Busey v. Richland School District et al

Plaintiff: James Busey
Defendant: Richland School District, Richard Jansons, Heather Cleary, Mary Guay, Rick Donahoe and Phyllis Strickler
Case Number: 2:2013cv05022
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Office: Spokane Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Edward F. Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2016 133 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL JUDGMENT. (AY, Case Administrator)
March 23, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 92 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND AMENDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Judicial Assistant)
December 22, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF No. 76 is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. Defendants motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs claims for declaratory judgment under RCW 28A.405.300 and withholding of wages under RCW 49.48.010 and 49.52.070. Defendants motion as to all other claims is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
April 10, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 53 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Judicial Assistant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Busey v. Richland School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Busey
Represented By: Brian James Iller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland School District
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Lee Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Jansons
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Cleary
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Guay
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Donahoe
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Strickler
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?