers, Judith Ardene Roberts, Kola Robison, Judith M Roseman, Melva May Rue, Dora J Russell, Edith J Rustemeyer, Denise Ryan, Mary E Rydman, Maybelle Sabedra, Adriana M Salinas, Bonnie Samson, Ronnie E Schell, Diana Schreindl, Helen L Schurman, Judith L Selmann, Ada Schackles-Laursen, Gloria Sharples, Dorothy J Shipp, Vivian B Shoemaker, Sharon Silling, Kathleen Simmons, Phyllis N Skeens, George Skinnell, Judith M Slattery, Robert S Snitily, Patsy Solberg, Muriel F Sorensen, Carol M Spano, Frances M Spencer, Jacklyn E Starliper-Bricker, Kathi Steinke, Arden W Stevens, Phillip W Stohs, Alger R Struthers, Larry W Struthers, Floyd C Tate, Gloria Tedder, Rosemarie Tichbourn, Darlene Tortorello, Michael L Tow, Frank Trent, Sr, Glenna M Trout, Ronald E Utz, Sr, Kathryn J Vancampen, Connie Vandergriff, Mae Vanleuven, Neva J Vess, Mark A Volmer, Dee L Wahl, Betty Lou Wales, Lee Albert Walter, Susan N Ward, Mary Webb, Christine Dee Weber, Maxine G Weber, Martha J Werner, Ardith H White, Norma J Whitehead, Charles T Whiteley, Ronald L Whitney, Tommie G Williamson, Glenda Marie Winslow, Colleen Wiyrick, Beverly Jean Zapffe, Toni M Zorn, James Boyd, Didi Brown, William T Davis, Twila L Dentler, Charlotte R McCormick, Pearl Neely, John R Poland, Albert P Schultz, Estelle N Shannon, Stanley W Tamura, Donald R Wolford, Mary Louise Albers, Gladys Mae Alderman, Faye Anderson, Karleen Anderson, Bettie Jean Ball, Luther Barnes, Donald Bennett, III, Betty Bleser, George Brinkman, James S Bronson, Sr, Lula Brooks, Helen Brown, Robert L Brown, Ross Brown, Judi C Bruce, Frank Brugnone, Jr, Ethel Mary Burchell, Elliott Lenhard Burley, Helen Burley, Carol Byers, Vera Candler, Janice Carl, Betty Casparie, Donald Casparie, Naomi Christian, Marianne Collins, Shirley Cope, Colleen Crook, Diane M Cunningham, Jack Dillon, Laine Durand, Lana Emiston, Gerald B Edwards, Diane E Eickman, Verland Fleshman, Agnes Flores, Rheta Foland, Susan Garoutte, Angie Garton, Cleora Giemza, Michael Giemza, Thelma Gilmore, Warren Gonder, Judee Ann Gonsalves, Harold Dean Goodwin, Robert Goolsbey, Esther Gordon, Joy Griffin, Wanda Hadley, Dixie Hamel, Margaret Ann Harned, Donald Harper, Janet M Hastings, Sylvia Hatley, Beverly Higginbotham, Daniel Hilderbrand, Mary Ella Hill, Brenda Hobbs, Jay Hodge, Nathan J Hoffer, Gertrude Hudspeth, James Edward Hyslop, Kathryn Johnson, Allen Kelly, Richard Kepplin, Kent Kilby, Donna L Kinman, Tom Kosmos, Marjorie Langley, Wayne Lawrence, Duane C Lee, Robert - Lee, Elaine LePage, Steven Leuck, Joan W Lloyd, Sharon Lomax, Walter E Long, Diana Malone, Sharon McElvain, Thomas McGuire, Beverly McKenzie, Melva McKinnis, Winnie McLean, Rolinda Meakins, Joe Meler, Jeanette Delores Miller, June Miller, Aubrey Moore, Lori J Myrick, Claude H Outland, Viola Payton, Gail Pearce, Virginia Pease, Joyce Perkins, Dorothy Peterson, Ronald Eugene E Peterson, Patricia A Pierce, Charles Powell, Polly Faye Powell, Betty Prophet, Truman H Quinn, Jesse E Ranes, Gregory Rheiner, Dona Roe, Jefferson Romine, Thomas R Romine, Deloris Roswold, Kent Rothrock, Edith Royer, Catherine W Russell, Cinda Marie Schaff, Cheryl Schlosser, Rudolph Schudy, Mary Lou Schut, Elefreda Sitzman, Gary Small, Richard Alan Smith, Ruth Smith, Benjamin Sorenson, Mary Sparkman, Ann Marie Sporcich, Viola Rose Starkey, Verna Stout, Gerald Sybertz, Mabel Sybertz-Day, Adeline Thompson Schudy, Gregory O Thornton, Marilyn Uhalde, Gertrude Urlacher, Betty Way, Okle Welch, Howard West, Dennis - Williams, Guy F Willis, Ralph Willis, Earl Wills, Marylou Wilson, Robert M Winchell, Harry E Winston, Gloria Wise, Patsy Ann Allen, Robert E Floyd, Harriet Adair Fugitt, Erwin K Nelson, Shannon C Rhodes, Susan D Whitner-Cummings, Art Zumwalt, Frieda - Seaman, Christina Joanne Boyd, Jessie A Tennant, ALL PLAINTIFFS, Paulette L Losh, JAROS PLAINTIFFS, MATTHIES PLAINTIFFS, SEAMAN PLAINTIFFS, HAMILTON/CRISWELL PLAINTIFFS, EVENSON PLAINTIFFS, BERG PLAINTIFFS, BERG/LUMPKIN PLAINTIFFS, Rance Jones, Frances Bailie, Glenda Bloom, Raye S Farrar, J Lynn Martell, Beverly J Anderson, Janiece J Anderson, Ellen Marie Anthony, Manuel G Arambul, Edlamae Thompson Baird, George Eric Barnard, Betty Jane Bernard, Robert Bernard, Karen Dee Bertsch, Shirley M Cornwell, Sally Jean Coxen, Glen Craig, Eddie R Crouch, Joanne K Davis, Barbara Devore, Linda Lee Dillard, Laurel A Druffel-Kuther, Peggy A Dudley, Nancy Dunham, Elsworth Clark Dyer, Patricia Magnaghi, Donna Mae Eaton, Linda P Eddy, Carol M Erickson, James Fickas, Gloria M Fode, Kathy Francis, Roger G Freeland, Katherine Gallant, Donnell E Gana, Bernard Henry Getz, Benjamin Buel Getz, Letha A Grubb, Marybell Hagen, David L Blood, Carol D Bos, Pauline Margaret Bourque, Jo Ann Bourque, Rene Brecto, Nancee Hinchliffe, Donald R Harper, Mary Magdalen Hash, Vern Hawkes, Waldo Luiten, Diane Lutes, Nancy K Lykken, Efthemios H Manolopoulos, Lori J Gana, Arvin Marchel, Frances Rita Martinez, Alma Martinez, Carol J McNabb, Judy Martin, Maria Carmen Mejia, Jerry D Mills, Patricia Ann Moore, Jeannette Moran, Christina Moran, Larry A Morse, John H Moseley, Donna L Nalley, Daniel B Myers, Edward J Myers, George E Myers, Thomas D Myers, Rochelle Newton, Anita Nicholas, Dorothy Olberding, Gordon S Olsen, Frankie Jean O'Neal, Sali Michaels, Jacklyn C O'Neal, Mary Janell Pace, Dolores Harter Parsons, Don J Parsons, Jeanne R Perkins, Jill Lorene Perkins, Jan Eric Peterson, Marietta Unternahrer, Pattra C Valley, Adrian J Waller, Lois E Waller, J Dale Webb, Ross Weible, Thomas Everett Wells, Elizabeth M Wilson, Leslie Leon Yates, H Cheryl Yates, Douglas Yoes, Bill D Zink, Ruth E Brendale, Pamela C Brown, Lois