Riches v. The Guinness Book of Records, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lee Riches
Defendant: The Guinness Book of Records, et al
Case Number: 2:2009cv00154
Filed: May 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Outside Washington
Presiding Judge: Justin L. Quackenbush
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 COPY OF 9CCA ORDER as to 4 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonathan Lee Riches 9CCA: 08-80044. (CS, Case Administrator)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - denying 11 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge Justin L. Quackenbush. (CS, Case Administrator)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Reconsideration on The Court's June 21, 2009 Order Denying My Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis re 10 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Jonathan Lee Riches. (VR, Case Administrator)
June 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS - denying 5 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Justin L. Quackenbush. (CS, Case Administrator)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jonathan Lee Riches @ FCI Williamsburg; upon checking the BOP website, the 2 Order Dismissing Action was resent to Mr. Riches at FMC Lexington, POB 14500, Lexington, KY 40512. (LE, Case Administrator)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter from Appeal Deputy Clerk to Jonathan Riches dated June 11, 2009. ORIGINAL LETTER AND ENCLOSURES WILL BE MAILED TO ADDRESSEE ONLY. (CS, Case Administrator)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD regarding 4 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonathan Lee Riches. (CS, Case Administrator)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 9CCA Payment Notification form regarding 4 Notice of Appeal. Fee Not paid. Copy of docket entries forwarded to 9CCA. (CS, Case Administrator)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Jonathan Lee Riches. (Attachments: # 1 Financial Affidavit)(CS, Case Administrator)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL from District Court decision as to 3 Clerk's Judgment by Jonathan Lee Riches. (CS, Case Administrator)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 JUDGMENT in favor of The Guinness Book of Records, et al, against Jonathan Lee Riches. (CS, Case Administrator)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION signed by Senior Judge Justin L. Quackenbush. (CS, Case Administrator)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 RECEIVED CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT - Receipt # none (IFP) Filed by Jonathan Lee Riches.(VJ, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riches v. The Guinness Book of Records, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lee Riches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guinness Book of Records, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?