Corporation of Gonzaga University v. Pendleton Enterprises LLC et al
Plaintiff: Corporation of Gonzaga University
Defendant: Pendleton Enterprises LLC, Jamie Pendleton and Pendleton Broadcasting Inc
Case Number: 2:2014cv00093
Filed: April 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Spokane
Presiding Judge: Lonny R Suko
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2015 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT by JPendleton Confirming Compliance with Injunction by All Defendants. (Pierce, John)
January 8, 2015 Filing 49 JUDGMENT in favor of Corporation of Gonzaga University against Pendleton Broadcasting Inc, Pendleton Enterprises LLC, Jamie Pendleton (CV, Case Administrator)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #34 GONZAGA'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Case closed. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (CV, Case Administrator)
January 6, 2015 Filing 47 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Jury Demand. Filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hendricksen, Mark) Modified on 1/6/2015 to add jury demand in docket text (CV, Case Administrator).
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting #37 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (CV, Case Administrator)
December 10, 2014 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko: Motion Hearing held on 12/10/2014. (Reported/Recorded by: Debra Kinney Clark) (GT, Courtroom Deputy)
November 26, 2014 Filing 44 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #34 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Supporting Memorandum filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Hendricksen, Mark)
November 24, 2014 Filing 43 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #37 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Hendricksen, Mark)
November 21, 2014 Filing 42 DECLARATION by John Pierce in Opposition re #34 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Supporting Memorandum (Second) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6)(Pierce, John)
November 19, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE RESETTING Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re #34 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Supporting Memorandum : Motion Hearing RESET for 12/10/2014 at 2:30 PM Yakima Courtroom 203 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. CHANGE IN DATE ONLY.(GT, Judicial Assistant)
November 17, 2014 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #37 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Pierce, John)
November 12, 2014 Filing 39 DECLARATION by John Pierce in Opposition re #34 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Supporting Memorandum filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Pierce, John)
November 12, 2014 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #34 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Supporting Memorandum filed by All Defendants. (Pierce, John)
November 6, 2014 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Corporation of Gonzaga University. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2014 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Hendricksen, Mark)
October 22, 2014 Filing 36 DECLARATION in Support re #34 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Kristopher R. Kassel filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Hendricksen, Mark)
October 22, 2014 Filing 35 DECLARATION in Support re #34 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Mark Hendricksen filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hendricksen, Mark)
October 22, 2014 Filing 34 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Supporting Memorandum by Corporation of Gonzaga University. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2014 at 02:30 PM in Spokane Post Office - Courtroom 3 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricksen, Mark)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ON GONZAGA'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; granting #21 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (PL, Case Administrator)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting in Part #17 Plaintiff Gonzaga's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defense. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (PL, Case Administrator)
September 4, 2014 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko: Motion Hearing held on 9/4/2014 re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Including Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University, and #17 MOTION to Strike #11 Amended Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Reported/Recorded by: Julie McCaughan) (GT, Judicial Assistant)
September 2, 2014 Filing 30 Submission of Proposed Order Re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Including Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University ; filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Hendricksen, Mark)
August 20, 2014 Filing 29 STATEMENT OF Material FACTS re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Including Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Hendricksen, Mark)
August 20, 2014 Filing 28 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Including Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Hendricksen, Mark)
August 6, 2014 Filing 27 DECLARATION by John Pierce in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Including Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by All Defendants. (Pierce, John)
August 6, 2014 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Including Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by All Defendants. (Pierce, John)
July 22, 2014 Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #17 MOTION to Strike #11 Amended Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Hendricksen, Mark)
July 16, 2014 Filing 24 DECLARATION by Kristopher R. Kassel in Support re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Including Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hendricksen, Mark)
July 16, 2014 Filing 23 DECLARATION in Support re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Including Memorandum of Points and Authorities of Mark Hendricksen filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MH-1, #2 Exhibit MH-2, #3 Exhibit MH-3, #4 Exhibit MH-4, #5 Exhibit MH-5, #6 Exhibit MH-6, #7 Exhibit MH-7, #8 Exhibit MH-8)(Hendricksen, Mark)
July 16, 2014 Filing 22 STATEMENT OF Material FACTS re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Including Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Hendricksen, Mark)
July 16, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment Including Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Corporation of Gonzaga University. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2014 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse West 920 Riverside Avenue, Spokane, WA 99201 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Hendricksen, Mark)
June 25, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE RESETTING Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re #17 MOTION to Strike #11 Amended Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses : Motion Hearing reset for 9/4/2014 at 10:00 AM in Spokane before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Change in date, time and location.(GT, Judicial Assistant)
June 20, 2014 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Kristopher Kassel in Support re #17 MOTION to Strike #11 Amended Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Hendricksen, Mark) Modified docket text on 6/23/2014 to add declarant name (CV, Case Administrator).