Dalrymple, Donna L Bucher, Nancy C Burdick, Gerald Canright, Charlotte Canright, Lois Maxine Canright, Jeffrey L Canright, Michael Lee Canright, Raymond D Casebeer, Betty A Casebeer, Edward A Casseday, Sr, Ina Harkins Clodius, Jean Marie Conner, Hubert J Anthony, Manuel Arambul, Americo G Pruneda, Delores M Pruneda, Eli Rapaich, Karen M Reich, James B Rodda, Norman L Roff, Marilyn K Roff, Darlene J Ruchert, Bruce D Schmick, Justin M Schroeder, Helen Patricia Schroeder, Bessie E Sellars, Emogene Grace Sellars, Mike F Shannon, Elvin Roy Shinkle, Lynnette Shinkle, Judy Ellen Simons, Daniel Edward Slagle, Terry George Speicher, Leona R Standage, Mabel Juanita Starkey, Joseph D Starkey, Sara E Stearns, Rudolph A Stetner, Judith R Steward, Leslie Stockton, Teresa Marie Stone, David M Strasser, Vern E Studer, Seville Marie Tosto, Patricia Marie Kagele, Michele Kiesz, Gene Kenneth Kagele, Thom Henry Kembel, Floyd Kester, Christine King, Katherine Grace King, Nelly Kissler, Troy Kissler, James Owen Knight, Katherine Leona Knight, Carol Nacht, Patricia A Knutson, Ramona L Lance, Victor P Lentz, Barbara Lentz, Robert B Linder, Robert Sanford Heath, Priscilla Keim, Mary Margaret Hegstad, Tracy Morris Heintz, M Lorelle Heintz, Sharon Lee Helmick, Timothy John Henricks, Sandra Lee Tedro Holbrook, Janie Giesler, Craig Arnold Johnson, Jimmie A Johnson, Sharon Gail Tschritter Johnson, Carole J Jones, Lorraine E Burgess, Vivian E Hoffman, Shirley A. McGee, Pamela Lee Stratton, Delora M Kilbury, Teresa K Linerud, Minnick-Hayner, Dana Henne, Verna Barnes, Linda Andrews-Sanford, Donald L Enders, Lorraine J Rutherford Halsey, Susie A Haney, Jerry D Martin, Janice M Pratt, Kenneth G Pratt, Robert Glen Walter, James Barnes, Wayne Allen Lukins, Marie Nickoloff, Lester York, Elsie Monk, Ladd Sherman, LaVelle Sherman, Teri Eileen Akins, Sharon Bentz, Cheryl Brazil, Osbaldo Cerrillo, Hermila Cerrillo, Robin Coleman, William Coleman, Nora Cruz, Helen Franz, Earl Franz, Amado Castillo Gonzalez, Marilyn Henderson, James Gail Kibler, Bill Knight, Stephen Lindsay, Maureen Gail Moehle, Marilyn Bjornsen, Donna Owyen, Adelaide A Quebodeaux, Jack Riley, Lois Skidmore, Oralia Zuniga, Lance D Englund, Connie Albright, Mareda Carney, Jeralee Clark, Arlene Clarke, Robert Lee Ellis, Olive Gillespie, Diane Henker, Patricia Hetrick, Deborah Taylor Holk, Joyce Holland, Ralphine Lorton, Maurice Miner, Diana Morton, Nancy Patterson, Terrell Poland, Angela Potter, Clara Powell, Melody Robertson, Barbara Thompson, Della Townsend, Garland Williams, Sr, Terry Wilson, Brian E Bailey, Gail B Bailey, Dianna Bernard, Ruby M Bickel, Evelyn Boschman, Jimmie D Brown, Vivian Sue Rey Dickson, David Dixon, Stephen D Gerber, Gerry Harris, James Vernon Hidy, William Robert Hofer, Miles Kinzer, Gary D Lane, Elathine A Marlow, Shirley K Mills, Myrna A Mitchell, Kenneth Moon, Richard Morton, Lillian Viola Nix, Tom B Para, Katherine N Plager, Wilma J Schaack, Leatha (Alice) Schmierer, John H Smith, Robert Uerling, Jeffrey L Wagner, Barbara Jim, Russell Jim, Joanne Mendoza, Phillip Olney, Grace Settler, Anna M Boyer, Carole Hawkes Davis, James R Kibler, Dorothy Lindsay, Darlene Martin, Elaine Rapaich, Barbara J Franklin, Claire Jay Hahn, Edward Holbrook, Roderick C Jackson, Jr, Jerald Parker, James Baunsgard, Adria Esterbrook, Joseph R Edington, Jr, William Losh, John H Steward, Loni Uchytil, Christopher Vorderbrueggen, Linda S Williams, Richelle A Hendrix, Danelle Bucher, Steve - Clark, David E Eash, Shannon Garcia, Norma G Getz, Larry Griffin, Mary Hanson, Clifford Hays, Joleen Howell, Linda Jenson, Charlene Kembel, Paula Kromer-Bacon, Robert Kuther, Tina Murphy, Donald R Simons, Arlene Studer, Jerry Zink, William M Senske, Jr, Darryl Anderson, Joseph A Strasser, Laurie Riley, Diane R McCrorey, Janet Struthers, Sheila A Mead and Donald D Corkrum
Defendant: E I duPont de Nemours and Company, - General Electric Company, UNC Nuclear Industries Inc and ALL DEFENDANTS
Intervenor: Cowles Publishing Co
Mediator: Gary Neil Bloom
Amicus: Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Case Number: 2:1991cv03015
Filed: February 6, 1991
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Wm. Fremming Nielsen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3611 ORDER Dismissing Certain Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice; granting 3608 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (cc: Jay Mullen via first class mail, along with a copy of Exhibit A (PL, Case Administrator).
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3605 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting 3603 Motion to Dismiss. The claims of Plaintiff Ina Harkins Clodius are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (PL, Case Administrator)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3596 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF SHARON LOMAX'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE, granting 3586 Motion to Dismiss. Party Sharon Lomax (Jaros Plaintiff) terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (LR, Case Administrator)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3572 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS GLORIA WISE AND LUTHER BARNES' CLAIMS; granting 3570 Motion to Dismiss. The claims of Luther Barnes are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The claims of Gloria Wise are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (PL, Case Administrator)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3567 ORDER Granting 3561 Agreed Motion to Dismiss Certain Plaintiffs' Claims With Prejudice. The claims of the following parties are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE: Janiece J Anderson, Sharon Bentz, David L Blood, Marlene L Campbell, Jacquelyn Ch iddister, Glen Craig, Charlotte Eager, Carol M Erickson, Patricia Anne Fletcher, Gloria M Fode, Paige A Gardner, Valinda D Grant, Jeanne Haycraft, Marilyn Henderson, Stella Hilzer, Sharon Gail Tschritter Johnson, Patricia Marie Kagele, Carla Anne Lat hrom, Joyce Lemasters, Waldo Luiten, Carole Means, Jerry D Mills, Susan Neal-Thompson, Walter Ramirez, Jack Riley, Darlene J Ruchert, Bonnie Schepcoff, Bessie E Sellars, Sara E Stearns, Arlene Stromberger, and Seville Marie Tosto. