Bradburn et al v. North Central Regional Library District Featured Case

First Amendment claim against library for overblocking websites with its filters, and not disabling the filters on request

Plaintiff: Sarah Bradburn, Pearl Cherrington, Charles Heinlen and Second Amendment Foundation
Defendant: North Central Regional Library District
Case Number: 2:2006cv00327
Filed: November 16, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Ferry
Presiding Judge: Edward F. Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2012 Filing 121 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant (CV, Case Administrator)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING NCRL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND CLOSING FILE; denying 39 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 28 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Case closed. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
October 25, 2011 Filing 119 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward F. Shea: Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2011 re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pearl Cherrington, Second Amendment Foundation, Sarah Bradburn, Charles Heinlen, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Reported/Recorded by: Stephanie Smithson) (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
October 4, 2011 Filing 118 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry;no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment : DUE TO SCHEDULING CONFLICTS WITH THE COURT'S TRIAL CALENDAR Motion Hearing currently set for 10/19/2011 is RESET for 10/25/2011 03:00 PM in Richland before Judge Edward F. Shea. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
August 25, 2011 Filing 117 Order SETTING a hearing on the pending cross-summary-judgment motions 28 39 as they relate to the Washington Supreme Court's ruling on the certified question for Wednesday, October 19, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. in RICHLAND Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO PDF TO FOLLOW. THIS CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER.(DB, Courtroom Deputy)
August 24, 2011 Filing 116 RESPONSE re 115 Order,, Joint Submission Re Hearing Date by Sarah Bradburn, Pearl Cherrington, Charles Heinlen, North Central Regional Library District, Second Amendment Foundation. (Adams, Thomas)
August 19, 2011 Filing 115 Order REQUIRING the parties to meet and confer to propose suggested hearing dates for September or October 2011 to allow the Court to hear oral argument relating to the pending cross-summary-judgment motions as they relate to the Washington Supreme Court's ruling on the certified question. No later than August 26, 2011, the parties shall file a joint submission identifying their suggested September or October 2011 hearing dates: it is anticipated the hearing will be in Richland and will last one hour. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW; THIS ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
August 12, 2010 Filing 114 NOTICE of Change of Address by Duncan E Manville (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Manville, Duncan)
July 2, 2010 Filing 113 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re 112 Memorandum. (Manville, Duncan)
July 2, 2010 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM re 109 Order, Certified Question by All Plaintiffs. (Manville, Duncan)
July 2, 2010 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM re 109 Order, re Response to Certified Question by North Central Regional Library District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Adams, Thomas)
June 9, 2010 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF FINALITY by the Supreme Court of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(CV, Case Administrator)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting the parties leave to file a supplementary brief (limited to ten pages) addressing the impact of the Washington Supreme Court's certified question decision on the parties' summary judgment motions 28 39 no later than July 2, 2010. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW; THIS ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
June 1, 2010 Filing 108 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Edward F. Shea: Status Conference held on 6/1/2010. (Reported/Recorded by: Debra Clark) (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
May 24, 2010 Filing 107 RESPONSE Joint Submission re: Post-Certification Proceedings by All Parties. (Adams, Thomas)
May 17, 2010 Filing 106 Order SETTING a telephonic status conference on Tuesday, June 1, 2010, at 1:00 p.m. Counsel shall call the Court's public conference line (509-376-8880); use of cell phones is prohibited. No later than May 24, 2010, the parties shall file a joint submission setting forth the parties' suggestions as to how to proceed in this matter following the Washington Supreme Court's decision on the certified question. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW; THIS ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