June 20, 2014 Filing 18 DECLARATION in Support re #17 MOTION to Strike #11 Amended Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses of Mark Hendricksen filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MH-1, #2 Exhibit MH-2, #3 Exhibit MH-3, #4 Exhibit MH-4, #5 Exhibit MH-5, #6 Exhibit MH-6, #7 Exhibit MH-7)(Hendricksen, Mark)
June 20, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike #11 Amended Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses by Corporation of Gonzaga University. Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 at 02:30 PM in Yakima before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Hendricksen, Mark)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/23/2015 09:00 AM via Telephonic Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Final Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2015 at 09:00 AM via Telephonic Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2015 at 09:00 AM in Yakima before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (CV, Case Administrator)
June 17, 2014 Filing 15 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko: Scheduling Conference held on 6/17/2014. (Reported/Recorded by: Not Reported) (GT, Judicial Assistant)
June 3, 2014 Filing 14 Joint Certificate Pursuant to LR 26.1 / LR 16.1 by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Hendricksen, Mark)
June 3, 2014 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pendleton Enterprises LLC. (Pierce, John) Modified on 6/3/2014 document contains incorrect case number and a certificate of service is not included (CV, Case Administrator).
June 3, 2014 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pendleton Broadcasting Inc. (Pierce, John) Modified on 6/3/2014 document contains incorrect case number and a certificate of service is not included (CV, Case Administrator).
June 3, 2014 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by Jamie Pendleton, Pendleton Broadcasting Inc, Pendleton Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Pierce, John)
May 15, 2014 Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2014 at 9:00 AM before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate)(LMM, Courtroom Deputy)
May 14, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Pierce on behalf of All Defendants (Pierce, John)
May 14, 2014 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Attorney John Pierce added to party Jamie Pendleton(pty:dft), Attorney John Pierce added to party Pendleton Broadcasting Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John Pierce added to party Pendleton Enterprises LLC(pty:dft))(Pierce, John)
April 28, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Corporation of Gonzaga University re Pendleton Enterprises LLC. (Hendricksen, Mark) Modified on 4/30/2014 (CV, Case Administrator).
April 28, 2014 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Corporation of Gonzaga University re Pendleton Broadcasting Inc. (Hendricksen, Mark) Modified on 4/30/2014 (CV, Case Administrator).
April 28, 2014 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed DECLARATION OF SERVICE re: summons and complaint by Corporation of Gonzaga University re Jamie Pendleton. (Hendricksen, Mark) Modified on 4/30/2014 (CV, Case Administrator).
April 9, 2014 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Hendricksen, Mark)
April 9, 2014 Filing 3 Report on the filing or determination of an action involving a trademark. (CV, Case Administrator)
April 9, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jamie Pendleton, Pendleton Broadcasting Inc, Pendleton Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Pendleton Broadcasting, #2 Summons for Jamie Pendleton)(CV, Case Administrator)
April 9, 2014 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko assigned to case. (CV, Case Administrator)
April 8, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-1800746) Jury Demand. Filed by Corporation of Gonzaga University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hendricksen, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corporation of Gonzaga University v. Pendleton Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pendleton Enterprises LLC
Represented By: John Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Pendleton
Represented By: John Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pendleton Broadcasting Inc
Represented By: John Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corporation of Gonzaga University
Represented By: Mark Wayne Hendricksen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?