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (PL, Case Administrator)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3563 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE; granting ECF No. 3554 Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal; granting ECF No. 3556 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend ECF No. 3554 to Remove Plaintiff Betty Way. Partie s Betty Bleser, Helen Brown, Mareda Carney, Colleen Crook, Agnes Flores, Esther Gordon, Margaret Ann Harned, Daniel Hilderbrand, Brenda Hobbs, Joyce Holland, Gertrude Hudspeth, June Miller, Viola Payton, Virginia Pease, Terrell Poland, Melody Robertson, and Deloris Roswold are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (PL, Case Administrator)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3560 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting 3553 Motion to Dismiss. Parties Karen Dee Bertsch, Ruth E Brendale, Loletta Carter, Raymond D Casebeer, Sally Jean Coxen, Nora Cruz, Peggy A Dudley, James Fickas, Tracy Morris Hei ntz, Louise Johannes, Craig Arnold Johnson, Katherine Grace King, Nelly Kissler, Paulette L Losh, Frances Rita Martinez, James McElrath, Maria Carmen Mejia, Larry A Morse, Daniel B Myers, Edward J Myers, Thomas D Myers, Nona Olsen, Dolores Harter Parsons, Norman L Roff, Leona R Standage, Mabel Juanita Starkey, and Judith R Steward terminated from case. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (PL, Case Administrator)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3516 ORDER CORRECTING DOCKET; granting in part and denying in part 3498 Motion to Dismiss and Remove Certain Plaintiffs from Court Docket. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (PL, Case Administrator)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3515 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF PEGGY L. GETZ'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting ECF No. 3513 Motion to Dismiss. Party Peggy L Getz (Berg Plaintiff, individually - Deceased, PR is Scott J. Getz) terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (PL, Case Administrator)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3497 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting 3496 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (PL, Case Administrator)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3485 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE granting 3484 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3471 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF WALLACE WILLIAMS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting 3469 Motion to Dismiss. Claims of Wallace Williams (Berg Plaintiff, Deceased, Personal Representative is Linda S Williams, formerly PR for Ella O. Williams) are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (PL, Case Administrator)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3468 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS'CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting 3467 Motion to Dismiss. Parties Donald Harper (Jaros Plaintiff), Winnie McLean (Jaros Plaintiff), Charles Powell (Jaros Plaintiff), Polly Faye Powell (Jaros Plaintiff), Bett y Prophet (Jaros Plaintiff, Deceased, Estate Work in Progress), Truman H Quinn (Jaros Plaintiff), Benjamin Sorenson (Jaros Plaintiff), Della Townsend (Jaros Plaintiff), Ethel Mary Burchell (Jaros Plaintiff) and Rheta Foland (Jaros Plaintiff) are Dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (PL, Case Administrator)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3455 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting 3439 Motion to Dismiss. The claims of pro se Plaintiffs Vivian Sue Rey Dickson, Richelle Hendrix, Elathine A. Marlow, Frederick Nelson, Katherine N. Plager, Elaine M aria Rey, Maybelle Sabedra, Ronald Utz, Sr., and Noreen L. Wynne are Dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (cc: Corrinalyn and Robert Guyette for Maybelle Sabedra, Richelle A. Hendrix, Elathine A. Marlow, Martha J. McNeely electronically at mjmcneely@netzero.net, Frederick W. Nelson, Katherine N. Plager, Elaine Maria Rey, Beverly M. Utz, and Noreen L. Wynne) (PL, Case Administrator)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3431 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting 3429 Motion to Dismiss. Parties Jacqueline Gallaway (Berg Plaintiff ), Helen Gloria Sackman (Berg Plaintiff), Sandra M Bishop (Berg Plaintiff) and Lois Carolyn Camp (Berg Pl aintiff) are Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (cc: Corrinalyn and Robert Guyette, Richelle A. Hendrix, Elathine A. Marlow, Martha J. McNeely electronically at mjmcneely@netzero.net, Frederick W. Nelson, Katherine N. Plager, Elaine Maria Rey, Beverly M. Utz, and Noreen L. Wynne) (LE, Case Administrator)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3424 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting 3415 Motion to Dismiss. Parties Donna L