May 10, 2010 Filing 105 Notice/Opinion from the WA State Supreme Court on the issue certified (Attachments: # 1 Opinion) (CV, Case Administrator)
October 5, 2009 Filing 104 PROOF OF SERVICE by all plaintiffs re 103 Notice (Other). (Manville, Duncan)
October 5, 2009 Filing 103 NOTICE by all plaintiffs of Name Change (Manville, Duncan)
February 17, 2009 Filing 102 Letter from Ronald R. Carpenter, Supreme Court Clerk to Clerk and Counsel dated February 12, 2009 re: granting motion for extension of briefing schedule. (LE, Case Administrator)
November 10, 2008 Filing 101 NOTICE of Change of Address by Duncan E Manville (Manville, Duncan)
November 5, 2008 Filing 100 Letter from Susan Carlson, Deputy Clerk for the Washington State Supreme Court, to Clerk and Counsel dated 11/3/08 re: receipt of Court record and briefing schedule for counsel (CV, Case Administrator)
November 3, 2008 Filing 99 Letter from Susan Carlson, Deputy Clerk for the Washington State Supreme Court, to Judge Shea, Clerk and Counsel dated 10/29/08 requesting record re: certification of question (record was mailed on 10/31/08) (CV, Case Administrator)
October 31, 2008 Remark - The relevant Court documents re: certification were sent to the Washington State Supreme Court on October 31, 2008 (CV, Case Administrator)
October 7, 2008 Remark - Docket sheet mailed to WA State Supreme Court on 10/7/08 pursuant to request in letter dated 10/2/08, Ct Rec 98 . (CV, Case Administrator)
October 6, 2008 Filing 98 Letter from WA State Supreme Court to Clerk and Counsel dated October 2, 2008. Supreme Court Case No. assigned is 82200-0. (CV, Case Administrator)
September 30, 2008 Remark - Mail certified copy of Orders, Ct Recs 96 and 97 , to Washington State Supreme Court @ 415 12th Ave SW, PO Box 40929, Olympia, WA 98504-0929, on 9/30/08. (CV, Case Administrator)
September 30, 2008 Filing 97 CERTIFICATION FROM UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON; Case stayed. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION AND HOLDING IN ABEYANCE THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Certification of Questions of State Constitutional Law; granting in part, denying in part and holding in abeyance in part 28 Defendant NCRL's Motion for Summary Judgment; holding in abeyance 28 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. The remaining pretrial deadlines, pretrial conference and trial are STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
June 16, 2008 Filing 95 NOTICE of Change of Address by Aaron H Caplan (Caplan, Aaron)
June 16, 2008 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Anne Dunne on behalf of all plaintiffs (Dunne, Sarah)
May 23, 2008 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Support of Proposed Certified Question by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
May 23, 2008 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Question for Certification by all plaintiffs. (Crump, Catherine)
April 23, 2008 Filing 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward F. Shea: Motion Hearing held on 4/23/2008 re 37 MOTION Certification of Questions of State Constitutional Law re 29 Statement of Facts, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Reported/Recorded by: Stephanie Smithson) (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
April 18, 2008 Filing 90 REPLY MEMORANDUM re 77 MOTION in Limine filed by all plaintiffs. (Caplan, Aaron)
April 18, 2008 Filing 89 RESPONSE re 87 Objections by all plaintiffs. (Crump, Catherine)
April 14, 2008 Filing 88 RESPONSE to Motion re 77 MOTION in Limine filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Monroe, Celeste)
April 14, 2008 Filing 87 OBJECTIONS to Designated Deposition Testimony by North Central Regional Library District. (Monroe, Celeste)
April 11, 2008 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion re 77 MOTION in Limine filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Monroe, Celeste)
April 8, 2008 Filing 85 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry;no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re 37 MOTION Certification of Questions of State Constitutional Law re 29 Statement of Facts, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment :DUE TO SCHEDULING CONFLICTS WITH THE COURT'S TRIAL CALENDAR the Motion Hearing currently set for 4/15/2008 is RESET for 4/23/2008 10:00 AM in Richland before Judge Edward F. Shea. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
April 7, 2008 Filing 84 NCRL's Response to Plaintiffs' 80 Objections to Defendant's Witness and Exhibit List by North Central Regional Library District. (Monroe, Celeste) Modified on 4/10/2008 to link to objections (CV, Case Administrator).
April 7, 2008 Filing 83 RESPONSE re 81 Objections, 75 Objections to Plaintiffs' Witness and Exhibit List by all plaintiffs. (Manville, Duncan)
April 7, 2008 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 76 MOTION in Limine filed by all plaintiffs. (Crump, Catherine)
April 3, 2008 Filing 81 AMENDED OBJECTIONS to 70 Witness and Exhibit Lists by North Central Regional Library District. (Monroe, Celeste) Modified on 4/8/2008 to link to document (CV, Case Administrator).
