Energy Northwest v. SPX Heat Transfer Inc

Plaintiff: Energy Northwest
Defendant: SPX Heat Transfer Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv05151
Filed: December 24, 2013
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Office: Spokane Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2015 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; CLOSING FILE. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
September 1, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying, as moot 106 Motion for Leave to File; granting 107 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AY, Case Administrator)
July 30, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - denying 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (CC, Case Administrator)
September 3, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (CC, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Energy Northwest v. SPX Heat Transfer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Northwest
Represented By: Robert Allan Dutton(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Andrew L Greene(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Brendan Peters(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Richard O Prentke(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Graehm C Wallace(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Heat Transfer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?