Bucher (Berg Plaintiff) and Victoria Maestretti (Berg Plaintiff) are Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (cc: Richelle A. Hendrix, Elathine A. Marlow, Martha J. McNeely electronically at mjmcneely@netzero.net, Frederick W. Nelson, Katherine N. Plager, Elaine Maria Rey, Beverly M. Utz, and Noreen L. Wynne) (LE, Case Administrator)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3408 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting 3396 Agreed Motion to Dismiss. Parties Elliott Lenhard Burley (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Helen Burley (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Carol Byers (Jaros Plaintiff, Est ate of ), Marianne Collins (Jaros Plaintiff), Jack Dillon (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Verland Fleshman (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Mary Ella Hill (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Nathan J Hoffer (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Kathryn Johnson (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Richard Kepplin (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Kent Kilby (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Donna L Kinman (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Thomas McGuire (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Melva McKinnis (Jaros Plaintiff , Estate of ), Maurice Miner (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Claude H Outland (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Dorothy Peterson (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Ronald Eugene E Peterson (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Catherine W Russell (Jaros Plaint iff, Estate of ), LaVelle Sherman (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Richard Alan Smith (Jaros Plaintiff ), Ruth Smith (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Gerald Sybertz (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Marilyn Uhalde (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Gertrud e Urlacher (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Howard West (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Guy F Willis (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Marylou Wilson (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), Harry E Winston (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ), James S Bronson, Sr (J aros Plaintiff, Estate of) and Lula Brooks (Jaros Plaintiff, Estate of ) are Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (cc: Corrinalyn and Robert Guyette, Richelle A. Hendrix, Martha J. McNeely electronically at mjmcneely@netzero.net, Frederick W. Nelson, Katherine N. Plager, Elaine Maria Rey, Beverly M. Utz, and Noreen L. Wynne) (LE, Case Administrator)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3388 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting 3382 Motion to Dismiss. Parties Harriet Elizabeth Pierce (Berg Plaintiff - PR is Max Pierce), Charlotte V Romjue (Berg Plaintiff) - PR is Therese J Sannar), Jenneth Ann G abel (Berg Plaintiff - individually, and PR for Kenneth John Parchen) and Delores M McCulloch (Berg Plaintiff) are Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (cc: Richelle A. Hendrix, Martha J. McNeely electronically at mjmcneely@netzero.net, Frederick W. Nelson, Katherine N. Plager, Elaine Maria Rey, Paul R. Troeh, Beverly M. Utz, and Noreen L. Wynne) (LE, Case Administrator)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3364 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting 3354 Motion to Dismiss. Parties Dominic J Curley (Berg Plaintiff), Gladys Dilly (Berg Plaintiff ), Marilyn Hiatt (Berg Plaintiff), Mary Lou Schut (Jaros Plaintiff), Pats y Ann Allen (Lumpkin Plaintiff) and Lea Retta Grace Arbogast (Berg Plaintiff ) are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (cc: Richelle A. Hendrix, Martha J. McNeely electronically at mjmcneely@netzero.net, Frederick W. Nelson, Katherine N. Plager, Elaine Maria Rey, Paul R. Troeh, and Noreen L. Wynne) (LE, Case Administrator)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3341 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE; granting plaintiffs' 3340 Motion to Dismiss. Parties Jody Bridger (Jaros Plaintiff), Bonnie L Cable (Jaros Plaintiff), John Cartmell (Jaros Plaintiff), Kathleen Carver, Eliza beth Jo Clark (Jaros Plaintiff), Rusalyne R Curley (Jaros Plaintiff), Rosalyn M DeGraaf (Jaros Plaintiff), Sharon Delp (Jaros Plaintiff), Lawrence Foote (Jaros Plaintiff), Anna C Frazier (Jaros Plaintiff), Viola Fritts (Jaros Plaintiff), Debra Gardner (Jaros Plaintiff), Marie Graham (Jaros Plaintiff), Shari Hall-Illig (Jaros Plaintiff), Genevive Henderson (Jaros Plaintiff), Kenneth Hesketh (Jaros Plaintiff), Dorothy Chambers Hollenbeck (Jaros Plaintiff), LaVonne Holmstrom (Jaros Pl aintiff), Mary Jo Hurley (Jaros Plaintiff), Joan Linebaugh (Jaros Plaintiff), Lianna M Lynn (Hamilton / Criswell Plaintiff), Mike H McCormick (Jaros Plaintiff), Kevan Ross (Jaros Plaintiff), Lucille Irene St Mary (Jaros Plaintiff), Dora M Starr (Jaros Plaintiff), Margaret Tait (Jaros Plaintiff), Karen Thaxton (Jaros Plaintiff), Steven Arterburn (Jaros Plaintiff) and Marie Binford (Jaros Plaintiff) dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Fremming Nielsen. (cc: Richelle A. Hendrix, Martha J. McNeely electronically at mjmcneely@netzero.net, Frederick W. Nelson, Katherine N. Plager, Elaine Maria Rey, Paul R. Troeh, and Noreen L. Wynne) (LE, Case Administrator)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Hanford Nuclear Reservation Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evenson, et al