March 31, 2008 Filing 80 OBJECTIONS re 73 Witness and Exhibit List, 72 Witness and Exhibit List by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachments A-C to Plaintiffs' Objections)(Manville, Duncan)
March 31, 2008 Filing 79 DECLARATION by Duncan Manville in Support re 77 MOTION in Limine filed by all plaintiffs. (Caplan, Aaron)
March 31, 2008 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM in Support re 77 MOTION in Limine filed by all plaintiffs. (Caplan, Aaron)
March 31, 2008 Filing 77 MOTION in Limine by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplan, Aaron)
March 31, 2008 Filing 76 MOTION in Limine by North Central Regional Library District. (Monroe, Celeste)
March 31, 2008 Filing 75 OBJECTIONS re 70 Witness and Exhibit List by North Central Regional Library District. (Monroe, Celeste)
March 28, 2008 Filing 74 DECLARATION by Dan Howard in Support re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplemental filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pages 8-50)(Monroe, Celeste)
March 28, 2008 Filing 73 Witness and Exhibit List Amended by North Central Regional Library District. (Monroe, Celeste)
March 24, 2008 Filing 72 Witness and Exhibit List by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
March 24, 2008 Filing 71 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts - Joint by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
March 24, 2008 Filing 70 Witness and Exhibit List by all plaintiffs. (Crump, Catherine)
March 11, 2008 Filing 69 Order GRANTING the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Statement of Uncontroverted Facts 67 . To allow the parties to continue their effort to prepare a joint statement of facts, the Court extends the deadline to March 24, 2008. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW; THIS ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
March 10, 2008 Filing 68 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 67 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Statement of Uncontroverted Facts : Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2008 06:30 PM before Judge Edward F. Shea. (Adams, Thomas)
March 10, 2008 Filing 67 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Statement of Uncontroverted Facts by North Central Regional Library District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Thomas)
March 3, 2008 Filing 66 DECLARATION by Celeste Mountain Monroe in Support re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pages 4-39)(Adams, Thomas)
March 3, 2008 Filing 65 DECLARATION by Barbara Walters in Support re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
March 3, 2008 Filing 64 DECLARATION by Dean Marney in Support re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pages 5-34)(Adams, Thomas)
March 3, 2008 Filing 63 DECLARATION by Dan Howard in Support re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
March 3, 2008 Filing 62 STATEMENT OF FACTS re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
March 3, 2008 Filing 61 REPLY MEMORANDUM re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
February 29, 2008 Filing 60 REPLY MEMORANDUM re 37 MOTION Certification of Questions of State Constitutional Law re 29 Statement of Facts, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
February 25, 2008 Filing 59 STATEMENT OF Supplemental FACTS re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by all plaintiffs. (Caplan, Aaron)
February 25, 2008 Filing 58 REPLY MEMORANDUM re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by all plaintiffs. (Caplan, Aaron)
February 25, 2008 Filing 57 STATEMENT OF FACTS re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit LL - CCC, # 2 Exhibit DDD-EEE (Pt 1), # 3 Exhibit EEE (Part 2) - JJJ)(Caplan, Aaron)
February 25, 2008 Filing 56 DECLARATION by Bennett Haselton in Opposition re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment of NCRL filed by all plaintiffs. (Caplan, Aaron)
February 25, 2008 Filing 55 DECLARATION by Charles Heinlen in Opposition re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment of NCRL filed by all plaintiffs. (Caplan, Aaron)
February 25, 2008 Filing 54 DECLARATION by Duncan Manville in Opposition re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment of NCRL filed by all plaintiffs. (Caplan, Aaron)
February 25, 2008 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment of NCRL filed by all plaintiffs. (Caplan, Aaron)
February 25, 2008 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 37 MOTION Certification of Questions of State Constitutional Law re 29 Statement of Facts, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by all plaintiffs. (Caplan, Aaron)
February 21, 2008 Filing 51 Errata filed by North Central Regional Library District: Re 48 Response to Motion. (Monroe, Celeste)
February 15, 2008 Filing 50 DECLARATION by Dean Marney in Opposition re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
February 15, 2008 Filing 49 STATEMENT OF FACTS re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
February 15, 2008 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas) SEE ERRATA FILED UNDER CT REC 51 WHICH CORRECTS TYPOGRAPHICAL ERRORS CONTAINED IN THIS RESPONSE Modified on 2/25/2008 (CV, Case Administrator).
