United States of America v. King Mountain Tobacco Company Inc
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: King Mountain Tobacco Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv03089
Filed: July 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Yakima
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT. Granting 102 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (SK, Case Administrator)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against King Mountain Tobacco Company Inc. Case is CLOSED. (LR, Case Administrator)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT KING MOUNTAIN'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, denying 88 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (LR, Case Administrator)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The United States Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (Issue No. 1) ECF No. 70 is GRANTED consistent with the terms of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 48 United States' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. King Mountain Tobacco Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: W Carl Hankla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Mountain Tobacco Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?