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Shauna B Itri
Represented By: John Strother Moore, Jr
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Represented By: Louise Malbin Roselle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Alvarado
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Jilg
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Spechko
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H Boyer
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bud Eugene Coon
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Coon
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Brittain
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mishie P Brown
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene W Burkwist
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Bushey
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline McCoy
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Ann Calahan
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Chiddister
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah G Clark
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Cooney
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Vercoe Corlett
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Gordon Vercoe
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa A Curtis
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Eager
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verdeen Edington
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbe Gayle Fleming
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Anne Fletcher
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Fredricks
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon L Gaedeke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva C Garrett
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy L Getz
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Graber
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Franklin
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Hanenburg
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Haycraft
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas - Jackson
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Moore
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bea Herman
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ray Herman
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Hilzer
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Hilzer
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard - Hollenback
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Hollenback
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Howg
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Hutton
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Jackson
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Johannes
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Johannes
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Keith McCoy
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Keith
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn R Kempton
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kromer
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Anne Lathrom
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Lemasters
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lenberg
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A Lewis
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose M Lindgren
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Lombard
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W Lombard
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Maestretti
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Maestretti
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Maple
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Olsen
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nona Olsen
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil David Martin, Jr
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erliss McCormack
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldon McCormack
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted McCoy
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Eager
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna McDonell
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McElrath
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Means
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Meise
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Mooney
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R Mooney
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann I Murphy
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Neal-Thompson
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Nielsen
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan M Norem
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Parish
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanne Hames
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Peasley
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Retzloff
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Rusch
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A Rusch
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie - Schepcoff
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Schirmer
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann K Schneider
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie M Sheard
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Siria