February 13, 2008 Filing 47 Errata filed by North Central Regional Library District: Re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Adams, Thomas)
February 13, 2008 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Celeste Mountain Monroe on behalf of North Central Regional Library District (Monroe, Celeste)
February 5, 2008 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE by all plaintiffs of Summary Judgment Motion 39 and Related Documents (Caplan, Aaron)
February 5, 2008 Filing 44 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion Oral Argument Requested re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2008 01:30 PM in Richland before Judge Edward F. Shea. (Caplan, Aaron)
February 5, 2008 Filing 43 Praecipe filed by all plaintiffs: Re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment Proposed Order. (Caplan, Aaron)
February 5, 2008 Filing 42 Docket Annotation - Re Filing Error: 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment - NOTICE OF HEARING MUST BE FILED FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY THE COURT PURSUANT TO LR 7.1(h); 40 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion, 41 Statement of Facts - THESE DOCUMENTS WERE ELECTRONICALLY SIGNED BY ATTORNEY DUNCAN MANVILLE, BUT WERE FILED UNDER ATTORNEY AARON CAPLAN'S CM/ECF LOGIN AND PASSWORD. COUNSEL IS ADVISED THAT ALL FUTURE DOCUMENTS MUST BE SIGNED BY THE SAME ATTORNEY WHOSE CM/ECF LOGIN AND PASSWORD ARE BEING USED. (CV, Case Administrator)
February 4, 2008 Filing 41 STATEMENT OF Material FACTS re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F, # 2 Exhibit G-I, # 3 Exhibit J-T, # 4 Exhibit U Part 1, # 5 Exhibit U Part 2, # 6 Exhibit U Part 3, # 7 Exhibit V-Z, # 8 Exhibit AA-KK)(Caplan, Aaron)
February 4, 2008 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Duncan Manville)(Caplan, Aaron)
February 4, 2008 Filing 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment by all plaintiffs. (Caplan, Aaron)
February 4, 2008 Filing 38 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion Oral Argument Requested re 37 MOTION Certification of Questions of State Constitutional Law re 29 Statement of Facts, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2008 01:30 PM in Richland before Judge Edward F. Shea. (Adams, Thomas)
February 4, 2008 Filing 37 MOTION Certification of Questions of State Constitutional Law re 29 Statement of Facts, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment by North Central Regional Library District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Adams, Thomas)
February 4, 2008 Filing 36 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion Oral Argument Requested re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2008 01:30 PM in Richland before Judge Edward F. Shea. (Adams, Thomas)
February 4, 2008 Filing 35 DECLARATION by Liam Chasteen in Support re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
February 4, 2008 Filing 34 DECLARATION by Dan Howard in Support re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
February 4, 2008 Filing 33 DECLARATION by Barbara Walters in Support re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, Pages 7-22)(Adams, Thomas)
February 4, 2008 Filing 32 DECLARATION by Paul Resnick in Support re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Pages 13-28, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits B & C, Pages 29-43, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits D & E, Pages 44-67)(Adams, Thomas)
February 4, 2008 Filing 31 DECLARATION by Dean Marney in Support re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B, Pages 13-35, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits C & D, Pages 36-39)(Adams, Thomas)
February 4, 2008 Filing 30 DECLARATION by Thomas D. Adams in Support re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Pages 5-14, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Pages 15-24, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits C & D, Pages 25-34, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits E-G, Pages 35-57)(Adams, Thomas)
February 4, 2008 Filing 29 STATEMENT OF FACTS re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
February 4, 2008 Filing 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment by North Central Regional Library District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Thomas) SEE PRAECIPE FILED, CT REC 47 , FOR CORRECTION OF TYPOGRAPHICAL ERRORS Modified on 2/14/2008 (CV, Case Administrator).
