In Re: LLS America LLC (Kriegman v. Lazy M LLC) WAEB BK Adv Proceeding No 11-80125-PCW11

Plaintiff: Bruce P Kriegman
Defendant: Lazy M LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00668
Filed: December 18, 2012
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Office: Spokane Office
County: Spokane
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2015 133 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, Defendant Victoria Cilwa DISMISSED without prejudice, and Othelia Spare is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (SK, Case Administrator)
June 18, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS TOBY CORIELL AND MARIA CORIELL granting 48 Motion to Dismiss. Party(ies) Maria Coriell and Toby Coriell terminated Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
August 11, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE - denying 46 Motion to Dismiss; and denying as moot 58 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (CC, Case Administrator)
October 29, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS DAVID WARES AND LISA WARES - granting 94 Motion to Dismiss. Party(ies) David Wares and Lisa Wares terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: LLS America LLC (Kriegman v. Lazy M LLC) WAEB BK Adv Proceeding No 11-80125-PCW11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce P Kriegman
Represented By: Daniel J Gibbons
Represented By: Shelley N Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazy M LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.