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Slaughter
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickey L Smith
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A W Nelson
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Shauna B Itri
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen D Snyder
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte W Stallcop
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T Stough
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Stromberger
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loletta Carter
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Templeton
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Therriault Robertson
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Ramirez
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Vorderbrueggen
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Vorderbrueggen
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Walsh
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W Whitmire
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Williams
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace Williams
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert Wilson
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda L Wood
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marva Yandell
Represented By: Elizabeth L Crooke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth F Beauvais
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois C Camp
Represented By: Scott A Johnson
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hadassah Cohen
Represented By: Scott A Johnson
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic J Curley
Represented By: Scott A Johnson
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett Lee Evans
Represented By: Scott A Johnson
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige A Gardner
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valinda D Grant
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Marie Hoefel
Represented By: Scott A Johnson
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul F Hoefel
Represented By: Scott A Johnson
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia P Hoover
Represented By: Scott A Johnson
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Ann Houck
Represented By: Scott A Johnson
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Coles Jackson
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Pierce
Represented By: Scott A Johnson
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet Elizabeth Pierce
Represented By: Scott A Johnson
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean M Weaver
Represented By: Scott A Johnson
Represented By: Todd M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noreen L Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verla J Zielke
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joni Aiyeku
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Alexander
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Wallace Amsbury
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Niel Arbogast
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Retta Grace Arbogast
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia N Barton
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Anne Bauer
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra M Bishop
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Ann Bogen
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtle Neoma Bowman
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawson G Brian, III
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy K Byrum
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian L Chenault
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Eckmann
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenneth Ann Gabel
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Gallaway
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Ben Gallaway
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lessie Lee Hess
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Hiatt
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laverne Kautz
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary - Schultz
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Lee Magnuson
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores M McCulloch
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marylin F Mlnarik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve D Bowman
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris Miller
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Dilly
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Riggs
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda J Roberts
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Rossi
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria H Sackmann
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte V Romjue
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna K Schockey
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcy Jae Sky
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven H Stanton
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay E Sutherland
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth B Swearingen
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D Thies
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul R Troeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla G Viken
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Michael Wood
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane L Wright
Represented By: Paul J Dayton