December 21, 2007 Filing 27 NOTICE by all plaintiffs of Compliance with Rule 26(a)(2) Requirements (Manville, Duncan)
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2008 10:00 AM in Richland before Judge Edward F. Shea. Bench Trial set for 6/2/2008 09:00 AM in Richland before Judge Edward F. Shea. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
October 18, 2007 Filing 25 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Edward F. Shea : Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2007. (Reported/Recorded by: Stephanie Smithson) (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
October 12, 2007 Filing 24 NOTICE by North Central Regional Library District of Service of Defendant's Disclosure of Expert Witness (Adams, Thomas)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE re Ct. Rec. 21 Motion for Limited Admission. Added Attorney Catherine Crump on behalf of all Plaintiff's. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (VJ, Case Administrator)
October 2, 2007 Filing 22 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE - Text entry; no PDF document.:DUE TO SCHEDULING CONFLICTS WITH THE COURT'S CALENDAR the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/03/2007 is RESET for 10/18/2007 09:30 AM in Telephonic Argument before Judge Edward F. Shea. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CALL THE COURT'S PUBLIC CONFERENCE LINE (509) 376-8880 AT THE TIME SPECIFIED FOR HEARING. USE OF CELLULAR PHONES IS PROHIBITED.(DB, Courtroom Deputy)
September 26, 2007 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Catherine Crump. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 387178. by all plaintiffs. (Caplan, Aaron)
September 26, 2007 Filing 20 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Plaintiffs Second Amendment Foundation, Sarah Bradburn, Pearl Cherrington, Charles Heinlen. Attorney Duncan Manville is withdrawing. Duncan E Manville is substituted as counsel for Plaintiffs. (Manville, Duncan)
September 21, 2007 Filing 19 STATEMENT Regarding Trial Availability by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
September 18, 2007 Filing 18 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE - Text entry; no PDF document.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2007 08:45 AM in Telephonic Argument before Judge Edward F. Shea. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CALL THE COURT'S PUBLIC CONFERENCE LINE (509) 376-8880 AT THE TIME SPECIFIED FOR HEARING. USE OF CELLULAR PHONES IS PROHIBITED.(DB, Courtroom Deputy)
September 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTIONS TO MODIFY CASE SCHEDULING ORDER ON EXPEDITED BASIS; granting 14 Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing Re: Motion to Modify Case Scheduling Order; granting 15 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Scheduling Order; Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2007 08:45 AM, at which time a new pretrial conference date, trial date and pretrial deadlines not addressed in this order will be set. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
September 13, 2007 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 14 Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing Re: Motion to Modify Case Scheduling Order, 15 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Scheduling Order : Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2007 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument for 14 and for 15 , before Judge Edward F. Shea (Adams, Thomas)
September 13, 2007 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Scheduling Order by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
September 13, 2007 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing Re: Motion to Modify Case Scheduling Order by North Central Regional Library District. (Adams, Thomas)
September 13, 2007 Filing 13 LR 26.1 / LR 16.1 Attorney Report 1st Supplemental Initial Disclosures by all plaintiffs. (Manville, Duncan)
August 3, 2007 Filing 12 LR 26.1 / LR 16.1 Attorney Report Disclosure of Expert Witnesses by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1 of 2# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2 of 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 1 of 4# 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 2 of 4# 5 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 3 of 4# 6 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 4 of 4)(Manville, Duncan)
June 28, 2007 Filing 11 STIPULATION Re Modification of Case Schedule by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Manville, Duncan)
June 28, 2007 Filing 10 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant North Central Regional Library District. Attorney Thomas D. Adams is withdrawing. Thomas Dean Adams is substituted as counsel for Defendant. (Adams, Thomas)
February 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2008 10:00 AM in Richland before Judge Edward F. Shea. Bench Trial set for 1/22/2008 09:00 AM in Richland before Judge Edward F. Shea. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (VR, Case Administrator)
February 21, 2007 Filing 8 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Edward F. Shea : Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2007. (Reported/Recorded by: Stephanie Smithson) (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
January 30, 2007 Filing 7 LR 26.1 / LR 16.1 Attorney Report by all parties. (Manville, Duncan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2007 09:15 AM in Telephonic Argument before Judge Edward F. Shea. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Magistrate Form)(DB, Courtroom Deputy)
January 2, 2007 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by North Central Regional Library District.(Adams, Thomas)
December 5, 2006 Filing 4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by North Central Regional Library District Withdrawal of Erik K. Wahlquist as attorney for defendant North Central Regional Library District (Wahlquist, Erik)
November 29, 2006 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik K Wahlquist on behalf of North Central Regional Library District (Wahlquist, Erik)
November 29, 2006 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Dean Adams on behalf of North Central Regional Library District (Adams, Thomas)
November 16, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North Central Regional Library District ( Filing fee $ 350; Receipt # SPO003169). Summons issued. Filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Sarah Bradburn, Pearl Cherrington, Charles Heinlen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradburn et al v. North Central Regional Library District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Bradburn
Represented By: Duncan E Manville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl Cherrington
Represented By: Duncan E Manville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Heinlen
Represented By: Duncan E Manville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation
Represented By: Duncan E Manville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Central Regional Library District
Represented By: Celeste Mountain Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?