United States of America v. Kegley et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Richard D Kegley, Ramon Zamora, Zap Boxing Club Youth Center, Erin Capital Management, Walla Walla County, Richard LNU and Jamie LNU
Case Number: 2:2013cv05053
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Office: Spokane Office
County: Walla Walla
Presiding Judge: Edward F. Shea
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 89 Mr. Kegley's Motion to Modify the Court's Summary-Judgment Order. Signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
December 29, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN THE UNITED STATES' FAVOR AS TO RICHARD KEGLEY; granting 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea. (cc: Richard Kegley) (CV, Case Administrator)
January 15, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Jamie LNU of YHVH and Richard LNU of YHVH. (CV, Case Administrator)
July 11, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America; against Erin Capital Management. (CC, Case Administrator)
June 6, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION BETWEEN THE UNITED STATES AND WALLA WALLA COUNTY CONCERNING INTEREST IN REAL PROPERTY and ORDER; granting 29 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
December 16, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 24 Defendant Kegley's Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
November 26, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT KEGLEY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FRCP 12(B)(1), (2), (3), AND (6); denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kegley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Clive Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D Kegley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zap Boxing Club Youth Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Capital Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walla Walla County
Represented By: James Lyle Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?