Represented By: Brian D Depew
Represented By: James Albert Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Ann Abken
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane L Adams
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adabelle H Altmeyer
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Rae Alvarado
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquerite K Amstadt
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Represented By: Richard William Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly R Andersen
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Represented By: Richard William Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Ruth Arrington
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene M Atterberry
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet L Balfe
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia N Banta
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dixie M Bass
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen A Bell
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E Lee Bero
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Berry
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles U Blakley
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Blakley
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Blumenschein
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley J Borgen
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn J Bowers
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy L Bright
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Brinkman
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Represented By: Daniel C Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc B Brown
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole J Brummett
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria J Bryant
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Bryant
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Buchanan
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Buckmaster
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D Bullard
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Burke-Holya
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H Butherus
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna D Butler
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie M Bynum
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth N Cahalan
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy J Califf
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth I Callaway
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene L Campbell
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen B Cannon
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta J Case
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett Edwin Christen
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice A Christoph
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary A Clauson
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Ann Closson
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen G Collins
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J Compton
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry C Cone
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine R Connerly
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E Marjorie Cosgrove
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Covington
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances E Cox
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Garvie Criss
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T Davis
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Denslow
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren G Devers
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda A Dewall
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian C Diehm
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda C Donoghue
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki A Duggins
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J Dupree
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanie England
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Beverly Fitch
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Foraker
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna L Frantum
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin J Frazier
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen D Freeman
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M Fry
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan K Funk
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg H Fusman
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Z George
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary S Gilbert
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip E Gill
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Gottschalk
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Gwen Grant
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances L Gregory
Represented By: Richard C Eymann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol L Gunnels
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila M Gustafson
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred A Haines
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sue Hainline
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy R Hansel
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald A Hanson
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel L Harmon
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Richard William Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Kay Harrington
