Elf-Man LLC v. Lamberson
Plaintiff: Elf-Man LLC
Defendant: Ryan Lamberson
Counter_claimant: Ryan Lamberson
Counter_defendant: Elf-Man LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00395
Filed: November 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Spokane
Presiding Judge: Thomas O. Rice
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. All of Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Elf-Man's claims and causes of action in this matter are DISMISSED with prejudice and all of Defendant's counterclaims are DISMISSED without prejudice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ON PENDING PROCEDURAL MOTIONS. Plaintiffs Motions in Response to Defendants First Amended Answer ECF No. 20 are DENIED as to Plaintiffs Special Motion to Strike and DENIED as moot as to all other requests for relief. Defendants Motion to D ismiss or for Leave to File Second Amended Answer ECF No. 21 is DENIED as to Defendants motion to dismiss and GRANTED as to Defendants motion for leave to file a Second Amended Answer. Defendant shall file his Second Amended Answer on or before 3/24/2014. Plaintiffs Motion to Add Additional Defendant ECF No. 28 is DENIED with leave to renew. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Judicial Assistant)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elf-Man LLC v. Lamberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Lamberson
Represented By: Rhett V Barney
Represented By: John Christopher Lynch
Represented By: Jeffrey Ray Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elf-Man LLC
Represented By: Maureen Callahan VanderMay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Ryan Lamberson
Represented By: Rhett V Barney
Represented By: John Christopher Lynch
Represented By: Jeffrey Ray Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Elf-Man LLC
Represented By: Maureen Callahan VanderMay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?