Bonivert v. Clarkston, City of et al
Plaintiff: Ryan J Bonivert
Defendant: Clarkston, City of, County of Asotin, Washington, Daniel Combs, Jane Doe Combs, Paul Purcell, Jane Doe Purcell, Gary Snyder, Jane Doe Snyder, Joseph Snyder, Joel Hastings, Ken Bancroft, John H Singleton and Jane and John Does I-X
Case Number: 2:2014cv00056
Filed: February 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Asotin
Presiding Judge: Thomas O. Rice
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Asotin County Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 61 is GRANTED. Clarkston Defendants Motion & Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 71 is GRANTED. Defendants Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of Expert Witness Winthrop Taylors Report and Testimony ECF Nos. 77 , 79 is DENIED as moot. The file is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL. Defendants Hastings, Singleton, Bancroft, and Jane Doe Snyder are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to file and serve his Amended Complaint forthwith. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Judicial Assistant)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Judicial Assistant)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonivert v. Clarkston, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan J Bonivert
Represented By: Samuel T Creason
Represented By: Theodore O Creason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarkston, City of
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Asotin, Washington
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Combs
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Combs
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Purcell
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Purcell
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Snyder
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Snyder
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Snyder
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Hastings
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Kerley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Bancroft
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Singleton
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?