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph J Hein
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael M Helland
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary - Hengen
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Herron
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Richard William Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merry E Herron
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzann Holman
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucile Hopkins
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia M Horne-Brine
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra J Ireland
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Isom
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Jans
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary V Johnson
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathey Johnston
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie D Jones
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loraine Savage Jones
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary V Jordan
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra L Karshen
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy J Keeler
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale W Kendall
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy C Kenner
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen King
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark O Koller
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve Koprock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Koprock
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorita C Kramer
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julita E Kramer
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon M Krause
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana E Lafferty
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Laroche
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy R Leonard
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest J Lewandowski
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Liester
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris C Lightfoot
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Richard William Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A Lindaas
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Jo Little
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lomen
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aloa I Longworth
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell L Love
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian K Lynch
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston B Mader
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn B Maillet
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amaryellis Mandelin
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla K Martin
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth E Maxwell
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Lyn McAllister
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion L McCauley
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha J McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan A McVey
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine A Mebius
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia K Schafer Metcalf
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June B Miner
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June L Monson
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Mowery
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Represented By: Richard William Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Mueller-Sargent
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Mullen
Represented By: Molly Jo Mullen
Represented By: Vicki M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Dale Myers
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Jo Nelson
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick W Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole L Norris
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H O'Brien
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janey Olvera
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda E Orgill
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L Johann Ostman
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth M Owen
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary B Parish
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela R Pearson
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dixie E Peer
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E Pefley
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Perrigo
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline J Peterson
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy J Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki L Pierce
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Polley
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L Powell
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan S Prchal
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha T Pritikin
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Rae
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathie R Ransom
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R Reeves
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Reiss
Represented By: Tom H Foulds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Rey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |